In re: Asbesto Products
Defendant: EAGLE PICHER INDUSTRIES INC, COMBUSTION ENGINEERING INC, OWENS CORNING FIBERGLAS CORP, FLEXITALLIC GASKET CORP, T AND N PLC, WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP, GULF OIL TRADING CO, BABCOCK & WILCOX CO, FIBREBOARD CORP, ISTHMIAN LINES, MATHIASEN TANKER INDUSTIRES INC, ALCOA STEAMSHIP CO INC, ARMSTRONG WORLD INDUSTRIES INC, FOSTER WHEELER CO, PENN SHIPPING CO, AMERICAN LEADER INC, PELTZ BROTHERS INC, HK PORTER CO INC, GARLOCK INC, RAYBESTOS MANHATTAN INC, AP GREEN REFRACTORIES CO, SUN SHIP INC, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP, AC AND S INC, MANVILLE CORP ASBESTOS DISEASE COMPENSATION FUND, PITTSBURGH CORNING CORP, STOCKARD STEAMSHIP CO, TURNER NEWALL PLC, TODD SHIPYARDS, GAF CORP, AVON STEAMSHIP CO INC, GENERAL ELECTRIC CO, NATIONAL GYPSUM CO, AEROJET GENERAL SHIPYARDS, DICKMAN WRIGHT AND PUGH, KEENE CORPORATION, ACANDS INC, JACKSONVILLE SHIPYARDS, ISBRANDTSEN LINES, ASBESTOS CORP LTD, GRACE LINES PRUDENTIAL LINES, STATES MARINE LINES, OWENS ILLINOIS INC, AMERGARCO INC, ORION STEAMSHIP CO, HUDSON WATERWAYS CORP, AMERICAN FOREIGN SS CORP, ALCOA INC, TAMPA SHIP REPAIR AND DRYDOCK CO, AMERICAN EXPORT LINES, BLIDBERG ROTHCHILD AGENCY CORP, MOORE MCCORMACK LINES INC, DELAVAL STEAM TURBINE, FOSTER WHEELER CORP, UNITED STATES LINES INC REORGANIZATION TRUST, THETFORD MINES, WATERMAN STEAMSHIP CORP, PRUDENTIAL LINES INC and CELOTEX CORP
Plaintiff / Appellant: GEORGE A. PERDREAUVILLE and JOSEPH BLUE
Defendant / Appellee: KEYSTONE SHIPPING CO, MISSISSIPPI SHIPPING CO, FARRELL LINES and DELTA STEAMSHIP LINES INC
Respondent / Appellee: AMERICAN EXPORT ISBRANDTSEN
Case Number: 16-4148
Filed: November 22, 2016
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2018 MANDATE ISSUED, filed. (CLW) [Entered: 01/30/2018 12:08 PM]
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER (VANASKIE, RENDELL and FISHER, Circuit Judges) denying Petition for Panel Rehearing filed by Appellees Keystone Shipping Co, Farrell Lines, Delta Steamship Lines Inc, American Export Isbrandtsen and Mississippi Shipping Co, filed. Vanaskie, Authoring Judge. (CLW) [Entered: 01/22/2018 03:55 PM]
January 11, 2018 ECF FILER: Petition filed by Appellees American Export Isbrandtsen, Delta Steamship Lines Inc, Farrell Lines, Keystone Shipping Co and Mississippi Shipping Co for Rehearing before Original Panel. Certificate of Service dated 01/11/2018. Service made by ECF. (HWH) [Entered: 01/11/2018 11:07 AM]
January 11, 2018 REVIEWED Bill of Costs filed. After review, costs will be taxed in the amount of $2181.80. 16-4148 (CLW) [Entered: 01/11/2018 09:38 AM]
January 10, 2018 ECF FILER: BILL OF COSTS filed on behalf of Appellants Joseph Blue and George A. Perdreauville. Certificate of Service dated 01/10/2018. Service made by ECF. (AK) [Entered: 01/10/2018 04:03 PM]
December 28, 2017 NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: VANASKIE, RENDELL and FISHER, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 12. Judge: VANASKIE Authoring. (CLW) [Entered: 12/28/2017 10:22 AM]
December 28, 2017 JUDGMENT, ORDERED and ADJUDGED by this Court that the District Court's March 12, 2014, and October 10, 2014, orders granting the Appellees' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction are hereby REVERSED and VACATED and the matter is REMANDED to the District Court for further proceedings. Costs shall be taxed against the Appellees. All of the in accordance with the Opinion of this Court. (CLW) [Entered: 12/28/2017 10:38 AM]
September 11, 2017 SUBMITTED on Monday, September 11, 2017. Panel: VANASKIE, RENDELL, FISHER, Circuit Judges. (PM) [Entered: 09/11/2017 03:03 PM]
