Antonello Boldrini v. Federal National Mortgage Asso, et al
Defendant / Appellee: CLERK UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE THIRD CIRCUIT, PROF 2013 S3 LEGAL TITLE TRUST II, DONALD KRESESKI, ROSEMARY LAVELLE, MARK P. MCANDREW, MCCABE, WEISBERG AND COMPANY, P.C., HLADIK ONORATO & FEDERMAN, DAVE RITTER, ELLEN MASON, CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC, BRIAN SZUMSKI, JOSEPH P. GIOVANNINI, JR., MOSES & GELSO, CHASE LOSS & MITIGATION, KIM SALTER, MICHAEL A. SHUCOSKY, MARTHA E. VON ROSENSTIEL, JOAN HOGGARTY, FAY SERVICING, NEUBERGER BERMAN INVESTMENT ADVISERS, E. LANCE, CLERK UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, JAMES L. HADDOCK, ESQUIRE CANDIDUS K. DOUGHERTY, JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA, FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, ATTORNEY CHRIS CULLEN, LESA S. GELB, CLERK UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LUZERNE COUNTY DIVERSIONARY F. PROGRAM, SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, OFFICER DELUCCIE, JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, DAVID E. SCHWAGER, SETERUS INC, FRED W. HOENSCH, Esq., SCOTT W. PARKER, Esq., JONATHAN M. ETKOWICZ, PARKER IBRAHIM & BERGER LLC, NEW REZ LLC, FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, (By NTC) and CYPREXX SERVICES LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: ANTONELLO BOLDRINI
Case Number: 19-2515
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) Appellant's Objection and Motion to Vacate Clerk Order n. 003113308068_08/01/2019 are referred to the same panel of the Court that will decide the jurisdictional issue and whether the appeal will be dismissed as legally frivolous or whether summary affirmance under 3d Cir. L.A.R. 27.4 and I.O.P. 10.6 is appropriate, filed. (SB) [Entered: 08/29/2019 09:50 AM]
August 26, 2019 MOTION filed by Appellant Antonello Boldrini for Extension of Time to File Argument in Support of the Appeal Against Action Contemplated on Document n. 003113308068 Dated 8/1/19 Response due on 09/09/2019. Certificate of Service dated 08/26/2019. Service made by US mail. (SB) [Entered: 08/30/2019 03:31 PM]
August 19, 2019 Objection and MOTION filed by Appellant Antonello Boldrini to Vacate Clerk Order n. 003113308068 dated 08/01/2019. Response due on 08/29/2019. Certificate of Service dated 08/15/2019. Service made by US mail. (SB) [Entered: 08/22/2019 02:32 PM]
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) The motion for caption correction is granted to the extent the text (by NTC) will be added to the full caption after the party name Federal National Mortgage Association. The short caption will remain as is as it is simply an abbreviated version of the full caption. The Courts use of a shortened caption on correspondence and orders of the Court in no way results in the full caption being amended. In addition, the full caption will be used on any opinions and judgments issued by the Court. The motion for strike and remove is referred to the same panel of the Court that will decide the jurisdictional issue and whether the appeal will be dismissed as legally frivolous or whether summary affirmance under 3d Cir. L.A.R. 27.4 and I.O.P. 10.6 is appropriate filed by Appellant Antonello Boldrini, filed. (SB) [Entered: 08/15/2019 01:55 PM]
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) granting Motion by Appellant for Extension of Time to File Written Argument in Response Legal Divisions Letter advising of Possible Dismissal due to Lack of Jurisdiction. Appellants written argument must be filed within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. In addition to the jurisdictional issue, Appellant may also choose to address possible dismissal of the appeal as legally frivolous or whether summary affirmance under Third Circuit L.A.R. 27.4 and I.O.P. 10.6 is appropriate as stated in the Clerks order dated August 1, 2019. , filed. (SB) [Entered: 08/09/2019 02:41 PM]
August 1, 2019 CLERK ORDER granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Antonello Boldrini The appeal will be submitted to a panel for determination under 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2) or for summary action under Third Circuit L.A.R. 27.4 and I.O.P. 10.6. Appellant may submit argument, which should not exceed 5 pages, in support of the appeal. The document, with certificate of service, must be filed with the clerk within 21 days of the date of this order, filed. (SB) [Entered: 08/01/2019 09:04 AM]
July 29, 2019 MOTION filed by Appellant Antonello Boldrini for Extension of Time to File Written Argument in Opposition of the Appeal for Lack of Appellate Jurisdiction. Response due on 08/08/2019. Certificate of Service dated 07/26/2019. Service made by US mail. (SB) [Entered: 08/01/2019 02:57 PM]
July 29, 2019 MOTION for Strike and Remove from the Docket Improper Appearance and Documents filed by Lawyers Named Defendants, filed by Appellant Antonello Boldrini. Response due on 08/08/2019. Certificate of Service dated 07/26/2019. Service made by US mail. (SB) [Entered: 08/01/2019 02:46 PM]
July 29, 2019 MOTION filed by Appellant Antonello Boldrini titled Clarification Motion for Caption Correction. Response due on 08/08/2019. Certificate of Service dated 07/26/2019. Service made by US mail. (SB) [Entered: 08/01/2019 02:34 PM]
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) granting Appellant's Motion for Correction fo Names on the Docket filed by Appellant Antonello Boldrini. It appears the appellants amended complaint included six defendants who were not originally included in the caption. For that reason, the following parties will be added to this Courts caption as defendants and appellees: New Rez, L.L.C.; Scott W. Parker; Fred W. Hoensch; Jonathan M. Etkowicz; Parker Ibrahim & Berger L.L.P.; Cyprexx Services, L.L.C., filed. (SB) [Entered: 07/25/2019 09:44 AM]
