In Re: Processed Egg Products, et al, et al
Defendant: MIDWEST POULTRY SERVICES LP, CAL-MAINE FOODS INC, HILLANDALE GETTYSBURG LP, HILLANDALE FARMS OF PA INC, NATIONAL FOOD CORP, OHIO FRESH EGGS LLC, DAYBREAK FOODS INC, UNITED EGG PRODUCERS, UNITED STATES EGG MARKETERS INC, NUCAL FOODS INC, MICHAEL FOODS INC and R.W. SAUDER INC
Plaintiff / Appellee: GOLDBERG & SOLOVY FOODS INC, WIXON INC, SENSORYEFFECTS FLAVOR CO, DBA SensoryEffects Flavor Systems, JOHN A. LISCIANDRO, DBA Lisciandro's Restaurant, EBY-BROWN CO LLC, T.K. RIBBINGS FAMILY RESTAURANT, NUSSBAUM SF INC, SOMERSET INDUSTRIES and KARETASFOODS INC
Defendant / Appellant: ROSE ACRE FARMS INC
Appellant: NATIONAL COUNCIL OF FARMER COOPERATIVES
Case Number: 19-1188
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 98 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Jay L. Levine, Esq. for Appellee Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1088, Attorney Jay L. Levine, Esq. for Appellant Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1188. Counsel is unavailable from March 4-18, April 7-18, 2020, May 28-29, 2020, July 9, 2020, July 29-30, 2020, September 18 and 21, 2020, September 28, 2020 and October 2-9, 2020.. [19-1088, 19-1188] (JLL) [Entered: 01/09/2020 11:59 AM]
January 3, 2020 Filing 97 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Steven E. Bizar, Esq. for Appellee R.W. Sauder Inc in 19-1088 Letter to the Court regarding participation in appeal.. Certificate of Service dated 01/03/2020. Service made by ECF. [19-1188, 19-1088] (SEB) [Entered: 01/03/2020 11:36 AM]
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) The foregoing motion by Appellants for leave to file Volumes 4-7 of Joint Appendix under seal is referred to the merits panel. The Clerk will hold Volumes 4 through 7 of the joint appendix provisionally under seal pending a ruling by the Court. [19-1088, 19-1188] (EMA) [Entered: 11/14/2019 02:34 PM]
November 11, 2019 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Jay L. Levine, Esq. for Appellee Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1088, Attorney Jay L. Levine, Esq. for Appellant Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1188. Counsel is unavailable for the following dates: 01/21/2020, 01/22/2020, 01/23/2020, 01/24/2020, [19-1088, 19-1188] (JLL) [Entered: 11/11/2019 11:45 AM]
November 8, 2019 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellee Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1088, Appellant Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1188 - Reply Brief. Copies: 7. [19-1088, 19-1188] (RM) [Entered: 11/08/2019 11:48 AM]
November 5, 2019 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC REPLY BRIEF on behalf of Appellee Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1088, Appellant Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1188. Certificate of Service dated 11/05/2019 by ECF. [19-1088, 19-1188] (JLL) [Entered: 11/05/2019 01:56 PM]
November 1, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Leah A. Mintz on behalf of Appellant(s) Rose Acre Farms, Inc.. [19-1188] (LAM) [Entered: 11/01/2019 10:30 AM]
October 23, 2019 COMPLIANCE RECEIVED. Addendum containing identical certification received from Appellant/Cross-Appellees Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro and T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant in 19-1088, 19-1188. [19-1088, 19-1188] (EAF) [Entered: 10/28/2019 10:47 AM]
October 23, 2019 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC ADDENDUM to BRIEF on behalf of Appellants Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro and T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant in 19-1088 containing Certificate Regarding Paper Copies. Certificate of Service dated 10/23/2019 by ECF. [19-1088, 19-1188] (KMS) [Entered: 10/23/2019 04:14 PM]
October 23, 2019 TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) directing Attorney Kathleen M. Sullivan, Esq. for Appellant/Cross-Appellees T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant, John A. Lisciandro, Eby-Brown Co LLC and KaretasFoods Inc in 19-1088, 9-1188 to file an Addendum containing the omitted identical certification for the Third Step Reply Brief filed on 10/15/19 in electronic format ONLY, filed. Due on or before 10/28/2019. [19-1088, 19-1188] (EAF) [Entered: 10/23/2019 01:07 PM]