September 11, 2017 COURT MINUTES OF ARGUED/SUBMITTED CASES. [16-3636, 16-4297, 16-1198, 16-2992, 16-4092, 16-4111, 16-4148, 16-4169, 17-1246] (PM) [Entered: 09/11/2017 03:57 PM]
August 22, 2017 Submit Notification for Monday, 09/11/2017. (TLG) [Entered: 08/22/2017 10:41 AM]
July 28, 2017 ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Harold W. Henderson, Esq. for Appellees Keystone Shipping Co, Farrell Lines, Delta Steamship Lines Inc, Mississippi Shipping Co and American Export Isbrandtsen. Certificate of Service dated 07/28/2017. Service made by ECF. (HWH) [Entered: 07/28/2017 09:54 AM]
July 26, 2017 ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Louis M. Bograd, Esq. for Appellants Joseph Blue and George A. Perdreauville. Certificate of Service dated 07/26/2017. Service made by ECF. (LMB) [Entered: 07/26/2017 05:38 PM]
July 26, 2017 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Louis M. Bograd on behalf of Appellant(s) Joseph E. Blue; George Perdreauville. (LMB) [Entered: 07/26/2017 01:33 PM]
July 21, 2017 Calendared for Monday, 09/11/2017. Calendar Clerk: PM. (PM) [Entered: 07/21/2017 10:17 AM]
May 5, 2017 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants Joseph Blue and George A. Perdreauville - Brief. Copies: 7. (SJB) [Entered: 05/05/2017 10:37 AM]
May 2, 2017 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC REPLY BRIEF on behalf of Appellants Joseph Blue and George A. Perdreauville, filed. Certificate of Service dated 05/02/2017 by ECF. (AK) [Entered: 05/02/2017 03:50 PM]
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER (SHWARTZ and FISHER, Circuit Judges) Motion by Appellees to Stay Oral Argument Pending Decision in Related Proceedings or , in the alternative, to Grant Oral Argument, which the Court may construe as a Motion to Stay the Appeal and Response are referred to the merits panel, filed. Panel No.: CCO-075. Shwartz, Authoring Judge. (CLW) [Entered: 04/24/2017 02:57 PM]
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) Motion by Appellees to Stay Oral Argument Pending Decision in Related Proceedngs or, in the alternatiive, to Grant Argument and Response by Appellants to Motion to Stay. The motion is also construed as a motion to stay the appeal pending the determination of appeals pending in the United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit. So construed, the motion and response are referred to a motions panel. It is noted that this case has not yet been calendared. Also, this order does not stay the briefing schedule. Appellant's reply brief is still due to be filed on or before May 4, 2017, filed. (CLW) [Entered: 04/20/2017 04:24 PM]
April 13, 2017 ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellees American Export Isbrandtsen, Delta Steamship Lines Inc, Farrell Lines, Keystone Shipping Co and Mississippi Shipping Co to stay Oral Argument, or in the Alternative, to Grant Oral Argument. Certificate of Service dated 04/13/2017. Service made by ECF. SEND TO MERITS PANEL--[Edited 04/24/2017 by CLW] (HWH) [Entered: 04/13/2017 10:35 AM]
April 13, 2017 Appellants Joseph Blue and George A. Perdreauville verbally granted an extension of time to file reply brief until 05/04/2017 pursuant to Third Cir. LAR 31.4. (CLW) [Entered: 04/13/2017 02:16 PM]
April 13, 2017 ECF FILER: Response to Motion to Stay Appeal by Appellants Joseph Blue and George A. Perdreauville. Certificate of Service dated 04/13/2017. Service made by ECF. --[Edited 04/20/2017 by CLW] SEND TO MERITS PANEL--[Edited 04/24/2017 by CLW] (TAS) [Entered: 04/13/2017 03:15 PM]
April 10, 2017 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellees American Export Isbrandtsen, Delta Steamship Lines Inc, Farrell Lines, Keystone Shipping Co and Mississippi Shipping Co - Brief. Copies: 10. (SJB) [Entered: 04/10/2017 09:46 AM]
