Albert Robinson v. Section 23, Property Owners, et al
Defendant: JASON MATLOY, CURTRIGHT COLLINS TRUITT and LAW FIRM OF CURTRIGHT C. TRUITT PA
Plaintiff / Appellant: ALBERT ROBINSON
Defendant / Appellee: RICHARD BARTON AKIN, II, Esquire, AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, LAW FIRM OF HENDERSON FRANKLIN STARNES & HOLT, DAVID KEITH OAKS, DEVIN CRAIG SHULER, SECTION 23, PROPERTY OWNER'S ASSOCIATION INC, PATRICIA SCHAEFER, STAN WISNIEWSKI, JAMES SHAEFER, STEVEN JOSEPH BUTCHER, MICHAEL PAUL VERSNIK, JOHN MCNAMARA, JAMIE ELAINE MILLER and KEATHEL CHAUNCEY, Esq. as Trustee
Case Number: 19-1081
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Assistant Attorney General Caryn Siperstein-Klein on behalf of Respondent(s) Judge Burns and Judge Porter. [19-1310, 19-1081] (CPS) [Entered: 02/27/2019 03:54 PM]
February 26, 2019 PRO SE APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant Albert Robinson, filed. Certificate of Service dated 02/25/2019 by US mail. (SJB) [Entered: 02/26/2019 03:16 PM]
February 26, 2019 PRO SE BRIEF on behalf of Appellant Albert Robinson, filed. Pages: 24. Certificate of Service dated 02/25/2019 by US mail. (SJB) [Entered: 02/26/2019 03:14 PM]
February 20, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Dennis F Gleason on behalf of Appellee(s) Michael Ross Marsh and Trista Lenore Zimmerman. [19-1081] form was filed in the wrong case. removed from the docket after it was filed in the correct case.--[Edited 02/21/2019 by PDB] (DFG) [Entered: 02/20/2019 12:51 PM]
February 14, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from LINDSAY S. KATZ on behalf of Appellee(s) CURTRIGHT COLLINS TRUITT; THE LAW FIRM OF CURTRIGHT C. TRUITT, P.A..--[Edited 02/15/2019 by PDB] (LSK) [Entered: 02/14/2019 04:00 PM]
February 14, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from ILANA S. HANAU on behalf of Appellee(s) CURTRIGHT COLLINS TRUITT; THE LAW FIRM OF CURTRIGHT C. TRUITT, P.A..--[Edited 02/15/2019 by PDB] (ISH) [Entered: 02/14/2019 03:40 PM]
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) The motion is granted to the extent Appellant is requesting that a second comma be added to the first defendant's name as this was the name reflected on the District Court docket and the name used in the first amended complaint filed in District Court. The caption will also be amended to add Defendant Steven Joseph Butcher as he was inadvertently not added when the case was opened, filed. (See Order for Full Text). (PDB) [Entered: 02/08/2019 02:32 PM]
February 8, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David James Melvin on behalf of Appellee(s) Suzanne Barnhart, Bonafide Properties, LLC, Keathel Chauncey, Bruce Emerson, Zachary Heathcote, Scott Hundley, Fresh Leagal Perspective, PL., David Melvin, Chelsea Smith Scott, and Ellie Teng.--[Edited 02/13/2019 by PDB] (DJM) [Entered: 02/08/2019 02:08 PM]
January 28, 2019 MOTION filed by Appellant Albert Robinson to Correct Name In Styles. Certificate of Service dated 01/30/2019. Service made by ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 01/30/2019 06:15 PM]
January 25, 2019 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Lindsay S. Katz, Esq. for Curtright Collins Truitt and Law Firm of Curtright C. Truitt PA, David James Melvin, Esq. for Keathel Chauncey and Gary R. Shendell, Esq. for Curtright Collins Truitt and Law Firm of Curtright C. Truitt PA requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 02/08/2019. (PDB) [Entered: 01/25/2019 12:44 PM]
January 24, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Law Firm of Henderson Franklin Starnes & Holt, filed. [19-1081] (GDW) [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:44 PM]
January 24, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Auto Owners Insurance Company, filed. [19-1081] (GDW) [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:43 PM]
January 24, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Section 23 Property Owner's Association Inc, filed. [19-1081] (GDW) [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:41 PM]
January 18, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Gregg D. Weinstock on behalf of Appellee(s) Section 23 Property Owner's Association, Inc. James Shaefer, John McNamara, Auto Owners Insurance Co., The Law Firm of Henderson, Franklin, Starnes & Holt, P.A., Richard Barton Akin, II, Michael Paul Versnik and Patricia Schaefer. [19-1081] (GDW) [Entered: 01/18/2019 01:06 PM]
January 17, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Albert Robinson due on or before 02/26/2019. Appendix due on or before 02/26/2019. (PDB) [Entered: 01/17/2019 02:36 PM]
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) To facilitate electronic filing for larger groups of parties represented by the same attorney, the first named party in each group will be the designated filer, as follows: For all parties represented by David James Melvin, Esq., or any other attorney from Fresh Legal Perspective, PL, the designated filer shall be Keathel Chauncey. Counsel is advised that the designated filer is for cm/ecf filing purposes only. Names of all represented parties must be listed on all forms, motions and briefs. Attorneys representing smaller groups of parties must select all individual persons or entities as filers in cm/ecf, filed. (PDB) [Entered: 01/10/2019 05:18 PM]
January 10, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 01/10/2019 05:13 PM]
January 10, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Albert Robinson in District Court No. 1-16-cv-09384. (PDB) [Entered: 01/10/2019 05:10 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Albert Robinson v. Section 23, Property Owners, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON MATLOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CURTRIGHT COLLINS TRUITT
Represented By: Lindsay S. Katz Esq.
Represented By: Gary R. Shendell Esq.
Represented By: Ilana S. Hanau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAW FIRM OF CURTRIGHT C. TRUITT PA
Represented By: Lindsay S. Katz Esq.
Represented By: Gary R. Shendell Esq.
Represented By: Ilana S. Hanau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALBERT ROBINSON
Represented By: Albert Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD BARTON AKIN, II, Esquire
Represented By: Gregg D. Weinstock Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Gregg D. Weinstock Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAW FIRM OF HENDERSON FRANKLIN STARNES & HOLT
Represented By: Gregg D. Weinstock Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID KEITH OAKS
Represented By: David Keith Oaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEVIN CRAIG SHULER
Represented By: Devin Craig Shuler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SECTION 23, PROPERTY OWNER'S ASSOCIATION INC
Represented By: Gregg D. Weinstock Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRICIA SCHAEFER
Represented By: Gregg D. Weinstock Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STAN WISNIEWSKI
Represented By: Stan Wisniewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES SHAEFER
Represented By: Gregg D. Weinstock Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVEN JOSEPH BUTCHER
Represented By: Steven Joseph Butcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL PAUL VERSNIK
Represented By: Gregg D. Weinstock Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN MCNAMARA
Represented By: Gregg D. Weinstock Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMIE ELAINE MILLER
Represented By: Jamie Elaine Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEATHEL CHAUNCEY, Esq. as Trustee
Represented By: David J. Melvin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?