Annette Steinhardt v. Bernardsville Police Dept, et al
Defendant: DETECTIVE BRIAN HOEY and DETECTIVE THOMAS L. WHITEHEAD
Defendant / Appellee: STEVEN SEIPEL, Bernardsville Police Department, DETECTIVE DOUGLAS BROWNLIE, BERNARDSVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT, CAPTAIN BRIAN HOEY, SOMERSET COUNTY PROSECUTOR, THOMAS L. WHITEHEAD, CHIEF KEVIN VALENTINE, DETECTIVE PAUL KELLY, also known as Walter P. Kelley, WILLIAM USSERY, Retired Chief of Police Bernardsville, DETECTIVE BRIAN KELLY and SOMERSET COUNTY PROSECUTORS OFFICE
Plaintiff / Appellant: ANNETTE L. STEINHARDT
Case Number: 20-2825
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER (Clerk) The foregoing motion, response and reply are referred to the merits panel for a decision after the parties' briefs have been filed. The stay of this appeal is lifted. A briefing schedule will be issued shortly. If the appellant does not file a brief, the appeal will be dismissed. See 3d Cir. L.A.R. 107.2(b). Ordinarily, this Court is limited to reviewing only the record that was developed during the district-court proceedings. See Fed. R. App. P. 10(a). If the appellant obtains new material that was not presented to the district court, she may ask this Court to review it by filing a motion to expand the record. If the appellant obtains new material and wants to present it to the district court, this order does not prevent her from making any appropriate motion in the district court. See, e.g., Fed. R. App. P. 12.1; Fed. R. Civ. P. 62.1. (SLC) [Entered: 04/09/2021 10:10 AM]
April 5, 2021 Filing 19 ECF FILER: REPLY on behalf of Appellant Annette L. Steinhardt containing Oppose T. Beck letter dated March 30, 2021. Certificate of Service dated 04/05/2021 by ECF. [20-2825]--[Edited 04/06/2021 by SLC] SEND TO MERITS--[Edited 04/09/2021 by SLC] (ALS) [Entered: 04/05/2021 09:51 PM]
March 30, 2021 Filing 18 ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellees Bernardsville Police Department, Paul Kelly and Kevin Valentine to motion record. Certificate of Service dated 03/30/2021. [20-2825] SEND TO MERITS--[Edited 04/09/2021 by SLC] (TPB) [Entered: 03/30/2021 03:07 PM]
March 16, 2021 Filing 17 ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant Annette L. Steinhardt to Court Order for Teresa Van Allen to supply all court records requested for trial that took place on 7/20/15. For records that are excluded from Public Records request under 1:38-3 and was submitted to the court on July 6, 2015. Certificate of Service dated 03/16/2021. Service made by ECF. [20-2825] SEND TO MERITS.--[Edited 04/09/2021 by SLC] (ALS) [Entered: 03/16/2021 09:07 PM]
March 15, 2021 Filing 16 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC ADDENDUM to RESPONSE on behalf of Appellant Annette L. Steinhardt containing Letter to the court regarding assigned parties working on records request. Certificate of Service dated 03/15/2021 by ECF. [20-2825] (ALS) [Entered: 03/15/2021 07:10 PM]
March 4, 2021 Filing 15 ECF FILER: SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC ADDENDUM to RESPONSE on behalf of Appellant Annette L. Steinhardt containing Status report as requested by the court for Bernardsville court records for July 6th, 2015. Certificate of Service dated 03/04/2021 by ECF. [20-2825] (ALS) [Entered: 03/04/2021 10:31 PM]
February 4, 2021 Filing 14 ECF FILER: SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC ADDENDUM to RESPONSE on behalf of Appellant Annette L. Steinhardt containing Confirmation of Superior Court of NJ has acknowledged my records request.. Certificate of Service dated 02/04/2021 by ECF. [20-2825] (ALS) [Entered: 02/04/2021 07:05 PM]
February 3, 2021 Filing 13 ECF FILER: STATUS REPORT received from Appellees Bernardsville Police Department, Brian Kelly, Paul Kelly, Steven Seipel, Somerset County Prosecutors Office, William Ussery, Kevin Valentine and Appellant Annette L. Steinhardt. Certificate of Service dated 02/03/2021. Service made by ECF. [20-2825] (ALS) [Entered: 02/03/2021 08:19 PM]
January 4, 2021 Filing 12 ECF FILER: SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC ADDENDUM to RESPONSE on behalf of Appellant Annette L. Steinhardt containing Responding to court required update status. Certificate of Service dated 01/04/2021 by ECF. [20-2825] (ALS) [Entered: 01/04/2021 09:19 PM]
