New Jersey Dept. Environmental, et al v. American Thermoplastics Corp, et al
Plaintiff: ADMINISTRATOR NEW JERSEY SPILL COMPENSATION FUND
Defendant: HOWMET CORP, EAGLE INDUSTRIES INC, MARS INC, CHRYSLER CORP, EMERSON QUIET KOOL, FALCON MANUFACTURING INC, BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS, OCCIDENTAL PETROLEUM CORP, EASTERN ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC, COMPACTION SYSTEMS CORPORATION OF NEW JERSEY, JOHN C. FILIBERTO, GARBCO ASSOCIATES INC, FKA J Filiberto Sanitation Inc, J FILIBERTO SANITATION INC, CHESTER HILLS INC, EAGLE INDUSTRIAL PRODUCTS INC, FLAIR CLEANERS OF MORRISTOWN INC, MENNEN CO, RAYONIER INC, COMPTON PRESS INC, WASTE MANAGEMENT OF NORTH JERSEY INC, AMERICAN THERMOPLASTICS CORP, CONNECTICUT RESOURCE RECOVERY AUTHORITY INC, JOSEPH B. FILIBERTO, CADILLAC PLASTICS, NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION, CWM CHEMICAL SERVICES INC, JAMES P HORAN INC, WARNER LAMBERT CO, PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS CO, POLICASTRO SANITATION, KEUFFEL & ESSER CO and PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO
Not Yet Classified: COMBUSTION EQUIPMENT ASSOCIATES, CARTER DAY INDUSTRIES INC and COMBE FILL CORPORATION
Plaintiff / Appellant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant / Appellee: COMPACTION SYSTEMS CORP OF CONNECTICUT and COMPACTION SYSTEMS CORP, a New Jersey Corporation
Case Number: 19-2243
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 ECF FILER: Anthony J. Corino, Esq. for Public Service Electric and Gas Company NOT PARTICIPATING: will not participate in this appeal, received. [18-2865, 19-2243] (AJC) [Entered: 07/25/2019 11:46 AM]
July 24, 2019 CLERK ORDER granting motion by the Carter Day Appellees to Further Consolidate Related Appeals at Nos. 18-2865 and 19-2243. The appeals are hereby consolidated for purposes of scheduling, the Carter Day Appellees' brief, and disposition. The following briefing schedule will now apply to the cases: 1. Appellant United States of America's brief and appendix in No. 19-2243, to be filed and served within forty (40) days of the date of this Order. To the extent possible, the United States should adopt or incorporate by reference the arguments made by Appellants in No. 18-2865. See Fed. R. App. P. 28(i). 2. Carter Day Appellees' brief, responsive to both Appellants' briefs, to be filed and served within thirty (30) days of the date of service of Appellant's brief in No. 19-2243. The brief may not exceed 13,000 words and should be filed in both appeals. 3. Reply briefs, if any, by the Appellants in Nos. 18-2865 and 19-2243, to be filed and served within twenty-one (21) days of the date of service of Appellees' brief. Appellants may file a consolidated reply brief, if appropriate, filed. [18-2865, 19-2243] (ARR) [Entered: 07/24/2019 02:43 PM]
July 9, 2019 NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Counsel for Mennen Co requesting Not Participation Letter be re-filed listing Mennen Co. as the party. Colgate-Pamolive Company is not named as a party to the appeals. Compliance due 07/12/2019. [18-2865, 19-2243] (DW) [Entered: 07/09/2019 09:46 AM]
July 8, 2019 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant USA in 19-2243 advising this court that transcripts are not needed.--[Edited 07/09/2019 by MB] (AB) [Entered: 07/08/2019 05:44 PM]
July 8, 2019 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant USA in 19-2243, filed.--[Edited 07/09/2019 by MB] (AB) [Entered: 07/08/2019 05:42 PM]
July 8, 2019 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant USA in 19-2243, received.--[Edited 07/09/2019 by MB] (AB) [Entered: 07/08/2019 05:41 PM]
July 8, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Andrea L. Berlowe on behalf of Appellant(s) United States of America. [19-2243, 18-2865] (AB) [Entered: 07/08/2019 05:40 PM]
July 8, 2019 ECF FILER: Colgate-Palmolive Company NOT PARTICIPATING: John A. McKinney, Jr., Esq. for Mennen Co in 19-2243 will not participate in this appeal, received. [18-2865, 19-2243] (JAM) [Entered: 07/08/2019 05:24 PM]
July 2, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Compaction Systems Corporation of New Jersey, filed. [19-2243] (JMP) [Entered: 07/02/2019 03:18 PM]
July 2, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Compaction Systems Corp of Connecticut, filed. [19-2243] (JMP) [Entered: 07/02/2019 03:17 PM]
July 2, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert J. Rohrberger on behalf of Appellee(s) Compaction Systems of Connecticut and Compaction Systems Corporation (a New Jersey Corporation). [19-2243] (JMP) [Entered: 07/02/2019 03:11 PM]
July 2, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeffrey M. Pollock on behalf of Appellee(s) Compaction Systems of Connecticut and Compaction Systems Corporation (a New Jersey Corporation). [19-2243] (JMP) [Entered: 07/02/2019 03:10 PM]
