Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo v. Liam Huczko, et al
Defendant: NEW YORK & NEW JERSEY PORT AUTHORITY POLICE DEPARTMENT, (PAPD)
Plaintiff / Appellant: RICKY KAMDEM-OUAFFO
Defendant / Appellee: CITY OF ELIZABETH, CITY OF NEWARK, OFFICER BRADLEY, PAPD Officer Badge #3027, DANIEL DOLAN, Police Officer ID#3030, PAPD POLICE OFFICER, Badge # unknown female white on duty at EWR Terminal C, LIAM HUCZKO, Police Officer Hucarro ID#1778, COMMUNICATION WORKERS OF AMERICA, CWA, LIONEL LEACH, JR., Individual capacity and/or in Capacity with the CWA and PORT AUTHORITY OF NEW YORK AND NEW JERSEY, (PANYNJ)
Case Number: 19-2231
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 22, 2020 Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo v. Liam Huczko

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 INFORMAL BRIEF with Appendix attached on behalf of Appellant Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo, filed. Pages: 35, Certificate of Service dated 07/17/2019 by US mail. (SJB) [Entered: 07/19/2019 11:34 AM]
June 21, 2019 Attorney Bar status modified for Gerard H. Hanson, Esq. for Lionel Leach, Jr. and Communication Workers of America. Status is now active. (TMK) [Entered: 06/21/2019 10:56 AM]
June 21, 2019 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY STATUS for APPEARANCE FORM filed by Attorney Gerard H. Hanson, Esq. for Appellees Lionel Leach, Jr. and Communication Workers of America. Counsel's current status in this Court's attorney rolls is inactive. An attorney must have active status in order to appear before this Court. R.A.D.E. 17.3. If you wish to return to active status or if you believe that you have been marked inactive in error, please complete the Attorney Admission Renewal/Adjustment of Status Form available on this Court's website by 07/05/2019. Future filings will not be accepted from an attorney in inactive status. (TMK) [Entered: 06/21/2019 07:27 AM]
June 20, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo due on or before 07/30/2019. Appendix due on or before 07/30/2019. (JK) [Entered: 06/20/2019 11:24 AM]
June 19, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Gerard H. Hanson on behalf of Respondent(s) Communications Workers of America; Lionel Leach, Jr.. [19-2231] (GHH) [Entered: 06/19/2019 12:51 PM]
June 18, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert F. Varady, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) City of Elizabeth. [19-2231] (RFV) [Entered: 06/18/2019 03:55 PM]
June 18, 2019 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Joshua S. Fischer, Esq. for Lionel Leach, Jr. and Communication Workers of America, Gerard H. Hanson, Esq. for Lionel Leach, Jr. and Communication Workers of America, Annmarie Pinarski, Esq. for Lionel Leach, Jr. and Communication Workers of America and Robert F. Varady, Esq. for City of Elizabeth requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 07/02/2019. (JK) [Entered: 06/18/2019 02:58 PM]
June 3, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Wilson D. Antoine on behalf of Appellee(s) City of Newark. [19-2231] (WDA) [Entered: 06/03/2019 05:00 PM]
June 3, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Juan M. Barragan on behalf of Appellee(s) Liam Huczko, Daniel Dolan, The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, a PAPD Police Officer badge # unknown, and Kevin Bradley. [19-2231] (JMB) [Entered: 06/03/2019 04:54 PM]
June 3, 2019 Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 05/30/2019. (JK) [Entered: 06/03/2019 12:38 PM]
June 3, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 06/03/2019 12:37 PM]
June 3, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo in District Court No. 2-16-cv-08859. (JK) [Entered: 06/03/2019 12:32 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo v. Liam Huczko, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICKY KAMDEM-OUAFFO
Represented By: Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF ELIZABETH
Represented By: Robert F. Varady Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF NEWARK
Represented By: Samora F. Noguera Esq.
Represented By: Wilson D. Antoine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER BRADLEY, PAPD Officer Badge #3027
Represented By: Juan M. Barragan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL DOLAN, Police Officer ID#3030
Represented By: Juan M. Barragan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAPD POLICE OFFICER, Badge # unknown female white on duty at EWR Terminal C
Represented By: Juan M. Barragan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIAM HUCZKO, Police Officer Hucarro ID#1778
Represented By: Juan M. Barragan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COMMUNICATION WORKERS OF AMERICA, CWA
Represented By: Annmarie Pinarski Esq.
Represented By: Gerard H. Hanson Esq.
Represented By: Joshua S. Fischer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIONEL LEACH, JR., Individual capacity and/or in Capacity with the CWA
Represented By: Annmarie Pinarski Esq.
Represented By: Gerard H. Hanson Esq.
Represented By: Joshua S. Fischer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PORT AUTHORITY OF NEW YORK AND NEW JERSEY, (PANYNJ)
Represented By: Juan M. Barragan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW YORK & NEW JERSEY PORT AUTHORITY POLICE DEPARTMENT, (PAPD)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?