Robert Wade v. District Attorney Monroe Count, et al
Defendant / Appellant: DISTRICT ATTORNEY MONROE COUNTY and E. DAVID CHRISTINE
Plaintiff / Appellee: ROBERT MUIR WADE
Case Number: 19-2201
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
February 11, 2020 Robert Wade v. District Attorney Monroe Count

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Mr. Robert Muir Wade, filed. [19-2201] (CJS) [Entered: 06/10/2019 08:56 AM]
June 10, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Cheryl J. Sturm on behalf of Appellee(s) Robert Wade. [19-2201] (CJS) [Entered: 06/10/2019 08:54 AM]
May 29, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants E. David Christine and District Attorney Monroe County in District Court No. 3-15-cv-00584. (TMM) [Entered: 05/29/2019 08:30 AM]
May 29, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) [Entered: 05/29/2019 08:35 AM]
May 29, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Gerard J. Geiger on behalf of Appellant(s) District Attorney of Monroe County, E. David Christine. [19-2201] (GJG) [Entered: 05/29/2019 11:05 AM]
May 29, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert J. Kidwell, III on behalf of Appellant(s) District Attorney of Monroe County, E. David Christine. [19-2201] (GJG) [Entered: 05/29/2019 11:07 AM]
May 29, 2019 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants E. David Christine and District Attorney Monroe County, filed. [19-2201] (GJG) [Entered: 05/29/2019 11:10 AM]
May 29, 2019 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants E. David Christine and District Attorney Monroe County, received. [19-2201] (GJG) [Entered: 05/29/2019 11:11 AM]
May 29, 2019 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants E. David Christine and District Attorney Monroe County advising this court that transcripts are not needed. Diana Gilbride. [19-2201] (GJG) [Entered: 05/29/2019 11:14 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Robert Wade v. District Attorney Monroe Count, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DISTRICT ATTORNEY MONROE COUNTY
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger Esq.
Represented By: Robert J. Kidwell Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: E. DAVID CHRISTINE
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger Esq.
Represented By: Robert J. Kidwell Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROBERT MUIR WADE
Represented By: Cheryl J. Sturm Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?