June 28, 2019 ECF FILER: Motion by Appellees Carter Day Industries, Inc., Combustion Equipment Associates, Inc., and Combe Fill Corporation (collectively Carter Day) to Further Consolidate Related Appeals. Certificate of Service dated 06/28/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-2243, 18-2865]--[Edited 07/23/2019 by ARR] (DSR) [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:51 PM]
June 28, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Charles J. Dennen on behalf of Appellee(s) Carter Day Industries, Inc. (f/k/a Combustion Equipment Associates, Inc.) and Combe Fill Corporation. [19-2243] (DSR) [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:48 PM]
June 28, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Combe Fill Corporation, filed. [19-2243] (DSR) [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:45 PM]
June 28, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees Carter Day Industries Inc and Combustion Equipment Associates, filed. [19-2243] (DSR) [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:44 PM]
June 28, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Debra S. Rosen on behalf of Appellee(s) Carter Day Industries, Inc. (f/k/a Combustion Equipment Associates, Inc.) and Combe Fill Corporation. [19-2243] (DSR) [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:43 PM]
June 26, 2019 ECF FILER: Waste Management Holdings, Inc., CWM Chemical Services, L.L.C. and Waste Management of New Jersey, Inc. NOT PARTICIPATING: Pamela S. Goodwin, Esq. for CWM Chemical Services Inc and Waste Management of North Jersey Inc in 19-2243 will not participate in this appeal, received. [19-2243, 18-2865] (PSG) [Entered: 06/26/2019 02:37 PM]
June 26, 2019 ECF FILER: Materials Innovation and Recycling Authority NOT PARTICIPATING: Mark L. Freed, Esq. for Connecticut Resource Recovery Authority Inc in 19-2243 Appellee Connecticut Resource Recovery Authority Inc in 19-2243 will not participate in this appeal, received. [18-2865, 19-2243] (MLF) [Entered: 06/26/2019 12:05 PM]
June 24, 2019 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Nan A. Bernardo, Esq. for Warner Lambert Co.; Richard A. Catalina, Jr., Esq., Gregory L. Rofman, Esq., and Mark L. Freed, Esq. for Connecticut Resource Recovery Authority Inc, Arthur J. Clarke, Esq. for Keuffel & Esser Co, Claudia A. Costa, Esq. for Mars Inc, Louis M. DeStefano, Esq. for Eagle Industries Inc, Falcon Manufacturing Inc and Eastern Environmental Services Inc, Charles J. Dennen, Esq. and Debra S. Rosen, Esq. for Carter Day Industries Inc, Combustion Equipment Associates and Combe Fill Corporation; Pamela S. Goodwin, Esq. for CWM Chemical Services Inc and Waste Management of North Jersey Inc, Glenn A. Harris, Esq. for Beckman Instruments, Louis G. Karagias, Esq. for New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection, John H. Klock, Esq. for Keuffel & Esser Co, Michael D. Lichtenstein, Esq. for Cadillac Plastics, Kevin MacGillivray, Esq. for Compton Press Inc, Hugh J. Mahoney, Esq. for Public Service Electric and Gas Co, John A. McKinney, Jr., Esq. for Mennen Co, Jeffrey M. Pollock, Esq. and Robert J. Rohrberger, Esq. for Compaction Systems Corp of Connecticut and Compaction Systems Corp, Richard S. Ranieri, Esq. for Flair Cleaners of Morristown Inc, Damon R. Sedita, Esq. for Joseph B. Filiberto, J Filiberto Sanitation Inc, John C. Filiberto and Garbco Associates Inc, Daniel J. Sheridan, Esq. for Phillips Petroleum Co and American Thermoplastics Corp, Mark A. Stevens, Esq. for Occidental Petroleum Corp and John F. Wilk, Esq. for Occidental Petroleum Corp requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 07/08/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 07/08/2019. (ARR) [Entered: 06/24/2019 04:01 PM]
June 24, 2019 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Steven R. Baer, Esq., Thomas J. Boer, Esq., David L. Gordon, Esq. and Bradley L. Levine, Esq. for USA requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 07/08/2019. Information Statement on or before 07/08/2019. Concise Summary on or before 07/08/2019. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 07/08/2019. (ARR) [Entered: 06/24/2019 03:51 PM]
June 7, 2019 CLERK ORDER The above-docketed appeals are hereby consolidated for purposes of scheduling and disposition only. It is noted that Appellants have already filed their brief and appendix in No. 18-2865. The parties are advised that case opening forms for later filed appeals must only be filed in the new appeals and not re-filed in earlier appeals in which the forms were previously filed. The parties are further advised that failure to file documents in the appropriate case may result in the issuance of a noncompliance order. If any party is unsure how to file a particular document, he or she should call the case manager prior to filing the document, filed. [18-2865, 19-2243] (ARR) [Entered: 06/07/2019 12:24 PM]