December 3, 2020 Filing 11 ECF FILER: STATUS REPORT filed by Appellant Annette L. Steinhardt. Certificate of Service dated 12/03/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-2825] (ALS) [Entered: 12/03/2020 06:47 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 10 ECF FILER: STATUS REPORT received from Appellees Bernardsville Police Department, Brian Kelly, Paul Kelly, Steven Seipel, Somerset County Prosecutors Office, William Ussery, Kevin Valentine and Appellant Annette L. Steinhardt. Certificate of Service dated 11/04/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-2825] (ALS) [Entered: 11/04/2020 12:44 AM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 9 ECF FILER: STATUS REPORT received from Appellees Bernardsville Police Department, Brian Kelly, Paul Kelly, Steven Seipel, Somerset County Prosecutors Office, William Ussery, Kevin Valentine and Appellant Annette L. Steinhardt. Certificate of Service dated 11/04/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-2825] (ALS) [Entered: 11/04/2020 12:44 AM]
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (Clerk) The foregoing motion is granted. The appeal is hereby stayed pending receipt of requested records for a period of sixty (60) days of the date of this order. Appellant is directed to file a status report within thirty (30) days and every thirty (30) days thereafter until the requested documents are received. Appellant is also directed to include a list of the requested items in the first status report filed. (SLC) [Entered: 10/28/2020 06:59 AM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Timothy P. Beck on behalf of Appellee(s) Bernardsville Police Department, Kevin Valentine, Officer Horsey, Brian Kelly, Paul Kelly a/k/a Walter P. Kelley, William Ussery, Steven Seipel, Bernardsville Borough Council, Josh Fowler, Kevin Sooy, Miles S. Winder III, Sandra Jones. [20-2825] (TPB) [Entered: 10/19/2020 10:22 AM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Timothy P. Beck, Esq. for Paul Kelly, Kevin Valentine, Brian Kelly, Bernardsville Police Department, William Ussery and Steven Seipel requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 11/02/2020. (SLC) [Entered: 10/19/2020 09:15 AM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION filed by Appellant Annette L. Steinhardt to Stay Case Pending Receipt of Documents. Response due on 10/29/2020. Certificate of Service dated 10/19/2020. Service made by ECF. (SLC) [Entered: 10/19/2020 09:05 AM]
October 12, 2020 Filing 3 ECF FILER: SUPPLEMENTAL 3137_001 - (1) Certificate if Service (2) Copy of public record request sent to Superior Court Clerk for court hearing held on 7/6/15 and not limited to audio / visual tapes for entire day (3) stay for court to respond filed by Appellees Bernardsville Police Department, Douglas Brownlie, Brian Hoey, Brian Kelly, Paul Kelly, Steven Seipel, Somerset County Prosecutors Office, William Ussery, Kevin Valentine, Thomas L. Whitehead and Appellant Annette L. Steinhardt. Certificate of Service dated 10/11/2020. Service made by ECF, Email, US mail. [20-2825] (ALS) [Entered: 10/12/2020 08:56 AM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 09/16/2020. (SLC) [Entered: 10/19/2020 09:13 AM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SLC) [Entered: 09/11/2020 09:52 AM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Annette L. Steinhardt in District Court No. 3-17-cv-02169. (SLC) [Entered: 09/11/2020 09:49 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Annette Steinhardt v. Bernardsville Police Dept, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVEN SEIPEL, Bernardsville Police Department
Represented By: Timothy P. Beck Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DETECTIVE DOUGLAS BROWNLIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BERNARDSVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Timothy P. Beck Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAPTAIN BRIAN HOEY, SOMERSET COUNTY PROSECUTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS L. WHITEHEAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHIEF KEVIN VALENTINE
Represented By: Timothy P. Beck Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DETECTIVE PAUL KELLY, also known as Walter P. Kelley
Represented By: Timothy P. Beck Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM USSERY, Retired Chief of Police Bernardsville
Represented By: Timothy P. Beck Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DETECTIVE BRIAN KELLY
Represented By: Timothy P. Beck Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SOMERSET COUNTY PROSECUTORS OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANNETTE L. STEINHARDT
Represented By: Annette L. Steinhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DETECTIVE BRIAN HOEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DETECTIVE THOMAS L. WHITEHEAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?