In Re: Asbestos Products Liab
Defendant: COMBUSTION ENGINEERING INC, OWENS CORNING FIBERGLAS CORP, T AND N PLC, EAGLE PICHER INDUSTRIES INC, FIBREBOARD CORP, DELTA STEAMSHIP LINES INC, ARMSTRONG WORLD INDUSTRIES INC, POPE TALBOT CO, HK PORTER CO INC, WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CO, RAYBESTOS MANHATTAN INC, MANVILLE CORP ASBESTOS DISEASE COMPENSATION FUND, PITTSBURGH CORNING CORP, TURNER NEWALL PLC, GAF CORP, GENERAL ELECTRIC CO, NATIONAL GYPSUM CO, BABCOCK & WILCOX CO, ACANDS INC, KEENE CORP, POPE AND TALBOT INC, PACIFIC FAR EAST CO, OWENS ILLINOIS INC, HEUBLEIN INC, WEST COAST STEAMSHIP CO, UNITED STATES LINES INC, Inc., STATES STEAMSHIP CO, STATES LINES STEATES STEAMSHIP, BULK FOOD CARRIERS INC and CELOTEX CORP
Defendant / Appellee: MATSON NAVIGATION CO, UNITED VINTNER LINES and AMERICAN PRESIDENT LINES LTD
Plaintiff / Appellant: LIONEL C. WILSON, Deceased, by Creighton E. Miller, Administrator of the Estate
Case Number: 15-1387
Filed: February 19, 2015
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2016 MANDATE ISSUED, filed. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (JK) [Entered: 09/09/2016 08:32 AM]
September 8, 2016 REVIEWED & ADJUSTED Bill of Costs filed. After review, costs will be taxed in the amount of $2,475.00. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (MLR) [Entered: 09/08/2016 12:55 PM]
September 1, 2016 ECF FILER: BILL OF COSTS filed on behalf of Appellant Lionel C. Wilson in 15-1387, Appellant Joseph F. Braun in 15-1388, Appellant Thomas Guiden in 15-1389. Certificate of Service dated 09/01/2016. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (TAS) [Entered: 09/01/2016 11:44 AM]
August 18, 2016 NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: AMBRO, JORDAN and GREENBERG, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 12. Judge: AMBRO Authoring. Appellants' Motion to File a Supplemental Appendix is denied. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (MLR) [Entered: 08/18/2016 02:37 PM]
August 18, 2016 JUDGMENT, Ordered and Adjudged by this Court that the judgment of the District court entered January 14, 2015, are hereby Reversed. Costs taxed against Appellees. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (MLR) [Entered: 08/18/2016 02:41 PM]
June 14, 2016 ARGUED on Tuesday, June 14, 2016. Panel: AMBRO, JORDAN and GREENBERG, Circuit Judges. Louis M. Bograd arguing for Appellant Lionel C. Wilson; Louis M. Bograd arguing for Appellant Joseph F. Braun; Louis M. Bograd arguing for Appellant Thomas Guiden; Harold W. Henderson arguing for Appellee United Vintner Lines; Harold W. Henderson arguing for Appellee Oceanic Steamship Co; Harold W. Henderson arguing for Appellee American President Lines Ltd. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (PM) [Entered: 06/14/2016 03:06 PM]
June 14, 2016 COURT MINUTES OF ARGUED/SUBMITTED CASES. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389, 15-3902, 14-4181, 15-1442, 15-3769, 15-3812] (PM) [Entered: 06/14/2016 03:58 PM]
June 7, 2016 ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Louis M. Bograd, Esq. for Appellant Lionel C. Wilson. Certificate of Service dated 06/07/2016. (LMB) [Entered: 06/07/2016 11:45 AM]
June 6, 2016 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Louis M. Bograd on behalf of Appellant(s) Lionel C. Wilson.--[Edited 06/07/2016 by MLR] (LMB) [Entered: 06/06/2016 02:55 PM]
May 13, 2016 Oral Argument Notification for Tuesday, 06/14/2016. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (TLG) [Entered: 05/13/2016 08:31 AM]
April 11, 2016 ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellees American President Lines Ltd and Matson Navigation Co in Opposition to Motion to File Supplemental Appendix in 15-1387. Certificate of Service dated 04/11/2016. --[Edited 04/12/2016 by EAF - Text edited] [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (HWH) [Entered: 04/11/2016 10:50 AM]
April 6, 2016 ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Timothy A. Swafford, Esq. for Appellant Lionel C. Wilson. Certificate of Service dated 04/06/2016. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (TAS) [Entered: 04/06/2016 09:07 AM]
April 6, 2016 ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant Lionel C. Wilson in 15-1387, Appellant Joseph F. Braun in 15-1388, Appellant Thomas Guiden in 15-1389 to supplement the appendix. Certificate of Service dated 04/06/2016. [Entry edited to reflect all party filers] [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389]--[Edited 04/06/2016 by EMA] (TAS) [Entered: 04/06/2016 10:40 AM]
