Care One Management LLC, et al v. United Healthcare Workers East, et al
Plaintiff: CARE ONE HAMILTON LLC, doing business as Care One at Hamilton, CARE ONE MERCER LLC, doing business as Care One at Ewing, CARE TWO LLC, doing business as Care One at Livingston, ELMWOOD EVESHAM ASSOCIATES LLC, doing business as Care One at Evesham, 162 SOUTH BRITAIN ROAD OPERATING CO II, LLC, doing business as River Glen Healthcare Center, MILLENNIUM HEALTHCARE CENTERS LLC, doing business as Care One at Pine Rest, 1 BURR ROAD OPERATING COMPANY II LLC, doing business as Westport Healthcare Center, CARE ONE HARMONY VILLAGE LLC, dba Care One Harmony Village at Moorestown, PARK MARION VERNON STREET OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Brookline Health Care Center, CARE ONE TEANECK LLC, 19 VARNUM STREET OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Lowell Health Care Center, 49 THOMAS PATTEN DRIVE OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Cedar Hill Healthcare Center, 221 FITZGERALD DRIVE OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as New Bedford Health Care Center, 265 ESSEX STREET OPERATING CO LLC, dba Essex Park Rehabilitation Center, 57 OLD ROAD TO NINE ACRE CORNER OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Concord Health Care Center, 745 HIGHLAND AVENUE OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as The Highlands Healthcare Center, 548 ELM STREET OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Calvin Coolidge Nursing and Rehab Center for NorthHampton, REHABILITATION CENTER RARITAN BAY MEDICAL CENTER LLC, doing business as Care One at Raritan Bay Medical Center, CARE ONE TRINITAS LLC, dba LTACH Care One at Trinitas Reginoal Medical Center, 245 ORANGE AVENUE OPERATING CO II, LLC, doing business as West River Health Care Center, 750 WOBURN STREET OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Wilmington Health Care Center, MILLENNIUM HEALTHCARE CENTERS II, LLC, doing business as Care One at Dunroven, 199 ANDOVER STREET OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Peabody Glen Health Care Center, 2028 BRIDGEPORT AVENUE OPERATING CO II, LLC, doing business as Golden Hill Health Care Center, CARE ONE WALL LLC, 107 OSBORNE STREET OPERATING CO II LLC, doing business as Danbury Healthcare Center, KING JAMES CARE CENTER OF MIDDLETOWN LLC, doing business as Care One ar King James, CARE ONE MADISON AVENUE LLC, doing business as Care One ar Madison Avenue, 493 BLACK OAK RIDGE ROAD LLC, dpong bsuiness as Care One at Wayne, 312 MILLBURY AVENUE OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Millbury Health Care Center, 64 PERFORMANCE DRIVE OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Weymouth Healthcare Center, 301 UNION STREET LLC, doing business as Care One at Wellington, CARE ONE MOORESTOWN LLC, doing business as Care One at Moorestown, 800 RIVER ROAD OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Woodcrest Healthcare Center, 2101 WASHINGTON STREET OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Newton Healthcare Center, CARE ONE EAST BRUNSWICK LLC, doing business as Care One at East Brunswick, 341 JORDAN LANE OPERATING CO II, LLC, doing business as Wethersfield Healthacre Center, 710 LONG RIDGE ROAD OPERATING CO II LLC, doing business as Stamford Healthcare Center, 135 BENTON DRIVE OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Redstone Healthcare Center, 600 KINDERKAMACK ROAD OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Oradell Healthcare Center, 260 EASTHAMPTON ROAD OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Holyoke Rehabilitation Center, 11 HISTORY LANE OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Care One at Jackson, HCC LLC, doing business as Care One at Holmdel, 240 CHURCH STREET OPERATING COMPANY II LLC, doing business as Newington Healthcare Center, 1621 ROUTE 22 WEST OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Somerset Valley Rehabilitation and Nursing Center, 178 LOWELL STREET OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Lexington Healthcare Center, CARE ONE PARSIPPANY-TROY HILLS LLC, 2 COOPER PLAZA OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as South Jersey Healthcare Center, 2028 BRIDGEPORT AVENUE OPERATING CO II LLC, doing business as Golden Hill Health Care Center, 162 SOUTH BRITAIN ROAD OPERATING CO II LLC, doing business as River Glen Healthcare Center, CARE ONE AT PARSIPPANY TROY HILLS LLC, CARE ONE AT MOORESTOWN LLC, doing business as Care One at Moorestown, PARK MARION AND VERNON STREET OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Brookline Health Care Center, MILLENNIUM HEALTHCARE CENTERS II LLC, doing business as Care One at Dunroven, CARE ONE AT TEANECK LLC, CARE ONE AT EAST BRUNSWICK LLC, doing business as Care One at East Brunswick, CARE ONE AT TRINITAS LLC, dba LTACH Care One at Trinitas Reginoal Medical Center, CARE ONE AT HAMILTON LLC, doing business as Care One at Hamilton, REHABILITATION CENTER AT RARITAN BAY MEDICAL CENTER LLC, doing business as Care One at Raritan Bay Medical Center, CARE ONE AT HARMONY VILLAGE LLC, dba Care One Harmony Village at Moorestown, 245 ORANGE AVENUE OPERATING CO II LLC, doing business as West River Health Care Center, CARE ONE AT WALL LLC, 341 JORDAN LANE OPERATING CO II LLC, doing business as Wethersfield Healthacre Center, CARE ONE AT MADISON AVENUE LLC, doing business as Care One ar Madison Avenue and CARE ONE AT MERCER LLC, doing business as Care One at Ewing
Defendant: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NEW JERSEY
Petitioner: DES SENIOR CARE HOLDINGS LLC, dba Sweet Brook Care Centers
Plaintiff / Appellant: HEALTHBRIDGE MANAGEMENT LLC, CARE ONE LLC, CARE ONE AT BIRCHWOOD LLC, doing business as Care One at The Highlands, CARE ONE MANAGEMENT LLC and CARE REALTY LLC
