Cyril Pyle v. Otis Elevator Co
Plaintiff / Appellant: CYRIL PYLE
Defendant / Appellee: OTIS ELEVATOR CO
Case Number: 20-2393
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 13 Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 07/31/2020 01:19 PM]
July 31, 2020 Filing 12 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Otis Elevator Co. [20-2393] (JMF) [Entered: 07/31/2020 10:26 AM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 11 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Cyril Pyle. [20-2393] (SEQ) [Entered: 07/30/2020 12:25 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Christine O. Boyd, Esq. for Otis Elevator Co, Jonathan M. Freiman, Esq. for Otis Elevator Co and Michele N. Miller, Esq. for Otis Elevator Co requesting the following document(s): Disclosure Statement on or before 08/13/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 07/30/2020 12:07 PM]
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 07/28/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 07/29/2020 08:15 AM]
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Cyril Pyle advising this court that no transcripts are available. [20-2393] (SEQ) [Entered: 07/28/2020 04:29 PM]
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Cyril Pyle. [20-2393] (SEQ) [Entered: 07/28/2020 04:28 PM]
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Cyril Pyle. [20-2393] (SEQ) [Entered: 07/28/2020 04:27 PM]
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sean E. Quinn, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Cyril Pyle. [20-2393] (SEQ) [Entered: 07/28/2020 04:26 PM]
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jonathan M. Freiman on behalf of Appellee(s) Otis Elevator Co. [20-2393] (JMF) [Entered: 07/28/2020 11:05 AM]
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 Appendix Citation Notice sent to Sean E. Quinn, Esq., Christine O. Boyd, Esq., Michele N. Miller, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 07/29/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 07/15/2020 09:50 AM]
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR) [Entered: 07/15/2020 09:49 AM]
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Cyril Pyle in District Court No. 2-19-cv-04283. (LMR) [Entered: 07/15/2020 09:47 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Cyril Pyle v. Otis Elevator Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CYRIL PYLE
Represented By: Sean E. Quinn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OTIS ELEVATOR CO
Represented By: Michele N. Miller Esq.
Represented By: Christine O. Boyd Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan M. Freiman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?