Jhen Scutella v. James Cousins, III, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: JHEN SCUTELLA
Defendant / Appellee: PATROLMAN ROBERT WILLIAMS, PATROLMAN JAMES COUSINS, III and LT. GOOZDICH
Case Number: 19-2238
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 1, 2020 Jhen Scutella v. James Cousins, III

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Jhen Scutella due on or before 08/19/2019. Appendix due on or before 08/19/2019. (MB) [Entered: 07/09/2019 08:28 AM]
June 4, 2019 Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 06/04/2019 01:19 PM]
June 3, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Catherine M. Doyle, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Patrolman James Cousins 3rd, Patrolman Robert E. Williams, Lieutenant Goozdich. [19-2238] (CMD) [Entered: 06/03/2019 11:35 AM]
May 31, 2019 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Jhen Scutella advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [19-2238] (TDM) [Entered: 05/31/2019 11:11 AM]
May 31, 2019 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Jhen Scutella, received. [19-2238] (TDM) [Entered: 05/31/2019 10:06 AM]
May 31, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Jhen Scutella, filed. [19-2238] (TDM) [Entered: 05/31/2019 09:24 AM]
May 30, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (MB) [Entered: 05/30/2019 03:38 PM]
May 30, 2019 Appendix Citation Notice sent to Timothy D. McNair, Esq., Catherine M. Doyle, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 06/13/2019. (MB) [Entered: 05/30/2019 03:39 PM]
May 30, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Timothy D McNair on behalf of Appellant(s) Jhen Scutella. [19-2238] (TDM) [Entered: 05/30/2019 06:00 PM]
May 30, 2019 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Jhen Scutella, filed. [19-2238] (TDM) [Entered: 05/30/2019 06:03 PM]
May 30, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Jhen Scutella in District Court No. 1-17-cv-00222. (MB) [Entered: 05/30/2019 03:33 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jhen Scutella v. James Cousins, III, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JHEN SCUTELLA
Represented By: Timothy D. McNair Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATROLMAN ROBERT WILLIAMS
Represented By: Catherine M. Doyle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATROLMAN JAMES COUSINS, III
Represented By: Catherine M. Doyle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LT. GOOZDICH
Represented By: Catherine M. Doyle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?