Defendant / Appellee: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL INC, NEW ENGLAND HEALTH CARE EMPLOYEES UNION DISTRICT 1199, UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST SEIU 1199 and SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION
Case Number: 19-3693
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 38 TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) granting motion for extension of time filed by Appellants Care One LLC, Care Realty LLC, Care One Management LLC, Care One at Birchwood LLC and HealthBridge Management LLC. Appellants' brief, appendix and presentence report, if applicable, must be filed and served on or before February 21, 2020. (MB) [Entered: 01/13/2020 03:55 PM]
January 9, 2020 Filing 37 ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellants Care One Management LLC, Care One LLC, Care Realty LLC, HealthBridge Management LLC and Care One at Birchwood LLC for Extension of Time to file Appellants' opening brief and the joint appendix until/for 30 days, to and including 2/21/2020. Certificate of Service dated 01/09/2020. Service made by ECF. [19-3693] (RTE) [Entered: 01/09/2020 10:24 AM]
December 13, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Care One LLC, Care One Management LLC, Care One at Birchwood LLC, Care Realty LLC and HealthBridge Management LLCet al. due on or before 01/22/2020. Appendix due on or before 01/22/2020. (PDB) [Entered: 12/13/2019 03:04 PM]
December 11, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from George P. Barbatsuly on behalf of Appellant(s) All Appellants. [19-3693] (GPB) [Entered: 12/11/2019 09:42 PM]
December 11, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Rosemary Alito on behalf of Appellant(s) All Appellants. [19-3693] (GPB) [Entered: 12/11/2019 09:38 PM]
December 11, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Joshua S. Bolian on behalf of Appellant(s) All Appellants. [19-3693] (JSB) [Entered: 12/11/2019 09:18 PM]
December 11, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Donald Burke on behalf of Appellant(s) All Appellants. [19-3693] (DB) [Entered: 12/11/2019 09:11 PM]
December 11, 2019 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Care One Management LLC, Care One LLC, Care Realty LLC, HealthBridge Management LLC and Care One at Birchwood LLC. [19-3693] (RTE) [Entered: 12/11/2019 09:03 PM]
December 11, 2019 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Care One Management LLC, Care One LLC, Care Realty LLC, HealthBridge Management LLC and Care One at Birchwood LLC advising this court that no transcripts are available. [19-3693] (RTE) [Entered: 12/11/2019 08:58 PM]
December 11, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Care One Management LLC, Care One LLC, Care Realty LLC, HealthBridge Management LLC and Care One at Birchwood LLC. [19-3693] (RTE) [Entered: 12/11/2019 08:57 PM]
December 11, 2019 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Care One Management LLC, Care One LLC, Care Realty LLC, HealthBridge Management LLC and Care One at Birchwood LLC. [19-3693] (RTE) [Entered: 12/11/2019 08:55 PM]
December 11, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Roy T. Englert, Jr. on behalf of Appellant(s) All Appellants. [19-3693] (RTE) [Entered: 12/11/2019 08:46 PM]
December 11, 2019 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Leon Dayan, Esq. for Appellees New England Health Care Employees Union District 1199, Service Employees International Inc and United Healthcare Workers East SEIU 1199 to Clerk of the Court re Discrepancies in Case Caption. Certificate of Service dated 12/11/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-3693] (LD) [Entered: 12/11/2019 11:46 AM]
December 11, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from A. Matthew Boxer on behalf of Appellee(s) United Healthcare Workers East, SEIU 1199; New England Health Care Employees Union, District 1199; and Service Employees International Union. [19-3693] (AMB) [Entered: 12/11/2019 11:12 AM]
December 10, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Joshua Segal on behalf of Appellee(s) United Healthcare Workers East, SEIU 1199; New England Health Care Employees Union, District 1199; Service Employees International Union. [19-3693] (JAS) [Entered: 12/10/2019 06:26 PM]
December 10, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jacob Karabell on behalf of Appellee(s) United Healthcare Workers East, SEIU 1199; New England Health Care Employees Union, District 1199; Service Employees International Union. [19-3693] (JK) [Entered: 12/10/2019 06:23 PM]
December 10, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Service Employees International Union. [19-3693] (LD) [Entered: 12/10/2019 06:16 PM]
December 10, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee United Healthcare Workers East SEIU 1199. [19-3693] (LD) [Entered: 12/10/2019 06:10 PM]
December 10, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee New England Health Care Employees Union District 1199. [19-3693] (LD) [Entered: 12/10/2019 06:08 PM]
December 10, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Leon Dayan on behalf of Appellee(s) United Healthcare Workers East, SEIU 1199; New England Health Care Employees Union, District 1199; Service Employees International Union. [19-3693] (LD) [Entered: 12/10/2019 05:51 PM]
December 10, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David M. Slutsky on behalf of Appellee(s) 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. [19-3693] (DMS) [Entered: 12/10/2019 10:50 AM]
