Rancourt Woodell v. Blatt, et al
Defendant: DR. BOLK, State Correctional Institution at Fayette, MICHELLE L. HOWARD-DIGGS, Physician Assistant, State Correctional Institution at Fayette, CLARK, Counselor, State Correctional Institution at Fayette, LAURA BANTA, Deputy Superintendent, DR. BANBRIDGE, Wexford Care Company Employee, DR. BLATT, Wexford Care Company Employee, JOHN SILVA, PA. D.O.C. Chief Grievance & Appeals Coordinator (M.S. Siliva), MARSH, Deputy Superintendent, State Correctional Institution at Rockview, DR. TOBIN, Wexford Care Company Employee, CHRIS MYERS, Physician Assistant, DR. GOK, Wexford Care Company Employee, BUREAU OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES, Pa. Department of Corrections Executive Office, JAIME LINK, R.N., DR. SMITH, Wexford Care Company Employee, TAMMY FERGUSON, Superintendent, DR. NICHOLAS SCHARIFF, Correct Care Solutions Employee, TOMASZ BORZECKI, L.P.N., DR. BIGGIO, Wexford Care Company Employee, DR. BALK, PA Department of Corrections Executive Office, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AT GRATERFORD, PA DOC BUREAU OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES, Sued in their Individual & Official Capacity, DR. JOHN SYNMONS, Medical Director, State Correctional Institution at Rockview, MANDY SIPPLE, Deputy Superintendent, SAM DOE, L.P.N., SUPERINTENDENT FRANKLIN TENNIS, State Correctional Institution at Rockview, MAJOR THOMAS DOHMAN, JEANNE DE FRANGESCO, Licensed Nurse Practitioner, DR. LEWIS, Wexford Care Company Employee, M. BZELTE, Health Care Administrator, State Correctional Institution at Fayette and DEPUTY COFFMAN, State Correctional Institution at Rockview
Defendant / Appellee: DR. MOHATA, Graterford Mental Health Department Employees, JOE KORSZNIAK, Corrections Health Care Administrator, DR. VONTERSKY, Graterford Mental Health Department Employees, DR. STEPHEN WEINER, M.D.O, MARTINEZ, Graterford Mental Health Department Employees, SAVAREEDRA, Psychiatrist, State Correctional Institution at Fayette and BURKE, Captain, State Correctional Institution at Rockview
Plaintiff / Appellant: RANCOURT WOODELL
Case Number: 20-3044
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 11 NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Appellant Rancourt Woodell requesting Prison Account Statement. Compliance due 11/12/2020. (MB) [Entered: 10/29/2020 09:29 AM]
October 27, 2020 Filing 10 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Caitlin J. Goodrich on behalf of Appellee(s) Stephen Kaminsky, PA-C, Jeanne DeFrangesco, CRNP, and Dr. Stephen Wiener. [20-3044] (CJG) [Entered: 10/27/2020 01:20 PM]
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Caitlin J. Goodrich, Esq. for Stephen Weiner and George L. Young, Jr., Esq. for Doctor Vontersky requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 11/09/2020. (MB) [Entered: 10/26/2020 03:05 PM]
October 22, 2020 Filing 8 IN FORMA PAUPERIS PRISONER AUTHORIZATION on behalf of Appellant Rancourt Woodell. (MB) [Entered: 10/26/2020 02:36 PM]
October 22, 2020 Filing 7 IN FORMA PAUPERIS PRISONER ADDENDUM on behalf of Appellant Rancourt Woodell. (MB) [Entered: 10/26/2020 02:30 PM]
October 22, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION filed by Appellant Rancourt Woodell to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Response due on 11/05/2020. Certificate of Service dated 10/26/2020. Service made by ECF. (MB) [Entered: 10/26/2020 02:29 PM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Claudia M. Tesoro on behalf of Appellee(s) Michael Wenerowicz, Gerald Galinski, Suzanne Karpinski, Jeffrey Baker, Althea King, Donald Whitfield, Rhonda House, Louis Bozelli, Kenneth Randolph, Debra Hawkinberry, Joseph Trempus, Ida DiCio, Noel Ranker, Carl Walker, Eric Armel, Brian Coleman, Susan Berrier, Steven Gates, Edward Manchas, Michael Zaken, Shirley Moore Smeal, Raymond Moore, Robert Marsh, Jay Lane, Marirosa Lamas, Richard Ellers, Dorina Varner, Laura Banta, George Ondrejka, Joseph Terra, Joseph Korszniak, Robert Grossman, and Cynthia Link. [20-3044] (CMT) [Entered: 10/19/2020 09:54 AM]
October 15, 2020 Filing 4 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Cassidy L. Neal on behalf of Appellee(s) Dr. Martinez, Dr. Mohata, Dr. Saavedra, Dr. Burke. [20-3044] (CLN) [Entered: 10/15/2020 10:49 AM]
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (Clerk) for all parties represented by Stephen R. Kovaits, Esq. the designated filer shall be Joe Korszniak and Caitlin J. Goodrich, Esq. the designated filer shall be Stephen Weiner. (MB) [Entered: 10/07/2020 02:25 PM]