April 6, 2016 COMPLIANCE RECEIVED. Motion to file supplemental appendix received from Appellant Lionel C. Wilson in 15-1387, Appellant Joseph F. Braun in 15-1388, Appellant Thomas Guiden in 15-1389. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (EMA) [Entered: 04/06/2016 03:16 PM]
April 6, 2016 ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Harold W. Henderson, Esq. for Appellees Matson Navigation Co, United Vintner Lines and American President Lines Ltd in 15-1387, Attorney Harold W. Henderson, Esq. for Appellees Matson Navigation Co, American President Lines Ltd and Oceanic Steamship Co in 15-1388, Attorney Harold W. Henderson, Esq. for Appellees Matson Navigation Co and American President Lines Ltd in 15-1389. Certificate of Service dated 04/06/2016. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (HWH) [Entered: 04/06/2016 11:01 AM]
April 4, 2016 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Lionel C. Wilson in 15-1387, Appellant Joseph F. Braun in 15-1388, Appellant Thomas Guiden in 15-1389 - Reply Brief with Supplemental Appendix (Entitled "Exhibit A") attached. Copies: 7. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (KEL) [Entered: 04/04/2016 03:11 PM]
April 1, 2016 NON COMPLIANCE Order issued to Appellant Lionel C. Wilson in 15-1387, Appellant Joseph F. Braun in 15-1388, Appellant Thomas Guiden in 15-1389 regarding the reply brief filed on 03/30/2016. Please open the attachment for the full text of the Order. Compliance due by 04/06/2016. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (EMA) [Entered: 04/01/2016 06:05 PM]
March 31, 2016 Calendared for Tuesday, 06/14/2016. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (PM) [Entered: 03/31/2016 01:18 PM]
March 30, 2016 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC REPLY BRIEF with Supplemental Appendix entitled "Exhibit A" attached on behalf of Appellant Lionel C. Wilson in 15-1387, Appellant Joseph F. Braun in 15-1388, Appellant Thomas Guiden in 15-1389, filed. Certificate of Service dated 03/30/2016 by ECF. [Entry edited to reflect attachment] [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389]--[Edited 04/01/2016 by EMA] (AK) [Entered: 03/30/2016 02:01 PM]
March 7, 2016 Appellant Lionel C. Wilson in 15-1387, Appellant Joseph F. Braun in 15-1388, Appellant Thomas Guiden in 15-1389 verbally granted an extension of time to file reply brief until 04/01/2016 pursuant to Third Cir. LAR 31.4. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (MLR) [Entered: 03/07/2016 02:32 PM]
March 4, 2016 ECF FILER: Request by Appellant Lionel C. Wilson in 15-1387, Appellant Joseph F. Braun in 15-1388, Appellant Thomas Guiden in 15-1389 for Oral Argument. [SEND TO MERITS] [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (AK) [Entered: 03/04/2016 04:01 PM]
March 3, 2016 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellees American President Lines Ltd and Matson Navigation Co in 15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389 - Brief. Copies: 7. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (RM) [Entered: 03/03/2016 11:47 AM]
March 2, 2016 ECF FILER: Request by Appellees American President Lines Ltd and Matson Navigation Co in 15-1387 for Oral Argument. [SEND TO MERITS] [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (HWH) [Entered: 03/02/2016 04:52 PM]
March 1, 2016 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellees American President Lines Ltd and Matson Navigation Co in 15-1387, 15-1388 and 15-1389, filed. Certificate of Service dated 03/01/2016 by ECF. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389]--[Edited 03/01/2016 by MCW] (HWH) [Entered: 03/01/2016 11:30 AM]
February 1, 2016 Appellees American President Lines Ltd and Matson Navigation Co in 15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389 verbally granted an extension of time to file brief until 03/01/2016 pursuant to Third Cir. LAR 31.4. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (MLR) [Entered: 02/01/2016 11:26 AM]
January 15, 2016 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Lionel C. Wilson in 15-1387, Appellant Joseph F. Braun in 15-1388, Appellant Thomas Guiden in 15-1389 - Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 4 (Volume I attached to Brief and submitted separately). [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (MS) [Entered: 01/19/2016 03:27 PM]
January 15, 2016 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Lionel C. Wilson in 15-1387, Appellant Joseph F. Braun in 15-1388, Appellant Thomas Guiden in 15-1389 - Addendum to Joint Appendix. Copies: 4. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (KEL) [Entered: 01/15/2016 12:45 PM]
