Montague Walker v. Pennsylvania Department of Cor
Defendant / Appellee: SHELLY MANKEY, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, an agency of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, DANIELLE TERNITSKY-GORDON, PAUL DASCANI, WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES INC, STANLEY HENRY, MARY BOBECK, TONY TRAYTOR, ROBERT D. RHODES and KENNETH MCWILLIAMS
Plaintiff / Appellant: MONTAGUE WALKER
Not Yet Classified: THE BEASLEY LAW FIRM and ALVIN F. DE LEVIE
Case Number: 19-3062
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 29, 2020 Montague Walker v. Pennsylvania Department of Cor

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Certified Copy of Amended Notice of Appeal filed 10/17/2019 received from Clerk of District Court. (TMK) [Entered: 10/17/2019 02:51 PM]
October 15, 2019 Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 10/15/2019 12:42 PM]
October 11, 2019 ECF FILER: STATUS REPORT received from Appellee The Beasley Law Firm.. Certificate of Service dated 10/11/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-3062] (JEB) [Entered: 10/11/2019 10:57 AM]
October 7, 2019 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Alvin F. de Levie and Montague Walker, received. [19-3062] (PG) [Entered: 10/07/2019 05:41 PM]
October 7, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Alvin F. de Levie and Montague Walker, filed. [19-3062] (PG) [Entered: 10/07/2019 05:40 PM]
October 7, 2019 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Alvin F. de Levie and Montague Walker advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [19-3062] (PG) [Entered: 10/07/2019 05:39 PM]
October 7, 2019 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Alvin F. de Levie and Montague Walker, filed. [19-3062] (PG) [Entered: 10/07/2019 05:38 PM]
October 7, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Peter Goldberger on behalf of Appellant(s) Montague Walker, Alvin F. de Levie. [19-3062] (PG) [Entered: 10/07/2019 05:36 PM]
September 26, 2019 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Paula A. Koczan, Esq. for Wexford Health Sources Inc and Paul Dascani requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 10/10/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 10/10/2019. (TMK) [Entered: 09/26/2019 07:52 AM]
September 26, 2019 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Alvin F. de Levie, Esq. for Montague Walker and Alvin F. de Levie requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 10/10/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 10/10/2019. Information Statement on or before 10/10/2019. Concise Summary on or before 10/10/2019. (TMK) [Entered: 09/26/2019 07:44 AM]
September 24, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel B. Mullen on behalf of Appellee(s) Bobeck, Henry, Mankey, McWilliams, PA Department of Corrections. [19-3062] (DBM) [Entered: 09/24/2019 11:35 AM]
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order COPY OF ORDER OF DISTRICT COURT dated 09/23/2019 signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan, filed. (TMK) [Entered: 09/24/2019 09:18 AM]
September 19, 2019 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Alvin F. de Levie and Montague Walker advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. Julie Kienzle. [19-3062] (AFd) [Entered: 09/19/2019 03:15 PM]
September 17, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee The Beasley Law Firm, filed. [19-3062] (JEB) [Entered: 09/17/2019 12:06 PM]
September 17, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David A. Yanoff on behalf of Appellee(s) The Beasley Firm, LLC. [19-3062] (JEB) [Entered: 09/17/2019 12:02 PM]
September 17, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James E. Beasley, Jr. on behalf of Appellee(s) The Beasley Firm, LLC. [19-3062] (JEB) [Entered: 09/17/2019 11:59 AM]
September 11, 2019 CLERK ORDER - RULE 4(a)(4) staying case pending disposition of post decision motion(s). (TMK) [Entered: 09/11/2019 09:52 AM]
September 11, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMK) [Entered: 09/11/2019 09:51 AM]
September 11, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Montague Walker and Alvin F. de Levie in District Court No. 2-14-cv-01504. (TMK) [Entered: 09/11/2019 09:48 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Montague Walker v. Pennsylvania Department of Cor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHELLY MANKEY
Represented By: Timothy Mazzocca Esq.
Represented By: Thomas L. Donahoe Esq.
Represented By: Daniel B. Mullen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, an agency of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Timothy Mazzocca Esq.
Represented By: Thomas L. Donahoe Esq.
Represented By: Daniel B. Mullen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIELLE TERNITSKY-GORDON
Represented By: Yana L. Warshafsky Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Mazzocca Esq.
Represented By: Thomas L. Donahoe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL DASCANI
Represented By: Paula A. Koczan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES INC
Represented By: Paula A. Koczan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STANLEY HENRY
Represented By: Timothy Mazzocca Esq.
Represented By: Thomas L. Donahoe Esq.
Represented By: Daniel B. Mullen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARY BOBECK
Represented By: Yana L. Warshafsky Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Mazzocca Esq.
Represented By: Thomas L. Donahoe Esq.
Represented By: Daniel B. Mullen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TONY TRAYTOR
Represented By: Yana L. Warshafsky Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Mazzocca Esq.
Represented By: Thomas L. Donahoe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT D. RHODES
Represented By: Timothy Mazzocca Esq.
Represented By: Thomas L. Donahoe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENNETH MCWILLIAMS
Represented By: Timothy Mazzocca Esq.
Represented By: Thomas L. Donahoe Esq.
Represented By: Daniel B. Mullen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MONTAGUE WALKER
Represented By: Alvin F. de Levie Esq.
Represented By: Peter Goldberger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THE BEASLEY LAW FIRM
Represented By: James E. Beasley Esq. Jr.
Represented By: David A. Yanoff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ALVIN F. DE LEVIE
Represented By: Alvin F. de Levie Esq.
Represented By: Peter Goldberger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?