Renee Palakovic, et al v. John Wetzel, et al
Plaintiff: RENEE PALAKOVIC, as Administrator of the Estate of BRANDON PALAKOVIC and DARIAN PALAKOVIC, as Administrator of the Estate of BRANDON PALAKOVIC
Defendant: SERGEANT DOUS, SERGEANT KUSHNER and SERGEANT ROBERT REED
Defendant / Appellee: MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES INC, DR. JAMES HARRINGTON, FRANCIS PIROZZOLA, JOHN E. WETZEL, KENNETH CAMERON, MHM INC, JAMEY LUTHER, CORRECTION OFFICER KUSHNER, DR. CAROL EIDSVOOG, HEARING EXAMINER ROBERT REED, JAMIE BOYLES, DR. DALEEP RATHORE, MORRIS HOUSER, MICHELLE HOUSER and SUPERINTENDENT SCI GREENE
Petitioner / Appellant: RONALD G. DANDAR
Case Number: 19-3994
Filed: December 31, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 10 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees Carol Eidsvoog, MHM Correctional Services Inc, MHM Inc and Daleep Rathore. [19-3994] (CLN) [Entered: 02/21/2020 03:08 PM]
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Appellant Mr. Ronald G. Dandar requesting Affidavit of Poverty for Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, IFP Addendum, IFP Authorization, and Certified Prison Account Statement. Compliance due 02/21/2020. (ARR) [Entered: 02/07/2020 01:58 PM]
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Quinn Cozzens, Esq., Jonathan H. Feinberg, Esq., Bret Grote, Esq., Michael J. Healey, Esq., Jamelia N. Morgan, Esq. and David Rudovsky, Esq. for Renee Palakovic and Darian Palakovic requesting the following document: Appearance Form on or before 02/07/2020; AND Cassidy L. Neal, Esq. for MHM Correctional Services Inc. and MHM Inc. requesting the following document: Corporate Disclosure Statement on or before 02/07/2020. (ARR) [Entered: 01/24/2020 11:46 AM]
January 23, 2020 Filing 5 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Howard G. Hopkirk on behalf of Appellee(s) Supt. SCI-Greene, Keith Cameron, Jamie Boyles, Jamey Luther, Dr. James Harrington, Michelle Houser, Morris Houser, Francis Pirozzola. [19-3994] (HGH) [Entered: 01/23/2020 01:56 PM]
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Ronald G. Dandar for Recusal of District Court Judge Kim R. Gibson. Certificate of Service dated 01/09/2020. Service made by US mail. (ARR) [Entered: 02/07/2020 01:56 PM]
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Ronald G. Dandar to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Demonstrating Imminent Danger. Certificate of Service dated 01/09/2020. Service made by US mail. (ARR) [Entered: 02/07/2020 01:54 PM]
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Cassidy Leah Neal, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) MHM Correctional Services, Inc., "incorrectly identified as MHM Inc.". [19-3994] (CLN) [Entered: 01/15/2020 04:47 PM]
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Cassidy L. Neal, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Dr. Rathore, Dr. Eidsvoog, MHM Correctional Services, Inc.. [19-3994] (CLN) [Entered: 01/03/2020 03:57 PM]
December 31, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (NR) [Entered: 12/31/2019 03:02 PM]
December 31, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Ronald G. Dandar in District Court No. 3-14-cv-00145. (NR) [Entered: 12/31/2019 02:45 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Renee Palakovic, et al v. John Wetzel, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES INC
Represented By: Cassidy L. Neal Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. JAMES HARRINGTON
Represented By: Scott A. Bradley Esq.
Represented By: Yana L. Warshafsky Esq.
Represented By: Howard G. Hopkirk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRANCIS PIROZZOLA
Represented By: Scott A. Bradley Esq.
Represented By: Yana L. Warshafsky Esq.
Represented By: Howard G. Hopkirk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN E. WETZEL
Represented By: Scott A. Bradley Esq.
Represented By: Yana L. Warshafsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENNETH CAMERON
Represented By: Scott A. Bradley Esq.
Represented By: Yana L. Warshafsky Esq.
Represented By: Howard G. Hopkirk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MHM INC
Represented By: Cassidy L. Neal Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMEY LUTHER
Represented By: Scott A. Bradley Esq.
Represented By: Yana L. Warshafsky Esq.
Represented By: Howard G. Hopkirk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORRECTION OFFICER KUSHNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. CAROL EIDSVOOG
Represented By: Cassidy L. Neal Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HEARING EXAMINER ROBERT REED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMIE BOYLES
Represented By: Scott A. Bradley Esq.
Represented By: Yana L. Warshafsky Esq.
Represented By: Howard G. Hopkirk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. DALEEP RATHORE
Represented By: Cassidy L. Neal Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MORRIS HOUSER
Represented By: Scott A. Bradley Esq.
Represented By: Yana L. Warshafsky Esq.
Represented By: Howard G. Hopkirk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHELLE HOUSER
Represented By: Scott A. Bradley Esq.
Represented By: Yana L. Warshafsky Esq.
Represented By: Howard G. Hopkirk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUPERINTENDENT SCI GREENE
Represented By: Scott A. Bradley Esq.
Represented By: Yana L. Warshafsky Esq.
Represented By: Howard G. Hopkirk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT DOUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT KUSHNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT ROBERT REED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RENEE PALAKOVIC, as Administrator of the Estate of BRANDON PALAKOVIC
Represented By: Quinn Cozzens Esq.
Represented By: Bret Grote Esq.
Represented By: David Rudovsky Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan H. Feinberg Esq.
Represented By: Michael J. Healey Esq.
Represented By: Jamelia N. Morgan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARIAN PALAKOVIC, as Administrator of the Estate of BRANDON PALAKOVIC
Represented By: Quinn Cozzens Esq.
Represented By: Bret Grote Esq.
Represented By: David Rudovsky Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan H. Feinberg Esq.
Represented By: Jamelia N. Morgan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: RONALD G. DANDAR
Represented By: Ronald G. Dandar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?