January 15, 2016 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Lionel C. Wilson in 15-1387, Appellant Joseph F. Braun in 15-1388, Appellant Thomas Guiden in 15-1389 - Brief with Volume I of Appendix attached. Copies: 7. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (KEL) [Entered: 01/15/2016 12:35 PM]
January 14, 2016 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Timothy A. Swafford on behalf of Appellant(s) Lionel C. Wilson, Joseph F. Braun, Thomas Guiden.--[Edited 01/14/2016 by MLR] (TAS) [Entered: 01/14/2016 03:44 PM]
January 12, 2016 NON COMPLIANCE Order issued to Appellant Lionel C. Wilson in 15-1387, Appellant Joseph F. Braun in 15-1388, Appellant Thomas Guiden in 15-1389 regarding the brief and/or appendix filed on 01/11/2016. Please open the attachment for the full text of the Order. Compliance due by 01/15/2016. This Order does not change the deadline for filing the next brief. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (MS) [Entered: 01/12/2016 09:54 AM]
January 12, 2016 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC ADDENDUM to APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant Lionel C. Wilson in 15-1387, Appellant Joseph F. Braun in 15-1388, Appellant Thomas Guiden in 15-1389 , filed. Certificate of Service dated 01/12/2016 by ECF. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (AK) [Entered: 01/12/2016 03:26 PM]
January 12, 2016 COMPLIANCE RECEIVED. Addendum to appendix with District Court docket reports received from Appellant Lionel C. Wilson in 15-1387, Appellant Joseph F. Braun in 15-1388, Appellant Thomas Guiden in 15-1389. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (MS) [Entered: 01/14/2016 09:03 AM]
January 11, 2016 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant Lionel C. Wilson in 15-1387, Appellant Joseph F. Braun in 15-1388, Appellant Thomas Guiden in 15-1389, filed. Certificate of service dated 01/11/2016 by ECF. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] - [Appendix Vol. I has been removed from this entry by the Clerk as duplicative as it is attached to the brief]--[Edited 01/12/2016 by MS] (AK) [Entered: 01/11/2016 03:02 PM]
January 11, 2016 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellant Lionel C. Wilson in 15-1387, Appellant Joseph F. Braun in 15-1388, Appellant Thomas Guiden in 15-1389, filed. Certificate of Service dated 01/11/2016 by ECF. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (AK) [Entered: 01/11/2016 03:10 PM]
November 30, 2015 Verbally granted Appellant Lionel C. Wilson in 15-1387, Appellant Joseph F. Braun in 15-1388, Appellant Thomas Guiden in 15-1389 an extension of time to file brief & appendix until 01/11/2016 pursuant to Third Cir. LAR 31.4. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (CJG) [Entered: 11/30/2015 10:28 AM]
November 17, 2015 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Lionel C. Wilson, Joseph F. Braun and Thomas Guiden due on or before 12/28/2015. Appendix due on or before 12/28/2015. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (MLR) [Entered: 11/17/2015 05:08 PM]
May 27, 2015 Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (TNH) [Entered: 05/27/2015 12:22 PM]
March 27, 2015 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Randall L. Solomon, Esq. for T and N PLC and Martin T. Wymer, Esq. for T and N PLC requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 04/10/2015. (MLR) [Entered: 03/27/2015 03:49 PM]
March 27, 2015 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Matthew C. O'Connell, Esq. for Pope and Talbot Inc requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form and Disclosure Statement on or before 04/10/2015. (MLR) [Entered: 03/27/2015 03:53 PM]
March 27, 2015 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Robert Bunda for Owens Illinois Inc requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form and Disclosure Statement on or before 04/10/2015. (MLR) [Entered: 03/27/2015 03:56 PM]
March 27, 2015 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Richard C. Binzley, Esq. for Matson Navigation Co and Delta Steamship Lines Inc requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form and Disclosure Statement on or before 04/10/2015. (MLR) [Entered: 03/27/2015 03:58 PM]
March 6, 2015 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Lionel C. Wilson advising this court that transcripts are not needed. (AK) [Entered: 03/06/2015 11:46 AM]
March 5, 2015 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Harold W. Henderson on behalf of Appellee(s) Matson Navigation Company, Inc. (Appellee in Nos. 15-1387, 15-1388 &15-1389); American President Lines, Ltd. (Appellee in 15-1389). [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (HWH) [Entered: 03/05/2015 09:32 AM]