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) To facilitate electronic filing for larger groups of parties represented by the same attorney, the first named party in each group will be the designated filer, as follows: For all Appellants represented by Michael Critchley, Sr., Esq., or any other attorney from Critchley, Kinum & DeNoia, LLC, the designated filer shall be Care One at Birchwood, LLC. Counsel is advised that the designated filer is for cm/ecf filing purposes only. Names of all represented parties must be listed on all forms, motions and briefs. Attorneys representing smaller groups of parties must select all individual persons or entities as filers in cm/ecf, filed. (PDB) [Entered: 11/27/2019 11:47 AM]
November 27, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 11/27/2019 11:42 AM]
November 27, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Care One Management LLC and Care One at Birchwood LLC et al. in District Court No. 2-12-cv-06371. (PDB) [Entered: 11/27/2019 11:38 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Care One Management LLC, et al v. United Healthcare Workers East, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARE ONE HAMILTON LLC, doing business as Care One at Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARE ONE MERCER LLC, doing business as Care One at Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARE TWO LLC, doing business as Care One at Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELMWOOD EVESHAM ASSOCIATES LLC, doing business as Care One at Evesham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 162 SOUTH BRITAIN ROAD OPERATING CO II, LLC, doing business as River Glen Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILLENNIUM HEALTHCARE CENTERS LLC, doing business as Care One at Pine Rest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1 BURR ROAD OPERATING COMPANY II LLC, doing business as Westport Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARE ONE HARMONY VILLAGE LLC, dba Care One Harmony Village at Moorestown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PARK MARION VERNON STREET OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Brookline Health Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARE ONE TEANECK LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 19 VARNUM STREET OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Lowell Health Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 49 THOMAS PATTEN DRIVE OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Cedar Hill Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 221 FITZGERALD DRIVE OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as New Bedford Health Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 265 ESSEX STREET OPERATING CO LLC, dba Essex Park Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 57 OLD ROAD TO NINE ACRE CORNER OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Concord Health Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 745 HIGHLAND AVENUE OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as The Highlands Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 548 ELM STREET OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Calvin Coolidge Nursing and Rehab Center for NorthHampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REHABILITATION CENTER RARITAN BAY MEDICAL CENTER LLC, doing business as Care One at Raritan Bay Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARE ONE TRINITAS LLC, dba LTACH Care One at Trinitas Reginoal Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 245 ORANGE AVENUE OPERATING CO II, LLC, doing business as West River Health Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 750 WOBURN STREET OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Wilmington Health Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILLENNIUM HEALTHCARE CENTERS II, LLC, doing business as Care One at Dunroven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 199 ANDOVER STREET OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Peabody Glen Health Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2028 BRIDGEPORT AVENUE OPERATING CO II, LLC, doing business as Golden Hill Health Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARE ONE WALL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 107 OSBORNE STREET OPERATING CO II LLC, doing business as Danbury Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KING JAMES CARE CENTER OF MIDDLETOWN LLC, doing business as Care One ar King James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARE ONE MADISON AVENUE LLC, doing business as Care One ar Madison Avenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 493 BLACK OAK RIDGE ROAD LLC, dpong bsuiness as Care One at Wayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 312 MILLBURY AVENUE OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Millbury Health Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 64 PERFORMANCE DRIVE OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Weymouth Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 301 UNION STREET LLC, doing business as Care One at Wellington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARE ONE MOORESTOWN LLC, doing business as Care One at Moorestown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 800 RIVER ROAD OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Woodcrest Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2101 WASHINGTON STREET OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Newton Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARE ONE EAST BRUNSWICK LLC, doing business as Care One at East Brunswick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 341 JORDAN LANE OPERATING CO II, LLC, doing business as Wethersfield Healthacre Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 710 LONG RIDGE ROAD OPERATING CO II LLC, doing business as Stamford Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 