SodexoMAGIC LLC v. Drexel University
Defendant / Appellee: DREXEL UNIVERSITY
Plaintiff / Appellant: SODEXOMAGIC LLC
Case Number: 19-1028
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 ECF FILER: Response filed by SodexoMAGIC LLC, Appellant in 19-1028/Appellee in 19-1107 in Opposition to Motion to Seal. Certificate of Service dated 03/04/2019. [19-1028, 19-1107]--[Edited 03/04/2019 by CJG] (CAB) [Entered: 03/04/2019 09:04 AM]
February 26, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. 1st Brief on behalf of Brief on behalf of Appellant SodexoMAGIC LLC due on or before 04/08/2019. Appendix due on or before 04/08/2019. [19-1028, 19-1107] (CJG) [Entered: 02/26/2019 09:28 AM]
February 22, 2019 ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellee Drexel University in 19-1028, Appellant Drexel University in 19-1107 to seal The documents that have been filed under seal in the District Court remain under seal in the Third Circuit Court of Appeals.. Certificate of Service dated 02/22/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1028, 19-1107] (SAC) [Entered: 02/22/2019 03:05 PM]
February 5, 2019 Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. [19-1028, 19-1107] (TNH) [Entered: 02/05/2019 04:21 PM]
January 16, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jared D. Bayer on behalf of Appellee(s) Drexel University. --[Edited 01/16/2019 by CJG to unapply from the appeal at No. 19-1107.] (JDB) [Entered: 01/16/2019 03:53 PM]
January 16, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Drexel University, filed. [19-1028] (RWH) [Entered: 01/16/2019 11:12 AM]
January 16, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert W. Hayes on behalf of Appellee(s) Drexel University. [19-1028] (RWH) [Entered: 01/16/2019 11:07 AM]
January 15, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stephen A. Cozen on behalf of Appellee(s) Drexel University. [19-1028] (SAC) [Entered: 01/15/2019 03:50 PM]
January 11, 2019 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant SodexoMAGIC LLC advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [19-1028] (CAB) [Entered: 01/11/2019 11:15 AM]
January 11, 2019 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant SodexoMAGIC LLC, received. [19-1028] (CAB) [Entered: 01/11/2019 11:11 AM]
January 11, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant SodexoMAGIC LLC, filed. [19-1028] (CAB) [Entered: 01/11/2019 11:10 AM]
January 11, 2019 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant SodexoMAGIC LLC, filed. [19-1028] (CAB) [Entered: 01/11/2019 11:08 AM]
January 11, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Glen D. Nager; Cynthia Barmore on behalf of Appellant(s) SodexoMAGIC, LLC. [19-1028] (CAB) [Entered: 01/11/2019 11:06 AM]
January 4, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CJG) [Entered: 01/04/2019 02:13 PM]
January 4, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant SodexoMAGIC LLC in District Court No. 2-16-cv-05144. (CJG) [Entered: 01/04/2019 02:07 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: SodexoMAGIC LLC v. Drexel University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DREXEL UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Stephen A. Cozen Esq.
Represented By: Robert W. Hayes Esq.
Represented By: Jared D. Bayer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SODEXOMAGIC LLC
Represented By: Cynthia A. Barmore Esq.
Represented By: Robert C. Heim Esq.
Represented By: Timothy J. Fazio Esq.
Represented By: Glen D. Nager Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?