June 7, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (ARR) [Entered: 06/07/2019 12:16 PM]
June 7, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant USA in District Court No. 2-98-cv-04781 and 2-98-cv-04812. (ARR) [Entered: 06/07/2019 12:10 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Jersey Dept. Environmental, et al v. American Thermoplastics Corp, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWMET CORP
Represented By: Brian Weeks Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAGLE INDUSTRIES INC
Represented By: Louis M. DeStefano Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARS INC
Represented By: Claudia A. Costa Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRYSLER CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMERSON QUIET KOOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FALCON MANUFACTURING INC
Represented By: Louis M. DeStefano Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS
Represented By: Glenn A. Harris Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCCIDENTAL PETROLEUM CORP
Represented By: Mark A. Stevens Esq.
Represented By: John F. Wilk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EASTERN ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC
Represented By: Louis M. DeStefano Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMPACTION SYSTEMS CORPORATION OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN C. FILIBERTO
Represented By: Damon R. Sedita Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARBCO ASSOCIATES INC, FKA J Filiberto Sanitation Inc
Represented By: Damon R. Sedita Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J FILIBERTO SANITATION INC
Represented By: Damon R. Sedita Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHESTER HILLS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAGLE INDUSTRIAL PRODUCTS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLAIR CLEANERS OF MORRISTOWN INC
Represented By: Richard S. Ranieri Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENNEN CO
Represented By: John A. McKinney Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAYONIER INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMPTON PRESS INC
Represented By: Kevin MacGillivray Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASTE MANAGEMENT OF NORTH JERSEY INC
Represented By: Pamela S. Goodwin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN THERMOPLASTICS CORP
Represented By: Daniel J. Sheridan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONNECTICUT RESOURCE RECOVERY AUTHORITY INC
Represented By: Richard A. Catalina Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Gregory L. Rofman Esq.
Represented By: Mark L. Freed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH B. FILIBERTO
Represented By: Damon R. Sedita Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CADILLAC PLASTICS
Represented By: Michael D. Lichtenstein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION
Represented By: Louis G. Karagias Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CWM CHEMICAL SERVICES INC
Represented By: Pamela S. Goodwin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES P HORAN INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARNER LAMBERT CO
Represented By: Nan A. Bernardo Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS CO
Represented By: Hugh J. Mahoney Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICASTRO SANITATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEUFFEL & ESSER CO
Represented By: John H. Klock Esq.
Represented By: Arthur J. Clarke Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO
Represented By: Daniel J. Sheridan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: COMBUSTION EQUIPMENT ASSOCIATES
Represented By: Debra S. Rosen Esq.
Represented By: Charles J. Dennen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CARTER DAY INDUSTRIES INC
Represented By: Debra S. Rosen Esq.
Represented By: Charles J. Dennen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: COMBE FILL CORPORATION
Represented By: Debra S. Rosen Esq.
Represented By: Charles J. Dennen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADMINISTRATOR NEW JERSEY SPILL COMPENSATION FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Bradley L. Levine Esq.
Represented By: Thomas J. Boer Esq.
Represented By: David L. Gordon Esq.
Represented By: Steven R. Baer Esq.
Represented By: Andrea Berlowe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COMPACTION SYSTEMS CORP OF CONNECTICUT
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Pollock Esq.
Represented By: Robert J. Rohrberger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COMPACTION SYSTEMS CORP, a New Jersey Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Pollock Esq.
Represented By: Robert J. Rohrberger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?