Jerome Kidd v. Commissioner Social Security

Plaintiff / Appellant: JEROME C. KIDD
Defendant / Appellee: COMMISSIONER SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 19-1068
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Jerome C. Kidd due on or before 04/08/2019. Appendix due on or before 04/08/2019.. (PDB) [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:58 AM]
February 26, 2019 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Jerome C. Kidd advising this court that. [19-1068] (AHP) [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:24 AM]
February 26, 2019 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Alan H. Polonsky, Esq. for Jerome C. Kidd requesting the following document(s): Transcript Purchase Order on or before 03/12/2019. (PDB) [Entered: 02/26/2019 10:54 AM]
February 7, 2019 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Jerome C. Kidd, filed. [19-1068] (AHP) [Entered: 02/07/2019 08:17 AM]
February 7, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alan H. Polonsky on behalf of Appellant(s) Jerome C. Kidd. [19-1068] (AHP) [Entered: 02/07/2019 08:09 AM]
February 4, 2019 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Alan H. Polonsky, Esq. for Jerome C. Kidd requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 02/19/2019. Information Statement on or before 02/19/2019. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 02/19/2019. (PDB) [Entered: 02/04/2019 09:53 AM]
February 4, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jordana Cooper on behalf of Appellee(s) Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. [19-1068] (JC) [Entered: 02/04/2019 06:53 AM]
January 9, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR) [Entered: 01/09/2019 11:59 AM]
January 9, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Jerome C. Kidd in District Court No. 3-18-cv-05626. (LMR) [Entered: 01/09/2019 11:54 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jerome Kidd v. Commissioner Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEROME C. KIDD
Represented By: Alan H. Polonsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COMMISSIONER SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: Jordana Cooper Esq.
Represented By: Andrew C. Lynch Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?