Vanessa Dalrymple v. City of Jersey City, et al
Defendant / Appellee: HCCF JOHN DOE SUPERVISORS 6-10, in their, personal, individual, and official capacities, HCCF JAMES DOE TRAINING OFFICERS 6-10, in their personal, individual, and official capacities, JERSEY CITY JOHN DOE SUPERVISORS, in their personal, individual, and official capacities, JERSEY CITY POLICE DEPARTMENT, JERSEY CITY JAMES DOE TRAINING OFFICERS 1-5, ABC ENTITIES 1-10, CHIEF OF POLICE PHILIP ZACCHE, in his personal and official capacities, HCCF DIRECTOR RONALD P. EDWARDS, in his persoal, individual, and official capacities, JERSEY CITY RICHARD ROE POLICE OFFICERS 1-10, whose identities are not yet known in their person, individual, and official capacities, HUDSON COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, INTERNAL AFFAIRS CAP ANTHONY GENOVA, CITY OF JERSEY CITY, HFFC INTERIM DIR. ERIC M. TAYLOR, in his personal, individual and official capacities and HCCF RICHARD ROE CORRECTIONS OFFICERS 11-20, whose identities are not yet known, in their personal, individual, and official capacities
Plaintiff / Appellant: VANESSA DALRYMPLE
Case Number: 19-3088
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael L. Dermody on behalf of Appellee(s) Hudson County Correctional Facility, Eric M. Taylor and Ronald Edwards, in their official capacities. [19-3088] (MLD) [Entered: 10/18/2019 03:01 PM]
October 18, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Maura E. Connelly on behalf of Appellee(s) City of Jersey City, Jersey City Police Department, Captain Anthony Genova. [19-3088] (MEC) [Entered: 10/18/2019 10:50 AM]
October 18, 2019 CLERK ORDER granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Vanessa Dalrymple The appeal will be submitted to a panel for determination under 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2) or for summary action under Third Circuit L.A.R. 27.4 and I.O.P. 10.6. Appellant may submit argument, which should not exceed 5 pages, in support of the appeal. The document, with certificate of service, must be filed with the clerk within 21 days of the date of this order; referring to a motions panel the motion for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Vanessa Dalrymple, filed. (CLW) [Entered: 10/18/2019 09:57 AM]
October 18, 2019 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Maura E. Connelly, Esq. for Jersey City Police Department, City of Jersey City, Philip Zacche and Anthony Genova and Michael L. Dermody, Esq. for Hudson County Correctional Facility requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 11/01/2019. (CLW) [Entered: 10/18/2019 09:52 AM]
October 10, 2019 Document filed by Appellant in support of Motion for Ieave to proceed in forma pauperis titled "Budget Entry Summary". Certificate of Service dated 10/08/2019. Service made by US mail. (CLW) [Entered: 10/16/2019 04:55 PM]
October 10, 2019 MOTION filed by Appellant Vanessa Dalrymple for Appointment of Counsel. Response due on 10/21/2019. Certificate of Service dated 10/08/2019. Service made by US mail. (CLW) [Entered: 10/16/2019 04:53 PM]
September 27, 2019 MOTION filed by Appellant Vanessa Dalrymple to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Response due on 10/07/2019. Certificate of Service dated 09/24/2019. Service made by US mail. (CLW) [Entered: 10/02/2019 03:22 PM]
September 13, 2019 LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (SH) [Entered: 09/13/2019 04:02 PM]
September 11, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CLW) [Entered: 09/11/2019 05:44 PM]
September 11, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Vanessa Dalrymple in District Court No. 2-18-cv-15134. (CLW) [Entered: 09/11/2019 05:40 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanessa Dalrymple v. City of Jersey City, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HCCF JOHN DOE SUPERVISORS 6-10, in their, personal, individual, and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HCCF JAMES DOE TRAINING OFFICERS 6-10, in their personal, individual, and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JERSEY CITY JOHN DOE SUPERVISORS, in their personal, individual, and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JERSEY CITY POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Maura Elizabeth Connelly Esq.
Represented By: Maura E. Connelly Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JERSEY CITY JAMES DOE TRAINING OFFICERS 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ABC ENTITIES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHIEF OF POLICE PHILIP ZACCHE, in his personal and official capacities
Represented By: Maura Elizabeth Connelly Esq.
Represented By: Maura E. Connelly Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HCCF DIRECTOR RONALD P. EDWARDS, in his persoal, individual, and official capacities
Represented By: Michael L. Dermody Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JERSEY CITY RICHARD ROE POLICE OFFICERS 1-10, whose identities are not yet known in their person, individual, and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HUDSON COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY
Represented By: Michael L. Dermody Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INTERNAL AFFAIRS CAP ANTHONY GENOVA
Represented By: Maura Elizabeth Connelly Esq.
Represented By: Maura E. Connelly Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF JERSEY CITY
Represented By: Maura Elizabeth Connelly Esq.
Represented By: Maura E. Connelly Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HFFC INTERIM DIR. ERIC M. TAYLOR, in his personal, individual and official capacities
Represented By: Michael L. Dermody Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HCCF RICHARD ROE CORRECTIONS OFFICERS 11-20, whose identities are not yet known, in their personal, individual, and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VANESSA DALRYMPLE
Represented By: Vanessa Dalrymple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?