Veronica Williams v. Litton Loan Services, et al
Defendant: STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Defendant / Appellee: LITTON LOAN SERVICES, OCWEN, STERN & EISENBURG PC, GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC, OCWEN FINANCIAL CORP, HSBC BANK USA NA and FREMONT HOME LOAN TRUST 2006-C MORTGAGE BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2006-C
Plaintiff / Appellant: VERONICA A. WILLIAMS
Case Number: 19-1032
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Request Mid Day Hearing. Certificate of Service dated 03/01/2019. Service made by US mail. [SEND TO MERITS] (SB) [Entered: 03/05/2019 02:28 PM]
January 24, 2019 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Attorney General New Jersey for State of New Jersey requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 02/07/2019. (SB) [Entered: 01/24/2019 01:13 PM]
January 14, 2019 Appellant's Recap of Case. Certificate of Service dated 01/11/2019. Service made by US mail. (SB) [Entered: 01/15/2019 11:41 AM]
January 14, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Ocwen Financial Corp, filed. [19-1032] (BJS) [Entered: 01/14/2019 02:24 PM]
January 14, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Ocwen, filed. [19-1032] (BJS) [Entered: 01/14/2019 02:24 PM]
January 14, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Litton Loan Services, filed. [19-1032] (BJS) [Entered: 01/14/2019 02:23 PM]
January 14, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank USA NA, filed. [19-1032] (BJS) [Entered: 01/14/2019 02:23 PM]
January 14, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Goldman Sachs Group Inc, filed. [19-1032] (BJS) [Entered: 01/14/2019 02:22 PM]
January 14, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Fremont Home Loan Trust 2006-C Mortgage Backed Certificates Series 2006-C, filed. [19-1032] (BJS) [Entered: 01/14/2019 02:20 PM]
January 11, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Stern & Eisenberg, P.C., filed. on behalf of Appellee Stern & Eisenburg PC, filed. [19-1032] (EB) [Entered: 01/11/2019 08:55 AM]
January 11, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Evan Barenbaum on behalf of Appellee(s) Stern & Eisenberg, P.C.. [19-1032] (EB) [Entered: 01/11/2019 08:53 AM]
January 4, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Brett L. Messinger on behalf of Appellee(s) Litton Loan Servicing; HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Freemont Home Loan Trust 2006-C Mortgage-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-C; Goldman Sachs (incorrectly pled as Goldman Sachs); Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC (incorrectly pled as Ocwen); Ocwen Financial Corporation. [19-1032] (BLM) [Entered: 01/04/2019 11:47 AM]
January 4, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Brian J. Slipakoff on behalf of Appellee(s) Litton Loan Servicing; HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Freemont Home Loan Trust 2006-C Mortgage-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-C; Goldman Sachs (incorrectly pled as Goldman Sachs); Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC (incorrectly pled as Ocwen); Ocwen Financial Corporation. [19-1032] (BJS) [Entered: 01/04/2019 11:43 AM]
January 4, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SB) [Entered: 01/04/2019 11:12 AM]
January 4, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Veronica A. Williams in District Court No. 2-16-cv-05301. (SB) [Entered: 01/04/2019 11:04 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Veronica Williams v. Litton Loan Services, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LITTON LOAN SERVICES
Represented By: Brian J. Slipakoff Esq.
Represented By: Stuart I. Seiden Esq.
Represented By: Brett L. Messinger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OCWEN
Represented By: Brian J. Slipakoff Esq.
Represented By: Stuart I. Seiden Esq.
Represented By: Brett L. Messinger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STERN & EISENBURG PC
Represented By: Evan Barenbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC
Represented By: Brian J. Slipakoff Esq.
Represented By: Stuart I. Seiden Esq.
Represented By: Brett L. Messinger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OCWEN FINANCIAL CORP
Represented By: Brian J. Slipakoff Esq.
Represented By: Stuart I. Seiden Esq.
Represented By: Brett L. Messinger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HSBC BANK USA NA
Represented By: Brian J. Slipakoff Esq.
Represented By: Stuart I. Seiden Esq.
Represented By: Brett L. Messinger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FREMONT HOME LOAN TRUST 2006-C MORTGAGE BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2006-C
Represented By: Brian J. Slipakoff Esq.
Represented By: Stuart I. Seiden Esq.
Represented By: Brett L. Messinger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VERONICA A. WILLIAMS
Represented By: Veronica A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?