October 22, 2019 ECF FILER: Request by Appellants KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro, Eby-Brown Co LLC and T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant in 19-1088 for Oral Argument. Certificate of Service dated 10/22/2019. Service made by ECF. [SEND TO MERITS PANEL] [19-1088, 19-1188] (KMS) [Entered: 10/22/2019 07:47 PM]
October 17, 2019 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro and T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant in 19-1088 - Reply Brief. Copies: 7. [19-1088, 19-1188] (SJB) [Entered: 10/17/2019 11:26 AM]
October 15, 2019 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC THIRD STEP BRIEF on behalf of Appellant/Cross-Appellees Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro and T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant in 19-1088/19-1188. Certificate of Service dated 10/15/2019 by ECF. --[Edited 10/23/2019 by EAF- Text edited] [19-1088, 19-1188] (KMS) [Entered: 10/15/2019 10:41 PM]
October 8, 2019 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellee Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1088, Appellant Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1188 - Brief. Copies: 7. [19-1088, 19-1188] (KEL) [Entered: 10/08/2019 12:48 PM]
October 7, 2019 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro and T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant in 19-1088 - Brief. Copies: 7. [19-1088, 19-1188] (KEL) [Entered: 10/07/2019 12:46 PM]
October 4, 2019 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC FINAL BRIEF on behalf of Appellee Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1088, Appellant Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1188. Certificate of Service dated 10/04/2019 by ECF. [19-1088, 19-1188]--[Edited 10/08/2019 by MCW] (JLL) [Entered: 10/04/2019 06:29 PM]
October 4, 2019 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC FINAL BRIEF on behalf of Appellants/Cross-Appellees Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro and T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant in 19-1088, 19-1188. Certificate of Service dated 10/04/2019 by ECF. [19-1088, 19-1188]--[Edited 10/08/2019 by MCW] (KMS) [Entered: 10/04/2019 04:42 PM]
October 1, 2019 TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) granting unopposed motion for leave to file deferred joint appendix out of time filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant, John A. Lisciandro, Eby-Brown Co LLC and KaretasFoods Inc., with filing as of September 27, 2019. [19-1088, 19-1188] (ARR) [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:57 PM]
September 30, 2019 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro and T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant in 19-1088, Appellees Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro and T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant in 19-1188 - Deferred Joint Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 7 (Volumes 4 - 7 FILED UNDER SEAL). [19-1088, 19-1188] (EMA) [Entered: 10/01/2019 04:52 PM]
September 27, 2019 ECF FILER: SEALED ELECTRONIC DEFERRED JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro and T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant in 19-1088, Appellees Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro and T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant in 19-1188. Certificate of Service dated 09/27/2019 by ECF. [19-1088, 19-1188] (KMS) [Entered: 09/27/2019 04:16 PM]
September 27, 2019 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC DEFERRED JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro and T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant in 19-1088, Appellees Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro and T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant in 19-1188. Certificate of service dated 09/27/2019 by ECF. [19-1088, 19-1188] (KMS) [Entered: 09/27/2019 04:13 PM]
September 27, 2019 ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro and T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant in 19-1088, 19-1188 to seal certain documents in the Joint Appendix. Certificate of Service dated 09/27/2019. Service made by ECF. [Entry edited to reflect all party filers] [19-1088, 19-1188]--[Edited 10/01/2019 by EMA] (KMS) [Entered: 09/27/2019 02:09 PM]
September 27, 2019 ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro and T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant in 19-1088, 19-1188 to file Deferred Joint Appendix out of time. Certificate of Service dated 09/27/2019. Service made by ECF. [Entry edited to reflect all party filers] [19-1088, 19-1188]--[Edited 10/01/2019 by EMA] (KMS) [Entered: 09/27/2019 02:03 PM]
