In The Matter of the Applicat
Defendant / Appellant: ABC CORP
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 19-3124
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 10, 2020 Summary In The Matter of the Application of Subpoena 2018R00776

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellee USA - Brief. Copies: 7. (KEL) [Entered: 11/14/2019 03:58 PM]
November 12, 2019 ECF FILER: SEALED ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellee USA. Certificate of Service dated 11/12/2019 by ECF, US mail. [19-3124] (HFW) [Entered: 11/12/2019 01:25 PM]
October 31, 2019 ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Stephen M. Rummage, Esq. for Appellant ABC Corp. Certificate of Service dated 10/31/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-3124] (SMR) [Entered: 10/31/2019 03:08 PM]
October 29, 2019 ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Haley F. Warden-Rodgers, Esq. for Appellee USA. Certificate of Service dated 10/29/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-3124] (HFW) [Entered: 10/29/2019 11:51 AM]
October 29, 2019 Calendared for Friday, 12/13/2019. Calendar Clerk: PM. (PM) [Entered: 10/29/2019 10:30 AM]
October 18, 2019 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant ABC Corp - Joint Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 2 (Volume I attached to Brief). (FILED UNDER SEAL) (EMA) [Entered: 10/18/2019 04:09 PM]
October 18, 2019 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant ABC Corp - Brief with Volume I of Joint Appendix attached. (FILED UNDER SEAL) Copies: 7. (KEL) [Entered: 10/18/2019 11:28 AM]
October 15, 2019 ECF FILER: SEALED LETTER from Attorney Stephen M. Rummage, Esq. for Appellant ABC Corp Explanation why Appellant has not filed copy of district court docket, as required by Fed. R. App. P. 30(a)(1)(A) and L.A.R. 30.3(a). Certificate of Service dated 10/15/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-3124][SEND TO MERITS PANEL]--[Edited 10/17/2019 by MCW] (SMR) [Entered: 10/15/2019 05:35 PM]
October 15, 2019 ECF FILER: SEALED ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant ABC Corp. Certificate of Service dated 10/15/2019 by ECF. [19-3124] (SMR) [Entered: 10/15/2019 05:30 PM]
October 15, 2019 ECF FILER: SEALED ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellant ABC Corp. Certificate of Service dated 10/15/2019 by ECF. [19-3124] (SMR) [Entered: 10/15/2019 05:23 PM]
October 4, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from MaryAnn Almeida on behalf of Appellant(s) ABC Corporation. [19-3124] (MTA) [Entered: 10/04/2019 07:11 PM]
October 1, 2019 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant ABC Corp advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [19-3124] (AAB) [Entered: 10/01/2019 04:43 PM]
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (RESTREPO, Circuit Judge) granting motion to Expedite filed by Appellant. The parties briefs must be filed by the following deadlines: Appellants principal brief: 10/15/19; Appellees principal brief: 11/12/19; Appellants reply brief: 11/25/19. This appeal will be calendared during the week of December 9, 2019. The merits panel will determine whether there will be oral argument. See Fed. R. App. P. 34(a)(2); 3d Cir. I.O.P. 2.1. Panel No.: ECO-001. Restrepo, Authoring Judge. (SB) [Entered: 10/01/2019 03:05 PM]
October 1, 2019 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant ABC Corp, received. [19-3124] (SMR) [Entered: 10/01/2019 12:25 PM]
October 1, 2019 CLERK ORDER advising that it appears it would not be appropriate to list the case for possible dismissal. This appeal will not be submitted to a motions panel for possible dismissal due to a jurisdictional defect at this time. The issue of jurisdiction is referred to the merits panel. The parties are advised that this order does not represent a finding of jurisdiction in this matter. As in all cases, the panel of this Court that reviews the appeal on its merits will make a final determination of jurisdiction. A briefing schedule will be issued at the appropriate time. The parties should address jurisdiction in their briefs. See Fed. R. App. P. 28(a)(4)(B) & 28(b)., filed. (SB) [Entered: 10/01/2019 10:14 AM]
September 30, 2019 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant ABC Corp, filed. [19-3124] (SMR) [Entered: 09/30/2019 07:43 PM]
September 30, 2019 ECF FILER: SEALED Response filed by Appellee USA to motion to Expedite. Certificate of Service dated 09/30/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-3124] (HFW) [Entered: 09/30/2019 04:01 PM]