April 6, 2017 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellees American Export Isbrandtsen, Delta Steamship Lines Inc, Farrell Lines, Keystone Shipping Co and Mississippi Shipping Co, filed. Certificate of Service dated 04/06/2017 by ECF. (HWH) [Entered: 04/06/2017 10:40 AM]
March 16, 2017 ECF FILER: Letter dated 03/16/2017 , filed pursuant to Rule 28(j) from counsel for Appellants Joseph Blue and George A. Perdreauville. Service made by ECF. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable. (AK) [Entered: 03/16/2017 03:43 PM]
March 9, 2017 Appellees American Export Isbrandtsen, Delta Steamship Lines Inc, Farrell Lines, Keystone Shipping Co and Mississippi Shipping Co verbally granted an extension of time to file brief until 04/06/2017 pursuant to Third Cir. LAR 31.4. (CLW) [Entered: 03/09/2017 02:47 PM]
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER (FISHER and SHWARTZ, Circuit Judges) Motion by Appellees Delta Steamship Lines, Inc., and Mississippi Shipping Company to Dismiss the Appeal of Appellant George A. Perdreauville for Lack of Jurisdiction and Responses are referred to the merits panel., filed. Panel No.: CCO-056. Shwartz, Authoring Judge. (CLW) [Entered: 03/09/2017 12:14 PM]
February 28, 2017 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants Joseph Blue and George A. Perdreauville - Brief with Volume I of Appendix attached. Copies: 7. (SJB) [Entered: 02/28/2017 01:59 PM]
February 28, 2017 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants Joseph Blue and George A. Perdreauville - Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 5 (Volume I attached to Brief). (MS) [Entered: 02/28/2017 03:33 PM]
February 21, 2017 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellants Joseph Blue and George A. Perdreauville, filed. Certificate of Service dated 02/21/2017 by ECF. (AK) [Entered: 02/21/2017 02:15 PM]
February 21, 2017 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Joseph Blue and George A. Perdreauville, filed. Certificate of service dated 02/21/2017 by ECF. (AK) [Entered: 02/21/2017 02:30 PM]
February 13, 2017 ECF FILER: Reply by Appellee Mississippi Shipping Co to Response Motion to dismiss party, filed. Certificate of Service dated 02/13/2017. Service made by ECF SEND TO MERITS PANEL--[Edited 03/09/2017 by CLW] (HWH) [Entered: 02/13/2017 12:12 PM]
February 6, 2017 ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellant George A. Perdreauville to Motion to dismiss party. Certificate of Service dated 02/06/2017. SEND TO MERITS PANEL--[Edited 03/09/2017 by CLW] (TAS) [Entered: 02/06/2017 04:02 PM]
January 25, 2017 Appellants Joseph Blue and George A. Perdreauville verbally granted an extension of time to file brief & appendix until 02/21/2017. pursuant to Third Cir. LAR 31.4. (CLW) [Entered: 01/25/2017 03:15 PM]
January 25, 2017 ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellees Mississippi Shipping Co and Delta Steamship Lines, Inc . to dismiss appeal of Appellant George A. Perdreauville for Lack of Jurisdiction. Certificate of Service dated 01/25/2017. Service made by ECF.--[Edited 01/25/2017 by CLW] SEND TO MERITS PANEL--[Edited 03/09/2017 by CLW] (HWH) [Entered: 01/25/2017 02:27 PM]
December 28, 2016 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Joseph Blue and George A. Perdreauville due on or before 02/06/2017. Appendix due on or before 02/06/2017. (CLW) [Entered: 12/28/2016 04:24 PM]
December 6, 2016 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Joseph Blue and George A. Perdreauville, filed. (AK) [Entered: 12/06/2016 10:40 AM]
