Engage Healthcare Comm LLC, et al v. Intellisphere LLC, et al
Defendant / Appellee: MICHAEL J. HENNESSY, ARC MESA EDUCATORS LLC, INTELLISPHERE LLC and MICHAEL J HENNESSY & ASSOCIATES INC
Plaintiff / Appellant: CENTER OF EXCELLENCE MEDIA LLC, ENGAGE HEALTHCARE COMMUNICATIONS LLC and GREENHILL HEALTHCARE COMMUNICATIONS LLC
Case Number: 19-1017
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Michael J Hennessy & Associates Inc, filed. [19-1017] (RHB) [Entered: 01/29/2019 10:52 AM]
January 29, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Intellisphere LLC, filed. [19-1017] (RHB) [Entered: 01/29/2019 10:50 AM]
January 29, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Arc Mesa Educators LLC, filed. [19-1017] (RHB) [Entered: 01/29/2019 10:48 AM]
January 23, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Vincent N. Barbera on behalf of Appellant(s) Engage Healthcare Communications, LLC; Green Hill Healthcare Communications, LLC; Center of Excellence Media, LLC. [19-1017] (VNB) [Entered: 01/23/2019 11:10 AM]
January 23, 2019 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Richard H. Brown, III, Esq. for Intellisphere LLC, Michael J Hennessy & Associates Inc, Michael J. Hennessy and Arc Mesa Educators LLC requesting the following document(s): Disclosure Statement on or before 02/06/2019. (CJG) [Entered: 01/23/2019 10:52 AM]
January 22, 2019 Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 01/22/2019 03:29 PM]
January 22, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Richard H. Brown on behalf of Appellee(s) Intellisphere, LLC, Michael J. Hennessy & Associates, Inc., Arc Mesa Educators, LLC, Michael J. Hennessy. [19-1017] (RHB) [Entered: 01/22/2019 10:15 AM]
January 11, 2019 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Center of Excellence Media LLC, Engage Healthcare Communications LLC and Greenhill Healthcare Communications LLC, received. [19-1017] (DWP) [Entered: 01/11/2019 02:43 PM]
January 10, 2019 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Center of Excellence Media LLC, Engage Healthcare Communications LLC and Greenhill Healthcare Communications LLC advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [19-1017] (DWP) [Entered: 01/10/2019 01:57 PM]
January 10, 2019 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Center of Excellence Media LLC, Engage Healthcare Communications LLC and Greenhill Healthcare Communications LLC, filed. [19-1017] (DWP) [Entered: 01/10/2019 01:55 PM]
January 10, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Center of Excellence Media LLC, filed. [19-1017] (DWP) [Entered: 01/10/2019 01:52 PM]
January 10, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Greenhill Healthcare Communications LLC, filed. [19-1017] (DWP) [Entered: 01/10/2019 01:50 PM]
January 10, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Engage Healthcare Communications LLC, filed. [19-1017] (DWP) [Entered: 01/10/2019 01:48 PM]
January 8, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael O. Kassak on behalf of Appellant(s) Engage Healthcare Communications, LLC; Green Hill Healthcare Communications, LLC; Center of Excellence Media, LLC. [19-1017] (MOK) [Entered: 01/08/2019 12:19 PM]
January 8, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CJG) [Entered: 01/08/2019 09:16 AM]
January 8, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Center of Excellence Media LLC, Engage Healthcare Communications LLC and Greenhill Healthcare Communications LLC in District Court No. 3-12-cv-00787. (CJG) [Entered: 01/08/2019 09:12 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Engage Healthcare Comm LLC, et al v. Intellisphere LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL J. HENNESSY
Represented By: Richard H. Brown Esq. III
Represented By: Shannon H. Pulaski Esq.
Represented By: Mark S. Morgan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARC MESA EDUCATORS LLC
Represented By: Richard H. Brown Esq. III
Represented By: Shannon H. Pulaski Esq.
Represented By: Mark S. Morgan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INTELLISPHERE LLC
Represented By: Richard H. Brown Esq. III
Represented By: Shannon H. Pulaski Esq.
Represented By: Mark S. Morgan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL J HENNESSY & ASSOCIATES INC
Represented By: Richard H. Brown Esq. III
Represented By: Shannon H. Pulaski Esq.
Represented By: Mark S. Morgan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CENTER OF EXCELLENCE MEDIA LLC
Represented By: David W. Phillips Esq.
Represented By: Vincent N. Barbera Esq.
Represented By: Michael O. Kassak Esq.
Represented By: James P. Anelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ENGAGE HEALTHCARE COMMUNICATIONS LLC
Represented By: David W. Phillips Esq.
Represented By: Vincent N. Barbera Esq.
Represented By: Michael O. Kassak Esq.
Represented By: James P. Anelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GREENHILL HEALTHCARE COMMUNICATIONS LLC
Represented By: David W. Phillips Esq.
Represented By: Vincent N. Barbera Esq.
Represented By: Michael O. Kassak Esq.
Represented By: James P. Anelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?