September 20, 2019 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Amicus Appellee National Council of Farmer Cooperatives in 19-1088, Amicus Appellant National Council of Farmer Cooperatives in 19-1188 - Amicus Brief. Copies: 7. Received: 10. [19-1088, 19-1188] (LM) [Entered: 09/20/2019 11:34 AM]
September 19, 2019 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC AMICUS BRIEF on behalf of National Council of Farmer Cooperatives. Certificate of Service dated 09/19/2019 by ECF. F.R.A.P. 29(a) Permission: YES. [19-1188, 19-1088] (MAL) [Entered: 09/19/2019 02:48 PM]
September 18, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael A. Lindsay on behalf of Amicus Curiae National Council of Farmer Cooperatives. [19-1188, 19-1088] (MAL) [Entered: 09/18/2019 03:18 PM]
September 18, 2019 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellee Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1088, Appellant Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1188 - Proof Brief. Copies: 1. [19-1088, 19-1188] (LM) [Entered: 09/18/2019 11:54 AM]
September 12, 2019 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC PROOF BRIEF on behalf of Appellee Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1088, Appellant Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1188, filed. Certificate of Service dated 09/12/2019 by ECF. [19-1088, 19-1188] (JLL) [Entered: 09/12/2019 07:10 PM]
July 30, 2019 TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) granting unopposed motion filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Rose Acre Farms Inc. for extension of time to file second-step brief until September 12, 2019. Counsel is advised to review the Court's Notice of October 15, 2012 advising that extensions of time are disfavored, filed. [19-1088, 19-1188] (ARR) [Entered: 07/30/2019 06:38 PM]
July 25, 2019 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants/Cross-Appellees Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro and T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant in 19-1088, 19-1188 - PROOF Brief. Copies: 1. [Entry edited to reflect all party filers] [19-1088, 19-1188]--[Edited 08/19/2019 by EMA] (SJB) [Entered: 07/25/2019 11:45 AM]
July 23, 2019 TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) directing Attorney Kathleen M. Sullivan, Esq. for Appellants T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant, John A. Lisciandro, Eby-Brown Co LLC and KaretasFoods Inc in 19-1088, Attorney Kathleen M. Sullivan, Esq. for Appellees, T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant, John A. Lisciandro, Eby-Brown Co LLC and KaretasFoods Inc in 19-1188 to submit 1 hard copy in blue front & back covers for the Proof Brief filed on 6/27/19, filed. Due on or before 07/29/2019. [19-1088, 19-1188] (EAF) [Entered: 07/23/2019 04:10 PM]
July 18, 2019 ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellant Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1188 for Extension of Time to file Opening brief and cross-appeal brief until/for September 12, 2019. Certificate of Service dated 07/18/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1088, 19-1188]--[Edited 07/18/2019 by KR] (JLL) [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:37 AM]
June 27, 2019 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC PROOF BRIEF on behalf of Appellants/Cross-Appellees Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro and T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant in 19-1088, 19-1188, filed. Certificate of Service dated 06/27/2019 by ECF. --[Edited 07/06/2019 by EAF - Text edited] [19-1088, 19-1188] (KMS) [Entered: 06/27/2019 11:04 PM]
May 31, 2019 TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) granting unopposed motion for extension of time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant, John A. Lisciandro, Eby-Brown Co LLC and KaretasFoods Inc. until June 27, 2019. Counsel is advised to review the Court's Notice of October 15, 2012 advising that extensions of time are disfavored. [19-1088, 19-1188] (ARR) [Entered: 05/31/2019 05:12 PM]