135 BENTON DRIVE OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Redstone Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 600 KINDERKAMACK ROAD OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Oradell Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 260 EASTHAMPTON ROAD OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Holyoke Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 11 HISTORY LANE OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Care One at Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HCC LLC, doing business as Care One at Holmdel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 240 CHURCH STREET OPERATING COMPANY II LLC, doing business as Newington Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1621 ROUTE 22 WEST OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Somerset Valley Rehabilitation and Nursing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 178 LOWELL STREET OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Lexington Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARE ONE PARSIPPANY-TROY HILLS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2 COOPER PLAZA OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as South Jersey Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2028 BRIDGEPORT AVENUE OPERATING CO II LLC, doing business as Golden Hill Health Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 162 SOUTH BRITAIN ROAD OPERATING CO II LLC, doing business as River Glen Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARE ONE AT PARSIPPANY TROY HILLS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARE ONE AT MOORESTOWN LLC, doing business as Care One at Moorestown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PARK MARION AND VERNON STREET OPERATING CO LLC, doing business as Brookline Health Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILLENNIUM HEALTHCARE CENTERS II LLC, doing business as Care One at Dunroven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARE ONE AT TEANECK LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARE ONE AT EAST BRUNSWICK LLC, doing business as Care One at East Brunswick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARE ONE AT TRINITAS LLC, dba LTACH Care One at Trinitas Reginoal Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARE ONE AT HAMILTON LLC, doing business as Care One at Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REHABILITATION CENTER AT RARITAN BAY MEDICAL CENTER LLC, doing business as Care One at Raritan Bay Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARE ONE AT HARMONY VILLAGE LLC, dba Care One Harmony Village at Moorestown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 245 ORANGE AVENUE OPERATING CO II LLC, doing business as West River Health Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARE ONE AT WALL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 341 JORDAN LANE OPERATING CO II LLC, doing business as Wethersfield Healthacre Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARE ONE AT MADISON AVENUE LLC, doing business as Care One ar Madison Avenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARE ONE AT MERCER LLC, doing business as Care One at Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HEALTHBRIDGE MANAGEMENT LLC
Represented By: Rosemary Alito Esq.
Represented By: George P. Barbatsuly Esq.
Represented By: Donald Burke
Represented By: Roy T. Englert Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Joshua S. Bolian Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARE ONE LLC
Represented By: Rosemary Alito Esq.
Represented By: George P. Barbatsuly Esq.
Represented By: Donald Burke
Represented By: Roy T. Englert Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Joshua S. Bolian Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARE ONE AT BIRCHWOOD LLC, doing business as Care One at The Highlands
Represented By: Michael D. Critchley Esq.
Represented By: George P. Barbatsuly Esq.
Represented By: Donald Burke
Represented By: Roy T. Englert Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Joshua S. Bolian Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARE ONE MANAGEMENT LLC
Represented By: Rosemary Alito Esq.
Represented By: George P. Barbatsuly Esq.
Represented By: Donald Burke
Represented By: Roy T. Englert Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Joshua S. Bolian Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARE REALTY LLC
Represented By: Rosemary Alito Esq.
Represented By: George P. Barbatsuly Esq.
Represented By: Donald Burke
Represented By: Roy T. Englert Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Joshua S. Bolian Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL INC
Represented By: A. Matthew Boxer Esq.
Represented By: R. Scott Thompson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEW ENGLAND HEALTH CARE EMPLOYEES UNION DISTRICT 1199
Represented By: A. Matthew Boxer Esq.
Represented By: R. Scott Thompson Esq.
Represented By: Leon Dayan Esq.
Represented By: Jacob Karabell Esq.
Represented By: Joshua A. Segal Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST SEIU 1199
Represented By: A. Matthew Boxer Esq.
Represented By: David M. Slutsky Esq.
Represented By: R. Scott Thompson Esq.
Represented By: Leon Dayan Esq.
Represented By: Jacob Karabell Esq.
Represented By: Joshua A. Segal Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION
Represented By: A. Matthew Boxer Esq.
Represented By: R. Scott Thompson Esq.
Represented By: Leon Dayan Esq.
Represented By: Jacob Karabell Esq.
Represented By: Joshua A. Segal Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DES SENIOR CARE HOLDINGS LLC, dba Sweet Brook Care Centers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?