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (MB) [Entered: 10/07/2020 02:17 PM]
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Rancourt Woodell in District Court No. 2-18-cv-01098. (MB) [Entered: 10/07/2020 02:14 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Rancourt Woodell v. Blatt, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. BOLK, State Correctional Institution at Fayette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELLE L. HOWARD-DIGGS, Physician Assistant, State Correctional Institution at Fayette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK, Counselor, State Correctional Institution at Fayette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURA BANTA, Deputy Superintendent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. BANBRIDGE, Wexford Care Company Employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. BLATT, Wexford Care Company Employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN SILVA, PA. D.O.C. Chief Grievance & Appeals Coordinator (M.S. Siliva)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARSH, Deputy Superintendent, State Correctional Institution at Rockview
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. TOBIN, Wexford Care Company Employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS MYERS, Physician Assistant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. GOK, Wexford Care Company Employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUREAU OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES, Pa. Department of Corrections Executive Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAIME LINK, R.N.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. SMITH, Wexford Care Company Employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAMMY FERGUSON, Superintendent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. NICHOLAS SCHARIFF, Correct Care Solutions Employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOMASZ BORZECKI, L.P.N.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. BIGGIO, Wexford Care Company Employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. BALK, PA Department of Corrections Executive Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AT GRATERFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PA DOC BUREAU OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES, Sued in their Individual & Official Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. JOHN SYNMONS, Medical Director, State Correctional Institution at Rockview
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANDY SIPPLE, Deputy Superintendent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAM DOE, L.P.N.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUPERINTENDENT FRANKLIN TENNIS, State Correctional Institution at Rockview
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAJOR THOMAS DOHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEANNE DE FRANGESCO, Licensed Nurse Practitioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. LEWIS, Wexford Care Company Employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. BZELTE, Health Care Administrator, State Correctional Institution at Fayette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUTY COFFMAN, State Correctional Institution at Rockview
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. MOHATA, Graterford Mental Health Department Employees
Represented By: Cassidy L. Neal Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOE KORSZNIAK, Corrections Health Care Administrator
Represented By: Stephen R. Kovatis Esq.
Represented By: Claudia M. Tesoro Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. VONTERSKY, Graterford Mental Health Department Employees
Represented By: George L. Young Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. STEPHEN WEINER, M.D.O
Represented By: Caitlin J. Goodrich Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARTINEZ, Graterford Mental Health Department Employees
Represented By: Cassidy L. Neal Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAVAREEDRA, Psychiatrist, State Correctional Institution at Fayette
Represented By: Cassidy L. Neal Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BURKE, Captain, State Correctional Institution at Rockview
Represented By: Cassidy L. Neal Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RANCOURT WOODELL
Represented By: Rancourt Woodell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?