May 23, 2019 ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro and T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant in 19-1088, Appellees Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro and T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant in 19-1188 for Extension of Time to file opening brief until/for 6/27/2019. Certificate of Service dated 05/23/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1088, 19-1188] (KMS) [Entered: 05/23/2019 11:07 PM]
May 14, 2019 ECF FILER: Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney filed by Appellee Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1088, Appellant Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1188. Certificate of Service dated 05/14/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1088, 19-1188] (JCS) [Entered: 05/14/2019 03:46 PM]
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) The motion is granted. The appendix must be filed and served within seven (7) days of the date of service of Appellee/Cross-Appellant's brief. On or before the established briefing deadlines, the parties must file and serve only the electronic version of the briefs containing references to the record. The parties must re-file and re-serve the electronic version of the briefs and file all required paper copies containing references to the appendix within 7 days of the date the appendix is filed. See Fed. R. App. P. 30(c)(2)(B); 3d Cir. L.A.R. 31.1(a), filed. [19-1088, 19-1188] (PDB) [Entered: 05/08/2019 04:35 PM]
May 8, 2019 Appellants Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro and T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant in 19-1088, verbally granted an extension of time to file brief & appendix until 05/28/2019. pursuant to Third Cir. LAR 31.4. [19-1088, 19-1188] (PDB) [Entered: 05/08/2019 03:23 PM]
April 25, 2019 ECF FILER: JOINT Motion filed by Appellants T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant, Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc and John A. Lisciandro in 19-1088, Appellees Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro and T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant in 19-1188 for leave to file a deferred appendix. Certificate of Service dated 04/25/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1088, 19-1188] (KMS) [Entered: 04/25/2019 12:58 PM]
April 19, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert M. Palumbos on behalf of Appellee(s) Rose Acre Farms Inc.. [19-1088, 19-1188] (RMP) [Entered: 04/19/2019 09:58 AM]
April 4, 2019 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Jay L. Levine, Esq. for Appellee Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1088 Letter pursuant to Pennsylvania Rule of Professional Conduct 1.12(c). Certificate of Service dated 04/04/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1088, 19-1188] (JLL) [Entered: 04/04/2019 03:45 PM]
April 2, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. 1st Brief on behalf of Brief on behalf of Appellants Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro, T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant and Rose Acre Farms Inc due on or before 05/13/2019. Appendix due on or before 05/13/2019. [19-1088, 19-1188] (PDB) [Entered: 04/02/2019 04:19 PM]
March 14, 2019 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Joseph M. Callow, Jr., Esq. for Appellee Ohio Fresh Eggs LLC in 19-1188, 19-1088 to Clerk in Response to March 8, 2019 Letter. Certificate of Service dated 03/14/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1188, 19-1088] (JMC) [Entered: 03/14/2019 12:03 PM]
March 13, 2019 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Carrie C. Mahan, Esq. for Appellee Michael Foods Inc in 19-1088, 19-1188 to Clerk in response to the March 8, 2019 letter. Certificate of Service dated 03/13/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1088, 19-1188] (CCM) [Entered: 03/13/2019 05:56 PM]
March 12, 2019 ECF FILER: LETTER from Steven E. Bizar, Esq. for Appellee R.W. Sauder Inc and Julia Chapman, Esq. for Appellee R.W. Sauder Inc Letter to Ms. Dodszuweit regarding the Appearance Form and Disclosure Statement in Case No. 19-1188. Certificate of Service dated 03/12/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1188] (SEB) [Entered: 03/12/2019 05:16 PM]
