Jamiel Johnson v. John Wetzel, et al
Defendant / Appellee: DORINA VARNER, LISA HOLLIBAUGH, DEBRA JADLOCKI, KEVIN KAUFFMAN, RICHARD MOYER, JOHN WETZEL, LISA CLINGER and JOHN E. WETZEL
Plaintiff / Appellant: JAMIEL JOHNSON
Case Number: 20-1991
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (Clerk) The foregoing motion is granted. Appellant must either pay to the district court the entire docketing and filing fee of $505.00 or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, along with an addendum to the affidavit in support of the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis , a completed form authorizing assessments to be made from his prison account, and a certified prison account statement within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Should Appellant fail to either pay the fees or file the motion within the time stated, he will face dismissal of the appeal pursuant to Third Circuit LAR 3.3 and Misc. 107.1 without further notice. (LMR) [Entered: 06/22/2020 10:54 AM]
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE on behalf of Appellant Jamiel Johnson to Legal Division letter advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 06/05/2020. Service made by US mail. (LMR) [Entered: 06/12/2020 02:50 PM]
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION filed by Appellee Richard Moyer for Extension of Time to File for In Forma Pauperis. Certificate of Service dated 05/25/2020. Service made by US mail. (LMR) [Entered: 06/12/2020 02:48 PM]
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Howard G. Hopkirk on behalf of Appellee(s) John Wetzel, Lisa Clinger, Lisa Hollibaugh, Debra Jadlocki, Kevin Kauffman, Richard Moyer, Dorina Varner. [20-1991] (HGH) [Entered: 05/28/2020 04:06 PM]
May 15, 2020 Filing 3 LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (MW) [Entered: 05/15/2020 08:21 AM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR) [Entered: 05/11/2020 02:12 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Jamiel Johnson in District Court No. 3-17-cv-00364. (LMR) [Entered: 05/11/2020 02:08 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jamiel Johnson v. John Wetzel, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DORINA VARNER
Represented By: Caleb C. Enerson Esq.
Represented By: Howard G. Hopkirk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LISA HOLLIBAUGH
Represented By: Caleb C. Enerson Esq.
Represented By: Howard G. Hopkirk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEBRA JADLOCKI
Represented By: Caleb C. Enerson Esq.
Represented By: Howard G. Hopkirk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEVIN KAUFFMAN
Represented By: Caleb C. Enerson Esq.
Represented By: Howard G. Hopkirk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD MOYER
Represented By: Caleb C. Enerson Esq.
Represented By: Howard G. Hopkirk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN WETZEL
Represented By: Caleb C. Enerson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LISA CLINGER
Represented By: Caleb C. Enerson Esq.
Represented By: Howard G. Hopkirk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN E. WETZEL
Represented By: Caleb C. Enerson Esq.
Represented By: Howard G. Hopkirk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMIEL JOHNSON
Represented By: Jamiel Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?