Giuseppe Giudice v. Attorney General United States
Petitioner: GIUSEPPE GIUDICE, a/k/a Joe Giudice
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Not Yet Classified: STEVEN ABRAMS, PAUL W. SCHMIDT, LORY D. ROSENBERG, Esq., TEOFILO CHAPA, MATTHEW J. D'ANGELO, REBECCA JAMIL, GUSTAVO D. VILLAGELIU MEMBER, SUSAN ROY, GEORGE T. CHEW, CHARLES E. PAZAR, JOHN F. GOSSART, NOEL FERRIS, BRUCE J. EINHORN, ANDREA H. SLOAN, MIRIAM HAYWARD, CECELIA ESPENOZA, JOHN W. RICHARDSON, WILLIAM VAN WYKE, CAROL KING, WILLIAM JOYCE, MARGARET MCMANUS, ELIZABETH A. LAMB, POLLY A. WEBBER, ESMERALDA CABRERA, LAURA RAMIREZ, JEFFREY S. CHASE, MD and DENISE N. SLAVIN
Case Number: 19-1869
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 29, 2020 Giuseppe Giudice v. Attorney General United States

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) granting unopposed motion for extension of time to file brief and appendix filed by Petitioner Giuseppe Giudice until July 15, 2019. Counsel is advised to review the Court's Notice of October 15, 2012 advising that extensions of time are disfavored, filed. (ARR) [Entered: 06/11/2019 02:55 PM]
June 7, 2019 ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Petitioner Giuseppe Giudice for Extension of Time to file opening brief until/for July 15. Certificate of Service dated 06/07/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1869] (TEM) [Entered: 06/07/2019 02:48 PM]
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (AMBRO and KRAUSE, Circuit Judges) The petitioner's motion for a stay of removal is granted. The temporary stay of removal previously granted is vacated as no longer necessary. Petitioner's unopposed motions to seal Exhibit C to the Moseley Declaration and to amend/correct his stay motion are granted. The Motion by "27 Former Immigration Judges, etc." to proceed as amicus is granted, filed. Panel No.: BLD-184. Krause, Authoring Judge. (CJG) [Entered: 05/22/2019 01:56 PM]
May 15, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alina Das on behalf of Amicus Curiae Former Immigration Judges and Members of the Board of Immigration Appeals (see notice attachment for list of individuals). [19-1869] (AD) [Entered: 05/15/2019 04:41 PM]
May 15, 2019 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC AMICUS BRIEF on behalf of Former Immigration Judges and Members of the Board of Immigration Appeals in support of Appellant/Petitioner, filed. Certificate of Service dated 05/15/2019 by ECF. F.R.A.P. 29(a) Permission: NO. [19-1869] (AD) [Entered: 05/15/2019 04:39 PM]
May 13, 2019 ECF FILER: Motion filed by 27 Former Immigration Judges and Members of Board of Immigration Appeals (see Appendix A of propose brief) to proceed as amicus in support of Appellant/Petitioner. Certificate of Service dated 05/13/2019. [19-1869] (AD) [Entered: 05/13/2019 02:59 PM]
May 13, 2019 ECF FILER: Reply Declaration filed by Petitioner Giuseppe Giudice. Certificate of Service dated 05/13/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1869]--[Edited 05/13/2019 by JK] (TEM) [Entered: 05/13/2019 10:11 AM]
May 13, 2019 ECF FILER: REPLY filed by Petitioner Giuseppe Giudice in Support of the Motion to stay removal. Certificate of Service dated 05/13/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1869]--[Edited 05/13/2019 by JK] (TEM) [Entered: 05/13/2019 10:09 AM]
May 6, 2019 ECF FILER: CORRECTED Motion filed by Petitioner Giuseppe Giudice to stay removal. Certificate of Service dated 05/06/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1869] (TEM) [Entered: 05/06/2019 11:58 AM]
May 6, 2019 ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Petitioner Giuseppe Giudice to amend Stay motion is amended to add record references and correct typographical errors. Certificate of Service dated 05/06/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1869] (TEM) [Entered: 05/06/2019 11:52 AM]
May 6, 2019 ECF FILER: Response filed by Respondent Attorney General United States of America to motion to stay removal. Certificate of Service dated 05/06/2019. [19-1869] (RMS) [Entered: 05/06/2019 10:34 AM]
May 3, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Petitioner Giuseppe Giudice due on or before 06/12/2019. Appendix due on or before 06/12/2019. (JK) [Entered: 05/03/2019 03:26 PM]
May 3, 2019 ECF FILER: ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, filed. [19-1869] (TS) [Entered: 05/03/2019 01:54 PM]
April 28, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Petitioner Giuseppe Giudice, filed. [19-1869] (TEM) [Entered: 04/28/2019 11:54 AM]
April 28, 2019 ECF FILER: AGENCY INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Petitioner Giuseppe Giudice, filed. [19-1869] (TEM) [Entered: 04/28/2019 11:53 AM]