March 8, 2019 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Steven E. Bizar, Esq. for R.W. Sauder Inc, Joseph M. Callow, Jr., Esq. for Ohio Fresh Eggs LLC, Julia Chapman, Esq. for R.W. Sauder Inc, Sarah V. Geiger, Esq. for Ohio Fresh Eggs LLC, William L. Greene, Esq. for Michael Foods Inc, Ryan M. Hurley, Esq. for Midwest Poultry Services LP, Christine C. Levin, Esq. for United Egg Producers and R.W. Sauder Inc, Jan P. Levine, Esq. for United States Egg Marketers Inc, Carrie C. Mahan, Esq. for Michael Foods Inc, Christopher E. Ondeck, Esq. for Daybreak Foods Inc, Kathy L. Osborn, Esq. for Midwest Poultry Services LP, Brian E. Robison, Esq. for Cal-Maine Foods Inc, Ms. Samantha L. Southall, Esq. for Hillandale Farms of PA Inc and Hillandale Gettysburg LP, Robin P. Sumner, Esq. for United Egg Producers and United States Egg Marketers Inc, Jason Takenouchi, Esq. for NuCal Foods Inc, Margaret Ziemianek, Esq. for NuCal Foods Inc and Marvin L. Gray, Esq. for National Food Corp requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 03/22/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 03/22/2019. (PDB) [Entered: 03/08/2019 10:43 AM]
March 8, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James A. King on behalf of Appellant(s) Rose Acre Farms, Inc.. [19-1188] (JCS) [Entered: 03/08/2019 08:36 AM]
February 8, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro and T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant, filed. [19-1188] (KMS) [Entered: 02/08/2019 06:42 PM]
February 8, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stephen R. Neuwirth on behalf of Appellee(s) T.K. Ribbing's Family Restaurant, LLC, John A. Lisciandro d/b/a Lisciandro's Restaurant, Eby-Brown Company LLC, and Karetas Foods, Inc., on behalf of certified class of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. [19-1188] (SRN) [Entered: 02/08/2019 06:37 PM]
February 8, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kathleen M. Sullivan on behalf of Appellee(s) T.K. Ribbing's Family Restaurant, LLC, John A. Lisciandro d/b/a Lisciandro's Restaurant, Eby-Brown Company LLC, and Karetas Foods, Inc., on behalf of certified class of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. [19-1188] (KMS) [Entered: 02/08/2019 06:16 PM]
February 8, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ronald J. Aranoff on behalf of Appellee(s) T.K. Ribbing's Family Restaurant, LLC, John A. Lisciandro d/b/a Lisciandro's Restaurant, Eby-Brown Company LLC, and Karetas Foods, Inc., on behalf of certified class of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. [19-1188] (RJA) [Entered: 02/08/2019 02:21 PM]
February 8, 2019 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1188 advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court.--[Edited 02/08/2019 by PDB] (JCS) [Entered: 02/08/2019 10:36 AM]
February 8, 2019 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1188, filed.--[Edited 02/08/2019 by PDB] (JCS) [Entered: 02/08/2019 10:34 AM]
February 8, 2019 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1188, received.--[Edited 02/08/2019 by PDB] (JCS) [Entered: 02/08/2019 10:31 AM]
January 29, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jay L. Levine on behalf of Appellant(s) Rose Acre Farms, Inc.. [19-1188, 19-1088] (JCS) [Entered: 01/29/2019 04:56 PM]
January 29, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1188, filed. [19-1188, 19-1088] (JCS) [Entered: 01/29/2019 04:37 PM]
January 29, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jetta C. Sandin on behalf of Appellant(s) Rose Acre Farms, Inc.. [19-1188, 19-1088] (JCS) [Entered: 01/29/2019 04:30 PM]
January 29, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Donald M. Barnes on behalf of Appellant(s) Rose Acre Farms, Inc.. [19-1188, 19-1088] (DMB) [Entered: 01/29/2019 04:28 PM]
January 25, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 01/25/2019 04:12 PM]
January 25, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Rose Acre Farms Inc in District Court No. 2-08-md-02002. (PDB) [Entered: 01/25/2019 04:11 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In Re: Processed Egg Products, et al, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDWEST POULTRY SERVICES LP
Represented By: Ryan M. Hurley Esq.
Represented By: Kathy L. Osborn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAL-MAINE FOODS INC
Represented By: Brian E. Robison Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILLANDALE GETTYSBURG LP
Represented By: Samantha L. Southall Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILLANDALE FARMS OF PA INC
Represented By: Samantha L. Southall Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL FOOD CORP
Represented By: Marvin L. Gray Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OHIO FRESH EGGS LLC
Represented By: Sarah V. Geiger Esq.
