David Martincic, et al v. AO Smith Corp, et al
Defendant: SULZER PUMPS SOLUTIONS INC, FKA Ahlstrom Pumps LLC, EICHLEAY CORP, GARDNER DENVER INC, ATWOOD & MORRILL CO INC, DBA Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc, CARRIER CORP, GENERAL ELECTRIC CO, BORGWARNER MORSE TEC, LLC, NOOTER CONSTRUCTION CO, in its own right and as successor-ininterest to Nooter Corporation and John Nooter Boiler Works Company, READING CRANE AND ENGINEERING CO, RESEARCH-COTTRELL INC, NKA AWT Air Company, Inc., SPIRAX SARCO INC, UNION CARBIDE CORP, CLARK RELIANCE CORP, and its Division Jerguson Gage and Valve, LINTERN CORP, COUNTY OF ALLEGHENY, AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION INC, FKA URS Energy & Construction, FKA Catalytic Construction Co, SANTA FE BRAUN INC, individually and as successor to CF Braun & Co., URBAN REDEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY OF PITTSBURGH, ALLEGHENY COUNTY AIRPORT AUTHORITY, WTI RUST HOLDINGS, ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS INC, FKA WCI Outdoor Products Inc, RCH NEW CO II LLC, FKA Robertson Ceco Corp, an alleged successor to H.H. Robertson Company, SEAL & DESIGN HIGBEE INC, RUST ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION INC, FKA Treco Construction Services, FKA Rust Engineering Co, AR WIFLEY AND SONS INC, GRINNELL LLC, MCCARLS INC, MORGAN ENGINEERING SYSTEMS INC, BRAND INSULATIONS INC, NOOTER CONSTRUCTION CO LLC, in its own right and as successor-ininterest to Nooter Corporation and John Nooter Boiler Works Company, BRIDGEVILLE AUTO PARTS INC, TRANE US INC, FKA American Standard Corp, FKA American Radiator & Standard Sanitary, in its own right and as Successor to Westinghouse Airbrake and/or WABCO, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO, FKA Metropolitan Insurance Co, ZURN INDUSTRIES, AKA Erie Iron City Works, MET-PRO CORP, and its Dean Pump Brand, DBA Met-Pro Global Pump Solutions, WHEELABRATOR AIR POLLUTION CONTROL INC, MILWAUKEE VALVE CO LLC, HAMWORTHY PEABODY COMBUSTION INC, JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING LLC, FKA Joy Technologies Inc, TENOVA INC, FKA Tenova Core Inc, FKA Techint Technologies Inc, FKA Core Furnace Systems Corp, APPLIED INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGIES INC, RESCO HOLDINGS LLC, as successor to the M.W. Kellogg Company, SURFACE COMBUSTION, FLSMIDTH INC, FKA Fuller Co, FLUOR CORP, a/k/a FLUOR CORPORATION, EATON CORP, NKA Eaton Electrical Inc, SUNBEAM PRODUCTS INC, FLUOR ENTERPRISES INC, a/k/a FLUOR CORPORATION, EVOQUA WATER TECHNOLOGIES LLC and IU NORTH AMERICA INC, FKA Gage Co, FKA Pittsburgh Gage and Supply Co
Defendant / Appellee: AURORA PUMPS, SAUER INC, BMI REFRACTORY SERVICES INC, SWINDELL-DRESSLER INTERNATIONAL CO, BEAZER EAST INC, in its own right and as Successor to Koppers, Co., and other related Companies, including Thiem Corporation, Beazer USA, ,Inc., and Beazer, PLC., EVOQUA WATER TECHNOLOGIES LLC, in its Own right and as successor-in-interest to Wallace & Tiernan, FLSMIDTH INC, as successor-in-interest to Keeler-Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company, FKA Fuller Co, MCWANE INC, INDUCTOTHERM INDUSTRIES INC, REUNION INDUSTRIES INC, NASH ENGINEERING CO, ROBBINS & MYERS INC, FLOWSERVE UNITED STATES INC, solely as successor to Nordstrom Audco, Edward Valves, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., and Rockwell Manufacturing Company, FKA Flowserve FSD Corp, Successor to Valtek International, GREENE TWEED & CO, SUNDYNE LLC, DRAVO CORP, MCNEIL OHIO CORP, INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORP, FKA Carborundum Corp, DONALD MCKAY SMITH INC, GENUINE PARTS CO, AMETEK INC, ABB INC, as successor to Brown Boveri (Individually and as successor-in-interest to ITE Imperial CO f/k/a ITE CIRCUIT BREAKER COMPAMY), SUNBEAM PRODUCTS INC, as successor-in-interest to Sunbeam Corporation, PLASTICS ENGINEERING CO, WEST END CONTRACTING CORP, FKA Minnotte Contracting Corp, GG OF FLORIDA INC, ROBINSON FANS INC, VIKING PUMP INC, WASHINGTON GROUP INTERNATIONAL INC, FKA Raytheon Engineers & Constructors, and all Its domestic subsidiaries including The Badger Company, Inc., GORMAN RUPP CO, JOHNSON CONTROLS INC, NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO, CBS CORP, FKA Viacom Inc, as Successor by Merger to CBS Corp, FKA Westinghouse Electric Corp, CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORP, FKA Cooper Cameron Corp, EATON CORP, as successor-in-interest to Cutler-Hammer, Inc.,, NKA Eaton Electrical Inc, POWER PIPING CO, PFAUDLER INC, YORK INTERNATIONAL CORP, WYETH HOLDINGS CORP, FKA American Cyanamid Co, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, a/k/a FLUOR CORPORATION, MARLEY-WYLAIN CO, incorrectly named as Weil-McLain Company, MAGNETEK INC, OCEAN VIEW CAPITAL, FKA Triangle PWC Inc, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC, FKA Allied Signal Inc, as successor-in-interest to the Bendix Corporation, SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES INC, FKA Marley Cooling Technologies Inc, FKA Marley Cooling Tower Co, FLOWSERVE CORP, FKA Durametallic