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) The Petitioner's unopposed motion to seal exhibit C will be referred to the same panel of the Court that will consider Petitioner's motion for stay of removal. Exhibit C to the Declaration of Thomas E. Moseley will be held provisionally under seal pending disposition of the motion by the panel, filed. (JK) [Entered: 04/25/2019 04:34 PM]
April 25, 2019 ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Petitioner Giuseppe Giudice to seal Exhibit C to Declaration of Thomas E. Moseley. Certificate of Service dated 04/24/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1869] (TEM) [Entered: 04/25/2019 03:05 PM]
April 25, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Thomas E. Moseley on behalf of Petitioner(s) Giuseppe Giudice. [19-1869] (TEM) [Entered: 04/25/2019 01:18 PM]
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) temporarily granting motion for stay of removal in accordance with the Standing Order of the Court dated August 5, 2015. Removal is stayed until such time as the Court can consider the motion for stay of removal, filed. (JK) [Entered: 04/25/2019 09:51 AM]
April 24, 2019 ECF FILER: ADDITIONAL Exhibits filed by Petitioner Giuseppe Giudice to Motion for Stay of Removal. Certificate of Service dated 04/24/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1869]--[Edited 04/25/2019 by CJG] (TEM) [Entered: 04/24/2019 07:25 PM]
April 24, 2019 ECF FILER: Motion filed by Petitioner Giuseppe Giudice to stay removal. Certificate of Service dated 04/24/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1869] (TEM) [Entered: 04/24/2019 07:23 PM]
April 24, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Thomas E. Moseley on behalf of Petitioner(s) Giuseppe Giudice. [19-1869]--[DOCUMENT REMOVED - CORRECTED APPEARANCE FORM FILED - Edited 04/25/2019 by JK] (TEM) [Entered: 04/24/2019 07:18 PM]
April 19, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert Michael Stalzer on behalf of Respondent(s) Attorney General. [19-1869] (RMS) [Entered: 04/19/2019 10:01 AM]
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) directing the Executive Office of Immigration Review to file the adminstrative record. (JK) [Entered: 04/17/2019 03:33 PM]
April 17, 2019 AGENCY CASE DOCKETED. Petition filed by Giuseppe Giudice. Certificate of Service dated 04/16/2019. Service made by US mail. USCA Receipt No. 3CA005585. Receipt date 04/17/2019. (JK) [Entered: 04/17/2019 03:29 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Giuseppe Giudice v. Attorney General United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GIUSEPPE GIUDICE, a/k/a Joe Giudice
Represented By: Thomas E. Moseley Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Robert M. Stalzer Esq.
Represented By: William P. Barr Esq.
Represented By: OIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STEVEN ABRAMS
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PAUL W. SCHMIDT
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LORY D. ROSENBERG, Esq.
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TEOFILO CHAPA
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MATTHEW J. D'ANGELO
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: REBECCA JAMIL
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GUSTAVO D. VILLAGELIU MEMBER
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SUSAN ROY
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GEORGE T. CHEW
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CHARLES E. PAZAR
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JOHN F. GOSSART
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: NOEL FERRIS
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BRUCE J. EINHORN
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ANDREA H. SLOAN
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MIRIAM HAYWARD
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CECELIA ESPENOZA
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JOHN W. RICHARDSON
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WILLIAM VAN WYKE
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CAROL KING
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WILLIAM JOYCE
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MARGARET MCMANUS
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ELIZABETH A. LAMB
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: POLLY A. WEBBER
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ESMERALDA CABRERA
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAURA RAMIREZ
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JEFFREY S. CHASE, MD
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DENISE N. SLAVIN
Represented By: Alina Das Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?