Harold Fitzgerald v. DOJ, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: HAROLD FITZGERALD
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE and FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Case Number: 19-3115
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 23, 2020 Harold Fitzgerald v. DOJ

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Emily McKillip on behalf of Appellee(s) Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Prisons. [19-3115] (EM) [Entered: 10/09/2019 11:42 AM]
October 8, 2019 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Emily McKillip, Esq. for FBI and DOJ requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 10/22/2019. (JK) [Entered: 10/08/2019 04:39 PM]
October 8, 2019 ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellant Harold Fitzgerald to Legal Division letter advising of possible summary action. Certificate of Service dated 10/08/2019. [19-3115] (CJS) [Entered: 10/08/2019 01:59 PM]
September 20, 2019 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Harold Fitzgerald advising this court that no transcripts are available. [19-3115] (CJS) [Entered: 09/20/2019 02:33 PM]
September 20, 2019 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Harold Fitzgerald, filed. [19-3115] (CJS) [Entered: 09/20/2019 02:32 PM]
September 20, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Cheryl J. Sturm on behalf of Appellant(s) Harold Fitzgerald. [19-3115] (CJS) [Entered: 09/20/2019 02:29 PM]
September 18, 2019 LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for possible summary action. (ZM) [Entered: 09/18/2019 12:28 PM]
September 16, 2019 Copy of notice of appeal filed in the district court on 09/05/2019 received from Clerk of District Court. (JK) [Entered: 09/16/2019 12:02 PM]
September 16, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 09/16/2019 11:59 AM]
September 16, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Harold Fitzgerald in District Court No. 2-19-cv-01385. (JK) [Entered: 09/16/2019 11:57 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harold Fitzgerald v. DOJ, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HAROLD FITZGERALD
Represented By: Cheryl J. Sturm Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Emily McKillip Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Represented By: Emily McKillip Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?