December 6, 2016 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Joseph Blue and George A. Perdreauville, filed. (AK) [Entered: 12/06/2016 10:39 AM]
December 6, 2016 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Joseph Blue and George A. Perdreauville advising this court that transcripts are not needed. (AK) [Entered: 12/06/2016 10:37 AM]
December 6, 2016 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Harold W. Henderson on behalf of Appellee(s) Delta Steamship Lines Inc. Mississippi Shipping Company Farrell Lines Inc. American Export Lines Inc. American Export Isbrandtsen Keystone Shipping Co.. (HWH) [Entered: 12/06/2016 10:12 AM]
December 6, 2016 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Joseph Blue and George A. Perdreauville, received. (AK) [Entered: 12/06/2016 10:43 AM]
December 6, 2016 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Keystone Shipping Co, filed. (HWH) [Entered: 12/06/2016 01:32 PM]
December 6, 2016 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees American Export Isbrandtsen, American Export Lines and Farrell Lines, filed. (HWH) [Entered: 12/06/2016 01:31 PM]
December 6, 2016 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Ernest Auciello, Jr., Esq. for General Electric Co, Henry E. Billingsley, II, Esq. for Combustion Engineering Inc, Richard C. Binzley, Esq. for Alcoa Inc, Keystone Shipping Co, American Export Lines, Farrell Lines, Isbrandtsen Lines, AC and S Inc, American Export Isbrandtsen, Pittsburgh Corning Corp, Armstrong World Industries Inc, Owens Corning Fiberglas Corp, Keene Corporation and Delta Steamship Lines Inc, Timothy T. Brick, Esq. for General Electric Co, Robert Bunda for Owens Illinois Inc, Jeffrey H. Chilton, Esq. for Owens Corning Fiberglas Corp, Susan K. Dirks, Esq. for Mathiasen Tanker Industires Inc and Alcoa Steamship Co Inc, Mary Ellen Fairfield, Esq. for AC and S Inc, Clayton F. Farrell, Esq. for Acands Inc, Michael R. Gallagher, Esq. for General Electric Co, James J. Hayes, Jr., Esq. for Pittsburgh Corning Corp and Fibreboard Corp, Harold W. Henderson, Esq. for Alcoa Inc, Keystone Shipping Co, American Export Lines, Farrell Lines, Avon Steamship Co Inc, Isbrandtsen Lines, Mathiasen Tanker Industires Inc, Waterman Steamship Corp, Mississippi Shipping Co, Alcoa Steamship Co Inc, American Export Isbrandtsen and Delta Steamship Lines Inc, Jean K. Korman, Esq. for Combustion Engineering Inc, Thomas A. Marcucci, Esq. for Babcock & Wilcox Co, Laura D. Mason, Esq. for Garlock Inc, Wade A. Mitchell, Esq. for Turner Newall PLC, GAF Corp, Flexitallic Gasket Corp, Armstrong World Industries Inc, AP Green Refractories Co and T and N PLC, Thomas O. Murphy, Esq. for Alcoa Inc, Keystone Shipping Co, American Export Lines, Farrell Lines, Isbrandtsen Lines and Delta Steamship Lines Inc, Robert A. Obringer, Esq. for Asbestos Corp Ltd, Kathleen Pettingill, Esq. for Turner Newall PLC, GAF Corp, Flexitallic Gasket Corp, Armstrong World Industries Inc, AP Green Refractories Co and T and N PLC, Kent D. Riesen, Esq. for Owens Corning Fiberglas Corp, Stewart D. Roll, Esq. for Combustion Engineering Inc, William C. Schaefer, Esq. for Todd Shipyards and Jacksonville Shipyards, Thomas H. Shunk, Esq. for Turner Newall PLC, GAF Corp, Flexitallic Gasket Corp, Armstrong World Industries Inc, AP Green Refractories Co and T and N PLC, Randall L. Solomon, Esq. for Turner Newall PLC, GAF Corp, Flexitallic Gasket Corp, Armstrong World Industries Inc, AP Green Refractories Co and T and N PLC, Brent C. Taggart, Esq. for AC and S Inc, John S. Wasung, Esq. for Owens Corning Fiberglas Corp and Stephen L. Witenoff, Esq. for Asbestos Corp Ltd requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 12/20/2016. Disclosure Statement on or before 12/20/2016. (CLW) [Entered: 12/06/2016 12:13 PM]