September 30, 2019 ECF FILER: SEALED Response filed by Appellee USA to clerk order. Certificate of Service dated 09/30/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-3124] [SEND TO MERITS]--[Edited 10/01/2019 by SB] (HFW) [Entered: 09/30/2019 11:24 AM]
September 27, 2019 TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk): Any response to the appellant's motion to expedite must be filed by Tuesday, October 1, 2019. Even if the appellee does not concede that expedition is necessary, its response should either agree with the appellant's proposed briefing schedule or include its own proposal. See 3d Cir. L.A.R. 4.1. (RFH) [Entered: 09/27/2019 09:34 AM]
September 26, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant ABC Corp, filed. [19-3124] (AKD) [Entered: 09/26/2019 02:42 PM]
September 25, 2019 ECF FILER: SEALED Response filed by Appellant ABC Corp to clerk order. Certificate of Service dated 09/25/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-3124] [SEND TO MERITS]--[Edited 10/01/2019 by SB] (SMR) [Entered: 09/25/2019 05:49 PM]
September 25, 2019 ECF FILER: SEALED Motion filed by Appellant ABC Corp to Expedite Briefing and Oral Argument. Certificate of Service dated 09/25/2019. [19-3124] (SMR) [Entered: 09/25/2019 05:40 PM]
September 19, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ambika Kumar Doran on behalf of Appellant(s) ABC Corporation. [19-3124] (AKD) [Entered: 09/19/2019 04:23 PM]
September 18, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stephen M. Rummage on behalf of Appellant(s) ABC Corporation. [19-3124] (SMR) [Entered: 09/18/2019 06:56 PM]
September 18, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lauren Moxley on behalf of Appellant(s) ABC Corporation. [19-3124] (LM) [Entered: 09/18/2019 12:10 PM]
September 18, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Megan Crowley on behalf of Appellant(s) ABC Corporation. [19-3124] (MC) [Entered: 09/18/2019 12:07 PM]
September 18, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alexander A. Berengaut on behalf of Appellant(s) ABC Corporation. [19-3124] (AAB) [Entered: 09/18/2019 12:03 PM]
September 18, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James M. Garland on behalf of Appellant(s) ABC Corporation. [19-3124] (JMG) [Entered: 09/18/2019 11:59 AM]
September 18, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Laura Schleich Irwin on behalf of Appellee(s) United States of America. [19-3124] (LSI) [Entered: 09/18/2019 09:57 AM]
September 17, 2019 CLERK ORDER Appellant seeks review of the District Courts order entered August 20, 2019. The order appealed may not be final within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. 1291 and may not otherwise be appealable at this time. All parties must file written responses addressing this issue, with a certificate of service attached, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order., filed. (SB) [Entered: 09/17/2019 10:02 AM]
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) It is noted that the underlying District Court case is sealed. The parties are advised that, pursuant to this Courts November 4, 2008 Notice to the Bar, Court of Appeals dockets are not sealed as the text of the docket contains procedural information only. All documents within the case, however, are sealed. Counsel is advised to use caution in filing documents electronically so that docket entries do not reveal information that is under seal. (SB) [Entered: 09/17/2019 09:56 AM]
September 17, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Haley F. Warden-Rodgers on behalf of Appellee(s) United States of America. [19-3124] (HFW) [Entered: 09/17/2019 09:54 AM]
September 17, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SB) [Entered: 09/17/2019 09:39 AM]
September 17, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant ABC Corporation in District Court No. 2-19-mc-00102 on 8/30/19, but not received in Court of Appeals until 9/16/19.--[Edited 09/17/2019 by SB] (SB) [Entered: 09/17/2019 09:30 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In The Matter of the Applicat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ABC CORP
Represented By: Lauren Moxley Esq.
Represented By: Ralph M. Monico Esq.
Represented By: Megan Crowley Esq.
Represented By: Alexander A. Berengaut Esq.
Represented By: James M. Garland Esq.
Represented By: Ambika K. Doran Esq.
Represented By: Stephen M. Rummage Esq.
Represented By: Maryann T. Almeida Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Laura S. Irwin Esq.
Represented By: Haley F. Warden-Rodgers Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?