Javier Guzman v. HOVG LLC, et al
Defendant / Appellee: PENDRICK CAPITAL PARTNERS II LLC
Defendant / Appellant: HOVG LLC, DBA Bay Area Credit Services LLC
Plaintiff / Appellee: JAVIER GUZMAN
Case Number: 19-1080
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) dismissing case pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), filed. (ARR) [Entered: 01/18/2019 05:30 PM]
January 18, 2019 ECF FILER: Stipulation to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) filed by Appellant HOVG LLC without costs. Certificate of Service dated 01/18/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1080] (AJB) [Entered: 01/18/2019 11:31 AM]
January 11, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jody T. Lopez-Jacobs on behalf of Appellee(s) Javier Guzman. [19-1080] (JTL) [Entered: 01/11/2019 01:58 PM]
January 11, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Cary L Flitter on behalf of Appellee(s) Javier Guzman. [19-1080] (CLF) [Entered: 01/11/2019 01:56 PM]
January 10, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (ARR) [Entered: 01/10/2019 03:13 PM]
January 10, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant HOVG LLC in District Court No. 2-18-cv-03013. (ARR) [Entered: 01/10/2019 03:07 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Javier Guzman v. HOVG LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PENDRICK CAPITAL PARTNERS II LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Blady Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: HOVG LLC, DBA Bay Area Credit Services LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Blady Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAVIER GUZMAN
Represented By: Cary L. Flitter Esq.
Represented By: Jody T. Lopez-Jacobs Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?