December 6, 2016 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Delta Steamship Lines Inc., filed. on behalf of Appellee Mississippi Shipping Co, filed. (HWH) [Entered: 12/06/2016 01:28 PM]
December 1, 2016 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alan Kellman on behalf of Appellant(s) Joseph E. Blue; George Perdreauville. (AK) [Entered: 12/01/2016 12:05 PM]
December 1, 2016 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Timothy A. Swafford on behalf of Appellant(s) Joseph E. Blue; George Perdreauville. (TAS) [Entered: 12/01/2016 12:06 PM]
November 25, 2016 Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 11/23/2016. (JK) [Entered: 11/25/2016 01:04 PM]
November 22, 2016 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CLW) [Entered: 11/22/2016 01:21 PM]
November 22, 2016 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Joseph E. Blue and George A. Perdreauville in District Court No. 2-11-cv-33914,2-11-cv-33906,2-02-md-00875. (CLW) [Entered: 11/22/2016 01:19 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In re: Asbesto Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAGLE PICHER INDUSTRIES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMBUSTION ENGINEERING INC
Represented By: Jean K. Korman Esq.
Represented By: Henry E. Billingsley Esq. II
Represented By: Stewart D. Roll Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWENS CORNING FIBERGLAS CORP
Represented By: Richard C. Binzley Esq.
Represented By: John S. Wasung Esq.
Represented By: Kent D. Riesen Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Chilton Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLEXITALLIC GASKET CORP
Represented By: Randall L. Solomon Esq.
Represented By: Thomas H. Shunk Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen Pettingill Esq.
Represented By: Wade A. Mitchell Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T AND N PLC
Represented By: Randall L. Solomon Esq.
Represented By: Thomas H. Shunk Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen Pettingill Esq.
Represented By: Wade A. Mitchell Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GULF OIL TRADING CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BABCOCK & WILCOX CO
Represented By: Thomas A. Marcucci Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIBREBOARD CORP
Represented By: James J. Hayes Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISTHMIAN LINES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATHIASEN TANKER INDUSTIRES INC
Represented By: Susan K. Dirks Esq.
Represented By: Harold W. Henderson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALCOA STEAMSHIP CO INC
Represented By: Susan K. Dirks Esq.
Represented By: Harold W. Henderson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMSTRONG WORLD INDUSTRIES INC
Represented By: Randall L. Solomon Esq.
Represented By: Richard C. Binzley Esq.
Represented By: Thomas H. Shunk Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen Pettingill Esq.
Represented By: Wade A. Mitchell Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENN SHIPPING CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN LEADER INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PELTZ BROTHERS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HK PORTER CO INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARLOCK INC
Represented By: Laura D. Mason Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAYBESTOS MANHATTAN INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AP GREEN REFRACTORIES CO
Represented By: Randall L. Solomon Esq.
