Lamont Zamichieli v. Pennsylvania Department of Cor, et al
Defendant / Appellee: MIKE HICE, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, NATALIE AUSTIN, ROBERT VALLEY and LORI RIDINGS
Plaintiff / Appellant: LAMONT ZAMICHIELI
Case Number: 19-3305
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellee Robert Valley to summarily affirm. Certificate of Service dated 12/04/2019. Service made by ECF, US mail. [19-3305] (JBL) [Entered: 12/04/2019 10:17 AM]
November 15, 2019 CLERK ORDER granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Lamont Zamichieli. The appeal will be submitted to a panel for determination under 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2) or for summary action under Third Circuit L.A.R. 27.4 and I.O.P. 10.6. Appellant may submit argument, which should not exceed 5 pages, in support of the appeal. The document, with certificate of service, must be filed with the clerk within 21 days of the date of this order; no action will be taken on motion for extension of time to file for IFP filed by Appellant Lamont Zamichieli, filed. (CLW) [Entered: 11/15/2019 09:59 AM]
November 6, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel B. Mullen on behalf of Appellee(s) PA Dept. of Corrections, William Nicholson, Tina Staley, Mr. Spiker, CO Liptak, CO Price, Karen Sokol, Mark DiAlesandro, Dan Caro, Robert Gilmore, Tracy Shawley. [19-3305] (DBM) [Entered: 11/06/2019 04:29 PM]
November 6, 2019 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Scott A. Bradley, Esq. for Pennsylvania Department of Corrections requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 11/20/2019. (CLW) [Entered: 11/06/2019 11:02 AM]
November 4, 2019 MOTION filed by Appellant Lamont Zamichieli for Extension of Time to File for In Forma Pauperis and submit Certified Copy of Account Statement. Response due on 11/04/2019. Certificate of Service dated 10/22/2019. Service made by US mail. (CLW) [Entered: 11/06/2019 11:00 AM]
November 4, 2019 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Lamont Zamichieli, filed. (CLW) [Entered: 11/06/2019 10:56 AM]
November 4, 2019 IN FORMA PAUPERIS PRISONER AUTHORIZATION on behalf of Appellant Lamont Zamichieli, filed. (CLW) [Entered: 11/06/2019 10:55 AM]
November 4, 2019 IN FORMA PAUPERIS PRISONER ADDENDUM on behalf of Appellant Lamont Zamichieli, filed. (CLW) [Entered: 11/06/2019 10:54 AM]
November 4, 2019 MOTION filed by Appellant Lamont Zamichieli to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Response due on 11/04/2019. Certificate of Service dated 10/22/2019. Service made by US mail. (CLW) [Entered: 11/06/2019 10:53 AM]
October 14, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from J. Brian Lynn, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Dr. Robert Valley. [19-3305] (JBL) [Entered: 10/14/2019 02:02 PM]
October 10, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alan S Gold on behalf of Appellee(s) Natalie Austin, PA, Mike Hice, Lori Ridings, CRNP. [19-3305] (ASG) [Entered: 10/10/2019 10:23 AM]
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) To facilitate electronic filing for larger groups of parties represented by the same attorney, the first named party in each group will be the designated filer, as follows; For all parties represented by Scott A. Bradley, Esq., or any other attorney from the Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General, the designated filer shall be the Pennsylvania Department of Corrections. Counsel is advised that the designated filer is for cm/ecf filing purposes only, Names of all represented parties must be listed on all forms, motions and briefs. Attorneys representing smaller groups of parties must select all individual persons or entities as filer in cm/ecf. (CLW) [Entered: 10/09/2019 04:25 PM]
October 9, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CLW) [Entered: 10/09/2019 04:15 PM]
October 9, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Lamont Zamichieli in District Court No. 2-17-cv-00742. (CLW) [Entered: 10/09/2019 04:10 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamont Zamichieli v. Pennsylvania Department of Cor, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKE HICE
Represented By: Alan S. Gold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: Scott A. Bradley Esq.
Represented By: Daniel B. Mullen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATALIE AUSTIN
Represented By: Alan S. Gold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT VALLEY
Represented By: Victoria A. Kellogg Esq.
Represented By: James B. Lynn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LORI RIDINGS
Represented By: Alan S. Gold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LAMONT ZAMICHIELI
Represented By: Lamont Zamichieli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?