March 5, 2015 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Matson Navigation Co in 15-1387, filed. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (HWH) [Entered: 03/05/2015 09:53 AM]
March 2, 2015 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Lionel C. Wilson in 15-1387, Appellant Joseph F. Braun in 15-1388, Appellant Thomas Guiden in 15-1389, received. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (AK) [Entered: 03/02/2015 03:14 PM]
March 2, 2015 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alan Kellman The Jaques Admiralty Law Firm, PC 645 Griswold St., Suite 1370 Detroit, MI 48226 313-961-1080 on behalf of Appellant(s) Lionel C. Wilson, Joseph F. Braun, Thomas Guiden. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (AK) [Entered: 03/02/2015 03:20 PM]
March 2, 2015 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Lionel C. Wilson in 15-1387, Appellant Joseph F. Braun in 15-1388, Appellant Thomas Guiden in 15-1389, filed. [15-1387, 15-1388, 15-1389] (AK) [Entered: 03/02/2015 03:23 PM]
February 19, 2015 PARTIAL RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (MLR) [Entered: 02/19/2015 11:30 AM]
February 19, 2015 CLERK ORDER The actions at Nos. 15-1387, 15-1388 and 15-1389 are hereby consolidated for all purposes, filed. [15-1388, 15-1387, 15-1389] (MLR) [Entered: 02/19/2015 04:18 PM]
February 19, 2015 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Lionel C. Wilson in District Court No. 2-02-md-00875, 2-11-cv-33880. (MLR) [Entered: 02/19/2015 11:23 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In Re: Asbestos Products Liab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMBUSTION ENGINEERING INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWENS CORNING FIBERGLAS CORP
Represented By: Kent D. Riesen Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Chilton Esq.
Represented By: John S. Wasung Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T AND N PLC
Represented By: Randall L. Solomon Esq.
Represented By: Martin T. Wymer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAGLE PICHER INDUSTRIES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIBREBOARD CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELTA STEAMSHIP LINES INC
Represented By: Richard C. Binzley Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMSTRONG WORLD INDUSTRIES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POPE TALBOT CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HK PORTER CO INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAYBESTOS MANHATTAN INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANVILLE CORP ASBESTOS DISEASE COMPENSATION FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PITTSBURGH CORNING CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNER NEWALL PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAF CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL GYPSUM CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BABCOCK & WILCOX CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACANDS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEENE CORP
Represented By: Michael D. Eagen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POPE AND TALBOT INC
Represented By: Matthew C. O'Connell Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACIFIC FAR EAST CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWENS ILLINOIS INC
Represented By: Robert Bunda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEUBLEIN INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST COAST STEAMSHIP CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES LINES INC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATES STEAMSHIP CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATES LINES STEATES STEAMSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BULK FOOD CARRIERS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CELOTEX CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATSON NAVIGATION CO
Represented By: Richard C. Binzley Esq.
Represented By: Harold W. Henderson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED VINTNER LINES
Represented By: Harold W. Henderson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN PRESIDENT LINES LTD
Represented By: Harold W. Henderson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LIONEL C. WILSON, Deceased, by Creighton E. Miller, Administrator of the Estate
Represented By: Alan Kellman Esq.
Represented By: Louis M. Bograd Esq.
Represented By: Timothy A. Swafford Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?