Represented By: Thomas H. Shunk Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen Pettingill Esq.
Represented By: Wade A. Mitchell Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN SHIP INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AC AND S INC
Represented By: Richard C. Binzley Esq.
Represented By: Brent C. Taggart Esq.
Represented By: Mary Ellen Fairfield Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANVILLE CORP ASBESTOS DISEASE COMPENSATION FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PITTSBURGH CORNING CORP
Represented By: Richard C. Binzley Esq.
Represented By: James J. Hayes Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STOCKARD STEAMSHIP CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNER NEWALL PLC
Represented By: Randall L. Solomon Esq.
Represented By: Thomas H. Shunk Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen Pettingill Esq.
Represented By: Wade A. Mitchell Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD SHIPYARDS
Represented By: William C. Schaefer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAF CORP
Represented By: Randall L. Solomon Esq.
Represented By: Thomas H. Shunk Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen Pettingill Esq.
Represented By: Wade A. Mitchell Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVON STEAMSHIP CO INC
Represented By: Harold W. Henderson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC CO
Represented By: Timothy T. Brick Esq.
Represented By: Michael R. Gallagher Esq.
Represented By: Ernest Auciello Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL GYPSUM CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEROJET GENERAL SHIPYARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DICKMAN WRIGHT AND PUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEENE CORPORATION
Represented By: Richard C. Binzley Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACANDS INC
Represented By: Clayton F. Farrell Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACKSONVILLE SHIPYARDS
Represented By: William C. Schaefer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISBRANDTSEN LINES
Represented By: Richard C. Binzley Esq.
Represented By: Thomas O. Murphy Esq.
Represented By: Harold W. Henderson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASBESTOS CORP LTD
Represented By: Stephen L. Witenoff Esq.
Represented By: Robert A. Obringer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRACE LINES PRUDENTIAL LINES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATES MARINE LINES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWENS ILLINOIS INC
Represented By: Robert Bunda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERGARCO INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORION STEAMSHIP CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUDSON WATERWAYS CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN FOREIGN SS CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALCOA INC
Represented By: Richard C. Binzley Esq.
Represented By: Thomas O. Murphy Esq.
Represented By: Harold W. Henderson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAMPA SHIP REPAIR AND DRYDOCK CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN EXPORT LINES
Represented By: Richard C. Binzley Esq.
Represented By: Thomas O. Murphy Esq.
Represented By: Harold W. Henderson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLIDBERG ROTHCHILD AGENCY CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOORE MCCORMACK LINES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELAVAL STEAM TURBINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER CORP
Represented By: William D. Bonezzi Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES LINES INC REORGANIZATION TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THETFORD MINES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATERMAN STEAMSHIP CORP
Represented By: Harold W. Henderson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRUDENTIAL LINES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CELOTEX CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GEORGE A. PERDREAUVILLE
Represented By: Timothy A. Swafford Esq.
Represented By: Alan Kellman Esq.
Represented By: Louis M. Bograd Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPH BLUE
Represented By: Timothy A. Swafford Esq.
Represented By: Alan Kellman Esq.
Represented By: Louis M. Bograd Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEYSTONE SHIPPING CO
Represented By: Richard C. Binzley Esq.
Represented By: Thomas O. Murphy Esq.
Represented By: Harold W. Henderson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MISSISSIPPI SHIPPING CO
Represented By: Harold W. Henderson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FARRELL LINES
Represented By: Richard C. Binzley Esq.
Represented By: Thomas O. Murphy Esq.
Represented By: Harold W. Henderson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DELTA STEAMSHIP LINES INC
Represented By: Richard C. Binzley Esq.
Represented By: Thomas O. Murphy Esq.
Represented By: Harold W. Henderson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: AMERICAN EXPORT ISBRANDTSEN
Represented By: Richard C. Binzley Esq.
Represented By: Harold W. Henderson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?