BP Auto Group LLC, et al v. Reynolds & Reynolds
Plaintiff / Appellant: PICON AUTO GROUP LLC, DBA Newton Kia, PICON AUTO LLC, DBA Taconic Kia and BP AUTO GROUP LLC, DBA Hackettstown Hyundai
Defendant / Appellee: REYNOLDS & REYNOLDS
Case Number: 19-1064
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John C. Allen on behalf of Appellee(s) The Reynolds and Reynolds Company. [19-1064] (JCA) [Entered: 02/12/2019 04:40 PM]
February 12, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Adrienne C. Rogove on behalf of Appellee(s) The Reynolds and Reynolds Company. [19-1064] (ACR) [Entered: 02/12/2019 11:46 AM]
February 11, 2019 ECF FILER: SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION by Appellees to Motion to dismiss for lack or jurisdiction, filed. Certificate of Service dated 02/11/2019. Service made by ECF [19-1064]--[Edited 02/12/2019 by SLC] (ACR) [Entered: 02/11/2019 04:02 PM]
February 5, 2019 Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 02/05/2019 01:19 PM]
January 25, 2019 ECF FILER: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Concise summ of case, Information statement, appellant Transcript Purchase Order. Service made on 01/25/2019 by ECF, US mail. [19-1064] (LPC) [Entered: 01/25/2019 09:35 AM]
January 25, 2019 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants BP Auto Group LLC, Picon Auto Group LLC and Picon Auto LLC, received. [19-1064] (LPC) [Entered: 01/25/2019 09:31 AM]
January 25, 2019 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants BP Auto Group LLC, Picon Auto Group LLC and Picon Auto LLC, filed. [19-1064] (LPC) [Entered: 01/25/2019 09:29 AM]
January 25, 2019 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants BP Auto Group LLC, Picon Auto Group LLC and Picon Auto LLC advising this court that transcripts are not needed. Requested date(s) are: Not applicable, to be filed by Not applicable. [19-1064] (LPC) [Entered: 01/25/2019 09:26 AM]
January 24, 2019 ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellee Reynolds & Reynolds to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction. Certificate of Service dated 01/24/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1064] (ACR) [Entered: 01/24/2019 04:39 PM]
January 24, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Reynolds & Reynolds, filed. [19-1064] (ACR) [Entered: 01/24/2019 04:33 PM]
January 17, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Picon Auto Group LLC, filed. [19-1064] (LPC) [Entered: 01/17/2019 03:53 PM]
January 17, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Picon Auto LLC, filed. [19-1064] (LPC) [Entered: 01/17/2019 03:52 PM]
January 17, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants BP Auto Group LLC, Picon Auto Group LLC and Picon Auto LLC, filed. [19-1064] (LPC) [Entered: 01/17/2019 11:08 AM]
January 17, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lawrence P. Cohen on behalf of Appellant(s) BP Auto Group LLC d/b/a Hackettstown Hyundai; Picon Auto Group LLC d/b/a Newton Kia; Picon Auto LLC d/b/a Taconic Kia. [19-1064] (LPC) [Entered: 01/17/2019 11:03 AM]
January 15, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ethan M. Simon on behalf of Appellee(s) The Reynolds and Reynolds Company. [19-1064] (EMS) [Entered: 01/15/2019 09:23 AM]
January 15, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Adrienne C. Rogove on behalf of Appellee(s) The Reynolds and Reynolds Company. [19-1064] (ACR) [Entered: 01/15/2019 09:15 AM]
January 11, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CLW) [Entered: 01/11/2019 12:32 PM]
January 11, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants BP Auto Group LLC, Picon Auto Group LLC and Picon Auto LLC in District Court No. 3-18-cv-12510. (CLW) [Entered: 01/11/2019 12:28 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: BP Auto Group LLC, et al v. Reynolds & Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PICON AUTO GROUP LLC, DBA Newton Kia
Represented By: Lawrence P. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PICON AUTO LLC, DBA Taconic Kia
Represented By: Lawrence P. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BP AUTO GROUP LLC, DBA Hackettstown Hyundai
Represented By: Lawrence P. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REYNOLDS & REYNOLDS
Represented By: Adrienne C. Rogove Esq.
Represented By: John C. Allen Esq.
Represented By: Ethan M. Simon Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan M. Korn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?