Green Tree Servicing LLC v. David Cargille, et al
Defendant / Appellee: SAFEGUARD REAL ESTATE PROPERTIES LLC, SAFEGUARD REALTY MANAGEMENT OF NEW YORK CO, ERIKA LANCE, SAFEGUARD PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT LLC, NATIONWIDE TITLE CLEARING, DBA NTC, CHRISTOPHER JONES, NEW YORK FIELD SERVICING, RONALD SIMPSON and KML LAW GROUP PC
Plaintiff / Appellee: GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC, NKA Ditech Financial LLC
Defendant / Appellant: JULIE L. CARGILLE and DAVID L. CARGILLE
Case Number: 19-1437
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 CLERK ORDER dismissing case, pursuant to F.R.A.P. 10(b) and 3rd Cir. LAR 11.1 and LAR Misc. 107.1(b), for failure to order a transcript of the lower court proceedings or to notify the Court that a transcript was not necessary for the prosecution of this appeal and for failure to file an entry of apperance, civil case information statement and concise summary of case. Case Terminated on 04/18/2019. (SLC) [Entered: 04/18/2019 02:36 PM]
April 4, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Andrew Christopher Sayles on behalf of Appellee(s) KML Law Group, P.C.. [19-1437] (ACS) [Entered: 04/04/2019 03:12 PM]
March 26, 2019 ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Green Tree Servicing LLC to clerk order. Certificate of Service dated 03/26/2019. [19-1437] (HFR) [Entered: 03/26/2019 12:00 PM]
March 21, 2019 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Gina Calabria, Esq. for Safeguard Properties Management LLC, Safeguard Real Estate Properties LLC, Safeguard Realty Management of New York Co and New York Field Servicing, Anne M. Dalena, Esq. for Safeguard Properties Management LLC, Safeguard Real Estate Properties LLC, Safeguard Realty Management of New York Co and New York Field Servicing, Andrew C. Sayles, Esq. for KML Law Group PC and Janeen M. Thomas, Esq. for Safeguard Properties Management LLC, Safeguard Real Estate Properties LLC, Safeguard Realty Management of New York Co and New York Field Servicing requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 04/04/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 04/04/2019. (SLC) [Entered: 03/21/2019 09:28 AM]
March 21, 2019 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Joshua W. Denbeaux, Esq. for David L. Cargille and Julie L. Cargille requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 04/04/2019. Information Statement on or before 04/04/2019. Concise Summary on or before 04/04/2019. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 04/04/2019. (SLC) [Entered: 03/21/2019 09:24 AM]
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) Directing responses to be filed. The Court has received a Suggestion of Bankruptcy from Green Tree Servicing LLC n/k/a Ditech Financial LLC. It is noted that Ditech Financial LLC was the plaintiff in the court below at its inception. As such, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file written statements addressing the applicability of the automatic stay to this case. See Maritime Electric Co. v. United Jersey Bank, 959 F.2d 1194, 1204-05 (3d Cir. 1991); Assoc. of St. Croix Condominium Owners v. St. Croix Hotel Corp., 682 F.2d 446-48 (3d Cir. 1982). The parties must file their written statements within 14 days of the date of this order, filed. (SLC) [Entered: 03/15/2019 11:53 AM]
March 11, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Betsy Ann Rosenbloom, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Third Party Defendants Nationwide Title Clearing d/b/a NTC and Erika Lance. [19-1437] (BR) [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:19 PM]
March 8, 2019 ECF FILER: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY received from Appellee Green Tree Servicing LLC. Certificate of Service dated 03/08/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1437] (HFR) [Entered: 03/08/2019 03:57 PM]
March 8, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Henry F. Reichner on behalf of Respondent(s) Green Tree Servicing LLC nka Ditech Financial, LLC. [19-1437] (HFR) [Entered: 03/08/2019 03:46 PM]
March 1, 2019 CLERK ORDER advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. The notice of appeal indicates that Appellants are seeking review of a District Court judgment entered February 24, 2018. No such order appears on the District Court docket. In addition, it appears that there are claims still pending in the District Court. Further, none of the orders dismissing Appellants' counterclaims and/or third party claims have been certified under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b). All parties must file written responses addressing these issues, with a certificate of service attached, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order, filed. (SLC) [Entered: 03/01/2019 07:37 AM]
March 1, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SLC) [Entered: 03/01/2019 07:34 AM]
March 1, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants David L. Cargille and Julie L. Cargille in District Court No. 3-15-cv-00938. (SLC) [Entered: 03/01/2019 07:31 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Green Tree Servicing LLC v. David Cargille, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAFEGUARD REAL ESTATE PROPERTIES LLC
Represented By: Gina Calabria Esq.
Represented By: Janeen M. Thomas Esq.
Represented By: Anne M. Dalena Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAFEGUARD REALTY MANAGEMENT OF NEW YORK CO
Represented By: Gina Calabria Esq.
Represented By: Janeen M. Thomas Esq.
Represented By: Anne M. Dalena Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERIKA LANCE
Represented By: Betsy Ann Rosenbloom Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAFEGUARD PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT LLC
Represented By: Gina Calabria Esq.
Represented By: Janeen M. Thomas Esq.
Represented By: Anne M. Dalena Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONWIDE TITLE CLEARING, DBA NTC
Represented By: Betsy Ann Rosenbloom Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTOPHER JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEW YORK FIELD SERVICING
Represented By: Gina Calabria Esq.
Represented By: Janeen M. Thomas Esq.
Represented By: Anne M. Dalena Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RONALD SIMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KML LAW GROUP PC
Represented By: Andrew C. Sayles Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC, NKA Ditech Financial LLC
Represented By: Aaron M. Bender Esq.
Represented By: Henry F. Reichner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JULIE L. CARGILLE
Represented By: Joshua W. Denbeaux Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DAVID L. CARGILLE
Represented By: Joshua W. Denbeaux Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?