Maria Antonio v. Progressive Insurance Co
Defendant / Appellee: PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE CO
Plaintiff / Appellant: MARIA ANTONIO
Case Number: 19-1074
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 02/27/2019 04:01 PM]
February 26, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Progressive Insurance Co, filed. [19-1074] (RED) [Entered: 02/26/2019 06:00 PM]
February 26, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert E. Dapper, Jr. on behalf of Appellee(s) Progressive Insurance Company. [19-1074] (RED) [Entered: 02/26/2019 05:58 PM]
February 12, 2019 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Kathleen P. Dapper, Esq. for Progressive Insurance Co, Robert E. Dapper, Jr., Esq. for Progressive Insurance Co and Daniel J. Twilla, Esq. for Progressive Insurance Co requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 02/26/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 02/26/2019. (JK) [Entered: 02/12/2019 03:22 PM]
February 11, 2019 ECF FILER: TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER (Part III) filed by SHANNAN GAGLIARDI, OCR. for the date(s) of 12/3/2018, 12/4/2018, 12/6/2018 AND 12/7/2018. Transcripts were filed in the District Court on 02/08/2019. [19-1074] (JMG) [Entered: 02/11/2019 04:38 PM]
January 28, 2019 ECF FILER: TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER (Part II) filed by SHANNAN GAGLIARDI, OCR for date(s) of 12/3/18 THRU 12/7/18. [19-1074] (JC) [Entered: 01/28/2019 04:33 PM]
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER to Court Reporter Ms. Joan Carr directing transcripts, ordered on 01/22/2019 , to be filed by 02/25/2019. (CJG) [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:27 PM]
January 22, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Martin J. Beck, Esquire on behalf of Appellant(s) Maria Antonio. [19-1074] (BLN) [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:11 PM]
January 22, 2019 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Maria Antonio, filed. [19-1074] (BLN) [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:10 PM]
January 22, 2019 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Maria Antonio advising this court that transcripts are needed. Requested date(s) are: 12/3/18-12/7/18, to be filed by Shannan Gagliardi. [19-1074] (BLN) [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:08 PM]
January 22, 2019 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Maria Antonio, received. [19-1074] (BLN) [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:03 PM]
January 22, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Bruce L. Neff, Esquire on behalf of Appellant(s) Maria Antonio. [19-1074] (BLN) [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:00 PM]
January 9, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR) [Entered: 01/09/2019 11:39 AM]
January 9, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Maria Antonio in District Court No. 2-16-cv-06055. (LMR) [Entered: 01/09/2019 11:37 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Maria Antonio v. Progressive Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE CO
Represented By: Robert E. Dapper Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Kathleen P. Dapper Esq.
Represented By: Daniel J. Twilla Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARIA ANTONIO
Represented By: Bruce L. Neff Esq.
Represented By: Martin J. Beck Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?