Okna Windows Corp v. Diversified Structural Composi
Plaintiff / Appellant: OKNA WINDOWS CORP
Defendant / Appellee: DIVERSIFIED STRUCTURAL COMPOSITES INC
Case Number: 19-3054
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:44 AM]
October 1, 2019 ECF FILER: TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER (Part III) filed by J&J TRANSCRIBERS INC. for the date(s) of 7/29/2019. Transcripts were filed in the District Court on 09/20/2019. [19-3054] (JMG) [Entered: 10/01/2019 04:25 PM]
September 23, 2019 Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 09/10/2019. (KR) [Entered: 09/23/2019 01:41 PM]
September 23, 2019 NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Attorney Matthew S. Sturtz on behalf of Apellee Diversified Structural Composites Inc, must become a member of the Bar of this Court. Compliance due 09/26/2019. (KR) [Entered: 09/23/2019 08:58 AM]
September 23, 2019 NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Attorney Yodeski Acquie on behalf of Apellee Diversified Structural Composites Inc, must become a member of the Bar of this Court. Compliance due 09/26/2019. (KR) [Entered: 09/23/2019 08:49 AM]
September 20, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Diversified Structural Composites Inc, filed. [19-3054] (TET) [Entered: 09/20/2019 04:04 PM]
September 20, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew S. Sturtz on behalf of Appellee(s) Diversified Structural Composites, Inc.. [19-3054] (TET) [Entered: 09/20/2019 03:59 PM]
September 20, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Yodeski Acquie on behalf of Appellee(s) Diversified Structural Composites, Inc.. [19-3054] (TET) [Entered: 09/20/2019 03:57 PM]
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER to Court Reporter Ms. Joan Carr directing transcripts, ordered on 09/19/2019, to be filed by 10/22/2019. (KR) [Entered: 09/20/2019 10:03 AM]
September 19, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Okna Windows Corporation, filed. on behalf of Appellant Okna Windows Corp, filed. [19-3054] (AES) [Entered: 09/19/2019 05:23 PM]
September 19, 2019 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Okna Windows Corp, filed. [19-3054] (AES) [Entered: 09/19/2019 05:18 PM]
September 19, 2019 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Okna Windows Corp advising this court that transcripts are needed. Requested date(s) are: Oral Argument held on July 29, 2019, to be filed by J&J Transcribers Inc.. [19-3054] (AES) [Entered: 09/19/2019 05:17 PM]
September 19, 2019 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Okna Windows Corp, received. [19-3054] (AES) [Entered: 09/19/2019 05:13 PM]
September 19, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Aimee E. Schnecker on behalf of Appellant(s) Okna Windows Corporation. [19-3054] (AES) [Entered: 09/19/2019 05:12 PM]
September 19, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Douglas C. Maloney on behalf of Appellant(s) Okna Windows Corporation. [19-3054] (AES) [Entered: 09/19/2019 05:11 PM]
September 6, 2019 Appendix Citation Notice sent to Douglas C. Maloney, Esq., Yodeski Y. Acquie, Esq., Michael J. Halaiko, Esq., Matthew S Sturtz, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 09/20/2019. (KR) [Entered: 09/06/2019 10:42 AM]
September 6, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR) [Entered: 09/06/2019 10:39 AM]
September 6, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Okna Windows Corp in District Court No. 2-18-cv-0244. (KR) [Entered: 09/06/2019 10:34 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Okna Windows Corp v. Diversified Structural Composi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: OKNA WINDOWS CORP
Represented By: Douglas C. Maloney Esq.
Represented By: Aimee E. Schnecker Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DIVERSIFIED STRUCTURAL COMPOSITES INC
Represented By: Michael J. Halaiko Esq.
Represented By: Matthew S. Sturtz Esq.
Represented By: Yodeski Y. Acquie Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?