Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo v. Campbell Soup Co, et al
Defendant: BERNARD E. JACQUES, Individual and In Capacity With MDMC & TASK, MCELROY DEUTSCH MULVANEY & CARPENTER LLP, "MDMC LLP", Individual and In Capacity With TASK, CARY HAYES, Individual and In Capacity With CAMPBELL'S and DAYNE R. JOHNSON, Individual and In Capacity With MDMC & TASK
Plaintiff / Appellant: RICKY KAMDEM-OUAFFO
Defendant / Appellee: CARLOS J. BARROSO, Individual and Capacity With CAMPBELL'S, JONATHAN D. WETCHLER, Individual and In Capacity With DM & CAMPBELL'S, LINDA HARRISON, Individual and In Capacity With TASK, CORIE HESS, Individual and In Capacity With TASK, TASK MANAGEMENT INC, "TASK", TREVOR H. TANIGUCHI, STEFAN MOHAN, Individual and In Capacity With TASK, SCOTT KELLER, Individual and In Capacity With CAMPBELL'S, CAMPBELL SOUP CO, "CAMPBELL'S", DENISE M. MORRISON and DUANE MORRIS LLP, FIRM AND AFFILLIATE OFFICES, "OM", Individual and In Capacity With CAMPBELL'S
Case Number: 19-2529
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Reply to Appellees' Response by Appellant Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo to possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect, filed. Certificate of service dated 08/08/2019. Service made by Email. (JK) [Entered: 08/15/2019 04:36 PM]
August 7, 2019 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Dayne R. Johnson, Esq. for Appellees Linda Harrison, Corie Hess, Stefan Mohan and Task Management Inc Letter to Office of the Clerk regarding jurisdictional defects.. Certificate of Service dated 08/07/2019. Service made by ECF, US mail. [19-2529] (DRJ) [Entered: 08/07/2019 04:38 PM]
August 7, 2019 ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellees Campbell Soup Co, Denise M. Morrison, Carlos J. Barroso, Scott Keller, Duane Morris LLP, Jonathan D. Wetchler and Trevor H. Taniguchi to Legal Division letter. Certificate of Service dated 08/07/2019. [19-2529] (JDW) [Entered: 08/07/2019 03:18 PM]
August 7, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Campbell Soup Company, filed. [19-2529] (JDW) [Entered: 08/07/2019 12:26 PM]
August 6, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Leah A. Mintz on behalf of Appellee(s) Campbell Soup Company, Denise M. Morrison, Carlos J. Barroso, Scott Keller, Duane Morris LLP, Jonathan D. Wetchler, and Trevor H. Taniguchi. [19-2529] (LAM) [Entered: 08/06/2019 06:07 PM]
August 6, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jonathan D. Wetchler on behalf of Appellee(s) Campbell Soup Company, Denise M. Morrison, Carlos J. Barroso, Scott Keller, Duane Morris LLP, Jonathan D. Wetchler, and Trevor H. Taniguchi. [19-2529] (JDW) [Entered: 08/06/2019 05:59 PM]
July 19, 2019 RESPONSE on behalf of Appellant Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo to possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect, filed. Certificate of Service dated 07/18/2019. Service made by Email. (JK) [Entered: 07/19/2019 01:02 PM]
July 17, 2019 LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (SH) [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:10 PM]
July 11, 2019 Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 07/11/2019. (JK) [Entered: 07/12/2019 09:58 AM]
July 3, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Bernard E. Jacques on behalf of Appellee(s) Task Management Inc.; Stefan Mohan; Corie Hess; and Linda Harrison. [19-2529] (BEJ) [Entered: 07/03/2019 03:56 PM]
July 3, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Task Management Inc, filed. [19-2529] (DRJ) [Entered: 07/03/2019 02:51 PM]
July 3, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Dayne R. Johnson, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Task Management Inc.; Stefan Mohan; Corie Hess; Linda Harrison. [19-2529] (DRJ) [Entered: 07/03/2019 02:42 PM]
July 3, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 07/03/2019 12:53 PM]
July 3, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo in District Court No. 1-18-cv-13119. (JK) [Entered: 07/03/2019 12:50 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo v. Campbell Soup Co, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICKY KAMDEM-OUAFFO
Represented By: Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARLOS J. BARROSO, Individual and Capacity With CAMPBELL'S
Represented By: Trevor H. Taniguchi Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wetchler Esq.
Represented By: Leah A. Mintz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JONATHAN D. WETCHLER, Individual and In Capacity With DM & CAMPBELL'S
Represented By: Trevor H. Taniguchi Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wetchler Esq.
Represented By: Leah A. Mintz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LINDA HARRISON, Individual and In Capacity With TASK
Represented By: Bernard E. Jacques Esq.
Represented By: Dayne R. Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORIE HESS, Individual and In Capacity With TASK
Represented By: Bernard E. Jacques Esq.
Represented By: Dayne R. Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TASK MANAGEMENT INC, "TASK"
Represented By: Bernard E. Jacques Esq.
Represented By: Dayne R. Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TREVOR H. TANIGUCHI
Represented By: Trevor H. Taniguchi Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wetchler Esq.
Represented By: Leah A. Mintz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEFAN MOHAN, Individual and In Capacity With TASK
Represented By: Bernard E. Jacques Esq.
Represented By: Dayne R. Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT KELLER, Individual and In Capacity With CAMPBELL'S
Represented By: Trevor H. Taniguchi Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wetchler Esq.
Represented By: Leah A. Mintz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAMPBELL SOUP CO, "CAMPBELL'S"
Represented By: Trevor H. Taniguchi Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wetchler Esq.
Represented By: Leah A. Mintz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENISE M. MORRISON
Represented By: Trevor H. Taniguchi Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wetchler Esq.
Represented By: Leah A. Mintz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DUANE MORRIS LLP, FIRM AND AFFILLIATE OFFICES, "OM", Individual and In Capacity With CAMPBELL'S
Represented By: Trevor H. Taniguchi Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wetchler Esq.
Represented By: Leah A. Mintz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERNARD E. JACQUES, Individual and In Capacity With MDMC & TASK
Represented By: Michael Rato Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCELROY DEUTSCH MULVANEY & CARPENTER LLP, "MDMC LLP", Individual and In Capacity With TASK
Represented By: Michael Rato Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARY HAYES, Individual and In Capacity With CAMPBELL'S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAYNE R. JOHNSON, Individual and In Capacity With MDMC & TASK
Represented By: Michael Rato Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?