Represented By: Joseph M. Callow Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAYBREAK FOODS INC
Represented By: Christopher E. Ondeck Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED EGG PRODUCERS
Represented By: Robin P. Sumner Esq.
Represented By: Christine C. Levin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES EGG MARKETERS INC
Represented By: Jan P. Levine Esq.
Represented By: Robin P. Sumner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NUCAL FOODS INC
Represented By: Jason Takenouchi Esq.
Represented By: Margaret Ziemianek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL FOODS INC
Represented By: William L. Greene Esq.
Represented By: Carrie C. Mahan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.W. SAUDER INC
Represented By: Julia Chapman Esq.
Represented By: Steven E. Bizar Esq.
Represented By: Christine C. Levin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GOLDBERG & SOLOVY FOODS INC
Represented By: Stephen D. Susman Esq.
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth Esq.
Represented By: Mindee J. Reuben Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan Esq.
Represented By: Michael D. Hausfeld Esq.
Represented By: Ronald J. Aranoff Esq.
Represented By: Stanley D. Bernstein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WIXON INC
Represented By: Stephen D. Susman Esq.
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth Esq.
Represented By: Mindee J. Reuben Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan Esq.
Represented By: Michael D. Hausfeld Esq.
Represented By: Ronald J. Aranoff Esq.
Represented By: Stanley D. Bernstein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SENSORYEFFECTS FLAVOR CO, DBA SensoryEffects Flavor Systems
Represented By: Stephen D. Susman Esq.
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth Esq.
Represented By: Mindee J. Reuben Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan Esq.
Represented By: Michael D. Hausfeld Esq.
Represented By: Ronald J. Aranoff Esq.
Represented By: Stanley D. Bernstein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHN A. LISCIANDRO, DBA Lisciandro's Restaurant
Represented By: Stephen D. Susman Esq.
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth Esq.
Represented By: Mindee J. Reuben Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan Esq.
Represented By: Michael D. Hausfeld Esq.
Represented By: Ronald J. Aranoff Esq.
Represented By: Stanley D. Bernstein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EBY-BROWN CO LLC
Represented By: Stephen D. Susman Esq.
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth Esq.
Represented By: Mindee J. Reuben Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan Esq.
Represented By: Michael D. Hausfeld Esq.
Represented By: Ronald J. Aranoff Esq.
Represented By: Stanley D. Bernstein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: T.K. RIBBINGS FAMILY RESTAURANT
Represented By: Stephen D. Susman Esq.
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth Esq.
Represented By: Mindee J. Reuben Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan Esq.
Represented By: Michael D. Hausfeld Esq.
Represented By: Ronald J. Aranoff Esq.
Represented By: Stanley D. Bernstein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NUSSBAUM SF INC
Represented By: Stephen D. Susman Esq.
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth Esq.
Represented By: Mindee J. Reuben Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan Esq.
Represented By: Michael D. Hausfeld Esq.
Represented By: Ronald J. Aranoff Esq.
Represented By: Stanley D. Bernstein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SOMERSET INDUSTRIES
Represented By: Stephen D. Susman Esq.
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth Esq.
Represented By: Mindee J. Reuben Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan Esq.
Represented By: Michael D. Hausfeld Esq.
Represented By: Ronald J. Aranoff Esq.
Represented By: Stanley D. Bernstein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KARETASFOODS INC
Represented By: Stephen D. Susman Esq.
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth Esq.
Represented By: Mindee J. Reuben Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan Esq.
Represented By: Michael D. Hausfeld Esq.
Represented By: Ronald J. Aranoff Esq.
Represented By: Stanley D. Bernstein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ROSE ACRE FARMS INC
Represented By: Jay L. Levine Esq.
Represented By: James A. King Esq.
Represented By: Jetta C. Sandin Esq.
Represented By: Donald M. Barnes Esq.
Represented By: Robert M. Palumbos Esq.
Represented By: Leah A. Mintz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: NATIONAL COUNCIL OF FARMER COOPERATIVES
Represented By: Michael A. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?