Quintez Talley, et al v. Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, et al
Defendant / Appellee: HARRISBURG REGIONAL LABORATORY, OFFICE OF THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY CENTRE COUNTY, J. MICHAEL WILLIAMSON, STEVEN LACKMAN, PAMELA RUEST, DANIEL MCKENRICK, SUPREME COURT OF PENNSYLVANIA, DAVID CROWLEY, LINDSEY CATHERINE FOSTER, STACY PARKS MILLER, CENTRE COUNTY COURTHOUSE, JONATHAN GRINE, CENTRE COUNTY DEFENDER ASSOCIATION, ALLEN SINCLAIR, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, BRADLEY P. LUNSFORD, THOMAS KING KISTLER and CASEY MCCLAIN
Plaintiff / Appellee: MINORITIES OF PENNSYLVANIA and PENNSYLVANIANS WITH MENTAL ILLNESS
Plaintiff / Appellant: QUINTEZ TALLEY
Case Number: 19-3581
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 ECF FILER: CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Attorney Appearance. Service made on 12/31/2019 by ECF, US mail. [19-3581] (MG) [Entered: 12/31/2019 12:19 PM]
December 31, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Martha Gale, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Thomas King Kistler, Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, J. Michael Williamson, Pamela Ruest, Bradley P. Lunsford, Jonathan Grine, and Centre County Courthouse. [19-3581] (MG) [Entered: 12/31/2019 12:07 PM]
December 31, 2019 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Bruce L. Castor, Jr., Esq. for Stacy Parks Miller, Lindsey Catherine Foster and Daniel McKenrick, Martha Gale, Esq. for Thomas King Kistler, Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, J. Michael Williamson, Pamela Ruest, Bradley P. Lunsford, Jonathan Grine and Centre County Courthouse and Daniel J. Gallagher, Esq. for Pennsylvania Department of Corrections and William Foster, Robert Williamson, Robert Hewitt, Dave P Link, Tammy Ferguson, Michael LeFebvre, Pennsylvania State Police, Joshua Glessner, Thomas Suchta, Michael Worstell, Glenn Irwin, Thomas Gerald Lukens, Bernard Karabinos, Stephen Proudfit, Amy Becker, Brian Wakefield, Thomas M. Stock, Gabriel Llinas and Jeffrey A. Wagner requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 01/14/2020. (PDB) [Entered: 12/31/2019 10:18 AM]
December 31, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert A Mix, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Centre County Courthouse, Centre County Defender Association, David Crowley & Casey McClain. [19-3581] (JPG) [Entered: 12/31/2019 07:46 AM]
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) referring to a motions panel the motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Quintez Talley. (TMM) [Entered: 12/24/2019 08:46 AM]
November 21, 2019 IN FORMA PAUPERIS PRISONER AUTHORIZATION on behalf of Appellant Quintez Talley. (PDB) [Entered: 11/26/2019 03:11 PM]
November 21, 2019 IN FORMA PAUPERIS PRISONER ADDENDUM on behalf of Appellant Quintez Talley. (PDB) [Entered: 11/26/2019 03:10 PM]
November 21, 2019 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Quintez Talley. (PDB) [Entered: 11/26/2019 03:09 PM]
November 21, 2019 MOTION filed by Appellant Quintez Talley to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (PDB) [Entered: 11/26/2019 03:07 PM]
November 20, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Office of the District Attorney Centre County. [19-3581] (RAR) [Entered: 11/20/2019 04:04 PM]
November 18, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robin A. Read on behalf of Appellee(s) District Attorney's Office Centre County. [19-3581] (RAR) [Entered: 11/18/2019 03:40 PM]
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) for all parties represented by Daniel J. Gallagher, Esq. the designated filer shall be Pennsylvania Department of Corrections, filed. (TMM) [Entered: 11/07/2019 03:39 PM]
November 7, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) [Entered: 11/07/2019 03:38 PM]
November 7, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Quintez Talley in District Court No. 3-17-cv-01632. (TMM) [Entered: 11/07/2019 03:35 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quintez Talley, et al v. Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HARRISBURG REGIONAL LABORATORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICE OF THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY CENTRE COUNTY
Represented By: Robin A. Read Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. MICHAEL WILLIAMSON
Represented By: Martha Gale Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVEN LACKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAMELA RUEST
Represented By: Martha Gale Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL MCKENRICK
Represented By: Bruce L. Castor Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUPREME COURT OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Martha Gale Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID CROWLEY
Represented By: Robert A. Mix Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LINDSEY CATHERINE FOSTER
Represented By: Bruce L. Castor Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STACY PARKS MILLER
Represented By: Bruce L. Castor Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CENTRE COUNTY COURTHOUSE
Represented By: Robert A. Mix Esq.
Represented By: Martha Gale Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JONATHAN GRINE
Represented By: Martha Gale Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CENTRE COUNTY DEFENDER ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Robert A. Mix Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLEN SINCLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: Daniel J. Gallagher Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRADLEY P. LUNSFORD
Represented By: Martha Gale Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS KING KISTLER
Represented By: Martha Gale Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CASEY MCCLAIN
Represented By: Robert A. Mix Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MINORITIES OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PENNSYLVANIANS WITH MENTAL ILLNESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: QUINTEZ TALLEY
Represented By: Quintez Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?