Beverley Harris v. The Bozzuto Group, et al
Defendant / Appellee: STUART BRADIE, In His Official and Individual Capacity as Chief Executive Officer of KBR, Inc., THOMAS S. BOZZUTO, Founder of the Bozzuto Group, KBR INC, THE BOZZUTO GROUP, MICHELLE DEMETRIOU, Manager The Park Apartments, DAVID CURCIO, Regional Manager, The Park Apartments, TOBY BOZZUTO, Operating Officer, Bozzuto Group Partners of the Bozzuto Group, DIRECTOR FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION and JEFF SESSIONS, U.S. Attorney General in his individual and official capacities, U.S. Department of Justice
Plaintiff / Appellant: DR. BEVERLEY M. HARRIS
Case Number: 19-3143
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 RESPONSE on behalf of Appellant Beverley M. Harris to Legal Division letter advising of possible dismissal, filed. (SLC) [Entered: 11/08/2019 01:58 PM]
November 4, 2019 Document by Appellant titled Information on Continuous Torturing. Certificate of Service dated 11/04/2019. Service made by US mail. (SLC) [Entered: 11/06/2019 09:03 AM]
October 7, 2019 RESPONSE on behalf of Appellant Beverley M. Harris to Legal Division letter advising of possible dismissal, filed. Certificate of Service dated 10/07/2019. Service made by US mail. (SLC) [Entered: 10/10/2019 07:43 AM]
October 3, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee KBR Inc, filed. [19-3143] (DLR) [Entered: 10/03/2019 05:58 PM]
October 3, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel L. Russell Jr. on behalf of Appellee(s) Stuart Bradie; KBR, Inc.. [19-3143] (DLR) [Entered: 10/03/2019 05:57 PM]
September 24, 2019 LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (MW) [Entered: 09/24/2019 03:29 PM]
September 19, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SLC) [Entered: 09/19/2019 08:32 AM]
September 19, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Beverley M. Harris in District Court No. 2-18-cv-10277. (SLC) [Entered: 09/19/2019 08:25 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beverley Harris v. The Bozzuto Group, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STUART BRADIE, In His Official and Individual Capacity as Chief Executive Officer of KBR, Inc.
Represented By: Philip S. May Esq.
Represented By: Daniel L. Russell Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS S. BOZZUTO, Founder of the Bozzuto Group
Represented By: Robert C. Griffin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KBR INC
Represented By: Philip S. May Esq.
Represented By: Daniel L. Russell Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE BOZZUTO GROUP
Represented By: Robert C. Griffin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHELLE DEMETRIOU, Manager The Park Apartments
Represented By: Robert C. Griffin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID CURCIO, Regional Manager, The Park Apartments
Represented By: Robert C. Griffin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOBY BOZZUTO, Operating Officer, Bozzuto Group Partners of the Bozzuto Group
Represented By: Robert C. Griffin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DIRECTOR FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Represented By: Benjamin Kuruvilla Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFF SESSIONS, U.S. Attorney General in his individual and official capacities, U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Benjamin Kuruvilla Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DR. BEVERLEY M. HARRIS
Represented By: Beverley M. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?