Glenn Gross v. Lyons Doughty & Veldhuis

Plaintiff / Appellant: GLENN D. GROSS, on behalf of himself and others similarily situated
Defendant / Appellee: LYONS DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS
Case Number: 19-1031
Filed: January 3, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Glenn D. Gross due on or before 03/13/2019. Appendix due on or before 03/13/2019. (PDB) [Entered: 02/01/2019 12:27 PM]
January 17, 2019 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Glenn D. Gross advising this court that no transcripts are available. [19-1031] (JSJ) [Entered: 01/17/2019 06:06 PM]
January 17, 2019 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Glenn D. Gross, received. [19-1031] (JSJ) [Entered: 01/17/2019 06:05 PM]
January 17, 2019 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Glenn D. Gross, filed. [19-1031] (JSJ) [Entered: 01/17/2019 06:04 PM]
January 17, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jesse S. Johnson on behalf of Appellant(s) Glenn Gross. [19-1031] (JSJ) [Entered: 01/17/2019 06:02 PM]
January 6, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Lyons Doughty & Veldhuis, filed. [19-1031] (RSC) [Entered: 01/06/2019 10:09 AM]
January 6, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ronald S. Canter on behalf of Appellee(s) Lyons, Doughy & Veldhuis, P.C.. [19-1031] (RSC) [Entered: 01/06/2019 10:08 AM]
January 3, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 01/03/2019 03:48 PM]
January 3, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Glenn D. Gross in District Court No. 1-18-cv-07963. (PDB) [Entered: 01/03/2019 03:43 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glenn Gross v. Lyons Doughty & Veldhuis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GLENN D. GROSS, on behalf of himself and others similarily situated
Represented By: Jesse S. Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Seth A. Nadler Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LYONS DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS
Represented By: Laurie H. Lyons Esq.
Represented By: Ronald S. Canter Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?