July 19, 2019 ECF FILER: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Disclosure Stmnt. Service made on 07/19/2019 by US mail. [19-2515] (SWP) [Entered: 07/19/2019 09:57 AM]
July 19, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees Chase Home Finance LLC, Chase Loss & Mitigation, JP Morgan Chase Bank and JP Morgan Chase Bank NA, filed. [19-2515] (SWP) [Entered: 07/19/2019 09:56 AM]
July 19, 2019 ECF FILER: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Attorney Appearance. Service made on 07/19/2019 by US mail. [19-2515] (SWP) [Entered: 07/19/2019 09:55 AM]
July 19, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Scott W. Parker, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., by itself and as successor by merger to Chase Home Finance LLC (sued herein as JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Chase Home Finance LLC, J P Morgan Chase Bank, and Chase Loss & Mitigation). [19-2515] (SWP) [Entered: 07/19/2019 09:54 AM]
July 19, 2019 ECF FILER: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Attorney Appearance. Service made on 07/19/2019 by US mail. [19-2515] (FWH) [Entered: 07/19/2019 09:51 AM]
July 19, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Fred W. Hoensch, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., by itself and as successor by merger to Chase Home Finance LLC (sued herein as JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Chase Home Finance LLC, J P Morgan Chase Bank, and Chase Loss & Mitigation). [19-2515] (FWH) [Entered: 07/19/2019 09:50 AM]
July 17, 2019 MOTION filed by Appellant Antonello Boldrini for Correction of Names on the Docket. Response due on 07/29/2019. Certificate of Service dated 07/16/2019. Service made by US mail. (SB) [Entered: 07/23/2019 04:17 PM]
July 17, 2019 MOTION filed by Appellant Antonello Boldrini to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Response due on 07/29/2019. Certificate of Service dated 07/16/2019. Service made by US mail. (SB) [Entered: 07/23/2019 04:06 PM]
July 11, 2019 LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (ZM) [Entered: 07/11/2019 04:24 PM]
July 5, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SB) [Entered: 07/05/2019 12:09 PM]
July 5, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Antonello Boldrini in District Court No. 3-19-cv-00563. (SB) [Entered: 07/05/2019 12:06 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Antonello Boldrini v. Federal National Mortgage Asso, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLERK UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE THIRD CIRCUIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PROF 2013 S3 LEGAL TITLE TRUST II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONALD KRESESKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROSEMARY LAVELLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK P. MCANDREW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MCCABE, WEISBERG AND COMPANY, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HLADIK ONORATO & FEDERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVE RITTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELLEN MASON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC
Represented By: Scott W. Parker Esq.
Represented By: Fred W. Hoensch Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan M. Etkowicz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRIAN SZUMSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSEPH P. GIOVANNINI, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MOSES & GELSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHASE LOSS & MITIGATION
Represented By: Scott W. Parker Esq.
Represented By: Fred W. Hoensch Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan M. Etkowicz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIM SALTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL A. SHUCOSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARTHA E. VON ROSENSTIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOAN HOGGARTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FAY SERVICING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEUBERGER BERMAN INVESTMENT ADVISERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: E. LANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLERK UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES L. HADDOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ESQUIRE CANDIDUS K. DOUGHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA
Represented By: Scott W. Parker Esq.
Represented By: Fred W. Hoensch Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan M. Etkowicz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ATTORNEY CHRIS CULLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LESA S. GELB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLERK UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LUZERNE COUNTY DIVERSIONARY F. PROGRAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER DELUCCIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK
Represented By: Scott W. Parker Esq.
Represented By: Fred W. Hoensch Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan M. Etkowicz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID E. SCHWAGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SETERUS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRED W. HOENSCH, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT W. PARKER, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JONATHAN M. ETKOWICZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PARKER IBRAHIM & BERGER LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEW REZ LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, (By NTC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CYPREXX SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTONELLO BOLDRINI
Represented By: Antonello Boldrini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?