Corp, FKA Duriron Co Inc, ATLAS INDUSTRIES INC, UNITED STATES STEEL CORP, MW CUSTOM PAPERS, AKA Mead, WHEELING RUBBER PRODUCTS INC, PROCESS VALVE & EQUIPMENT CO, LINDBERG, WEIL MCLAIN, SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA INC, FKA Square D Co, NORTEK GLOBAL HVAC LLC, as successor by merger to Reznor, LLC, FMC CORP, MS JACOBS & ASSOCIATES INC, SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES INC, FKA Norton Co, AJAX MAGNETHERMIC CORP, SPX FLOW US LLC, AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP, Successor-by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc., BW IP INC, BECHTEL CORP, BLOOM ENGINEERING CO INC, WARREN PUMPS LLC, BAKER HUGHES, a GE Company, LLC, NAGLE PUMPS INC, DEZURIK, CARVER PUMP COMPANY, YUBA HEAT TRANSFER LLC, INDUSTRIAL RUBBER PRODUCTS, BURNHAM LLC, MCJUNKIN REDMAN CORP, FKA MRC Global US Inc, CRANE CO, AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORP, ALFA LAVAL INC, SEALING SPECIALISTS & SERVICE CO, HUNTER SALES CORP, IMO INDUSTRIES INC, FKA IMO Delaval Inc, FKA Devalco Corp Inc, FKA Delaval Turbine Inc, GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO, RILEY POWER INC, FKA Riley Stoker Corp, AIRTEK INC, WT HRC CORP, FKA Whiting Corp, TUTHILL CORP, MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY, ITT INDUSTRIES INC, CASHCO INC, DICK CORP, COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORP, VELAN VALVE COPORATION, ECODYNE CORP, CLEAVER BROOKS INC, FKA Aqua Chem, GOULDS PUMP LLC, LINDBERG MPH, COST CO, FKA Cost Corp, ARMSTRONG PUMPS INC, FLUOR CORP, BLUE M CORP, HAMMOND VALVE CO, DAP INC, NKA La Mirada Prod Co, FLUOR ENTERPRISES INC, COST MANAGEMENT LLC, AO SMITH CORP, HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA INC, FKA Howden Buffalo Inc, SIMAKAS CO INC, JM FOSTER INC, CATERPILLAR INC, OSRAM SYLVANIA INC, in its own right and as Successor-in-interest to GTE Products Corporation, The Clark Controller Company and A.O. Smith Corporation, INGERSOLL RAND CORP, GOULD ELECTRONICS INC, MOYNO INC, ERIKS NORTH AMERICA, as successor-in-interest to Lewis-Goetz and Company, Inc.,, FKA Gooding Rubber Co, GOULD ELECTRONICS INC, FKA GD-Tek Inc, ALCOA INC, FKA Aluminum Co America, CARMEUSE LIME INC, CHICAGO PNEUMATIC TOOL CO LLC, ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL INC, MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES CO, IU NORTH AMERICA INC, as successor by merger to The Garp Company, FKA Gage Co, FKA Pittsburgh Gage and Supply Co, JOY GLOBAL SUFACE MINING INC, FKA P&H Mining Equipment, FKA Harnischfeger Corp, STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS USA, WILLIAM POWELL CO, ALLIED GLOVE CORP, ELLIOTT CO, FKA Elliott Turbomachinery Co, PARKER-HANNIFIN CORP, CLYDE UNION INC, DBA Clyde Union Pumps, Individually and as successor-by-merger to Union Pump Company and HONEYWELL INC
Defendant / Appellant: FOSTER WHEELER LLC and MCMASTER CARR SUPPLY
Plaintiff / Appellee: MERL WILLIAMS, His Husband and DAVID P. MARTINCIC
Case Number: 20-3068
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Filing 78 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee WT HRC Corp. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 11/17/2020 05:02 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 77 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Sundyne LLC. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 11/17/2020 05:01 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 76 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Simakas Co Inc. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 11/17/2020 05:00 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 75 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Robinson Fans Inc. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 11/17/2020 04:59 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 74 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Robbins & Myers Inc. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 11/17/2020 04:59 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 73 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Power Piping Co. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 11/17/2020 04:58 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 72 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Moyno Inc. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 11/17/2020 04:57 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 71 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee McNeil Ohio Corp. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 11/17/2020 04:57 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 70 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant McMaster Carr Supply. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 11/17/2020 04:56 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 69 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Lintern Corp. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 11/17/2020 04:56 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 68 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Bloom Engineering Co Inc. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 11/17/2020 04:55 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 67 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Allied Glove Corporation. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 11/17/2020 03:25 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 66 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee ABB Inc. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 11/17/2020 03:18 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 65 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Glenn A. Huetter, Jr., Esquire, Willman & Silvaggio LLP on behalf of Appellee(s) ABB Inc., Allied Glove, Bloom Engineering, BMI Refractory Services Inc., Lintern Corp, McMaster-Carr Supply Co., McNeil (Ohio) Corp., Moyno, Inc., Power Piping Company, Robbins & Myers, Inc., Robinson Fans, Inc., Simakas Company, Inc., Sundyne LLC, WT/HRC. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 11/17/2020 03:02 PM]
November 5, 2020 Filing 64 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee General Electric Co. [20-3068] (BSN) [Entered: 11/05/2020 01:54 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 63 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Andrew F. Adomitis, Esq. for Osram Sylvania Inc, Cleaver Brooks Inc, AO Smith Corp, Burnham LLC, Clyde Union Inc, Mueller Steam Specialty and Ocean View Capital, Scott D. Clements, Esq. for United States Steel Corp, Eric K. Falk, Esq. for Honeywell International Inc, Riley Power Inc, IMO Industries Inc and Parker-Hannifin Corp, Julie N. Friedman, Esq. for Honeywell International Inc, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co, Riley Power Inc, IMO Industries Inc and Parker-Hannifin Corp, Jeanette H. Ho, Esq. for Cost Co and Cost Management LLC, Robert L. Hogan, Esq. for Riley Power Inc, Glenn A. Huetter, Jr., Esq. for ABB Inc, J. Lawson Johnston, Esq. for United States Steel Corp, Vincent P. Lamperski, Esq. for Osram Sylvania Inc, Cleaver Brooks Inc, AO Smith Corp, Burnham LLC, Clyde Union Inc, Mueller Steam Specialty and Ocean View Capital, John C. McMeekin, II, Esq. for Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co, G. Richard Murphy, Esq. for Cost Co and Cost Management LLC, Kenneth T. Newman, Esq. for Cost Co and Cost Management LLC, Edward G. O'Connor, Esq. for ABB Inc and Eric W. Santos, Esq. for Honeywell Inc requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 11/18/2020. Disclosure Statement on or before 11/18/2020. (JK) [Entered: 11/04/2020 02:42 PM]
November 3, 2020 Filing 62 Attorney Bar status modified for Paul K. Vey, Esq. for Sauer Inc, Ametek Inc, Eriks North America and Joy Global Suface Mining Inc. Status is now active. (TMK) [Entered: 11/03/2020 03:21 PM]
November 3, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY STATUS for APPEARANCE FORM filed by Attorney Paul K. Vey, Esq. for Appellees Sauer Inc, Ametek Inc, Eriks North America and Joy Global Suface Mining Inc. Counsel's current status in this Court's attorney rolls is inactive. An attorney must have active status in order to appear before this Court. R.A.D.E. 17.3. If you wish to return to active status or if you believe that you have been marked inactive in error, please complete the Attorney Admission Renewal/Adjustment of Status Form available on this Court's website by 11/17/2020. Future filings will not be accepted from an attorney in inactive status. (TMK) [Entered: 11/03/2020 08:01 AM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 61 PARTY NOT PARTICIPATING: Christopher H. Jones, Esq. for Gould Electronics Inc, Weil McLain and Marley-Wylain Co will not participate in this appeal, received. (JK) [Entered: 11/03/2020 12:35 PM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 60 RESPONSE on behalf of Appellee Elliott Co to clerk order advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 11/02/2020. Service made by US mail. (JK) [Entered: 11/03/2020 11:26 AM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 58 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Alison R. Viola, Esq. for Appellee CBS Corp. in response to possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. Certificate of Service dated 11/02/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3068]--[Edited 11/02/2020 by JK] (ARV) [Entered: 11/02/2020 04:55 PM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 57 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alison R. Viola on behalf of Appellant(s) Viacom CBS, Inc.. [20-3068] (ARV) [Entered: 11/02/2020 03:16 PM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 56 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Glenn A. Huetter, Jr., Esq. for Appellee Lintern Corporation takes no position re appeal. Certificate of Service dated 11/02/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3068]--[Edited 11/02/2020 by JK] (GAH) [Entered: 11/02/2020 12:31 PM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 55 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jason R. Scherr on behalf of Appellee Elliott Company. [20-3068]--[Edited 11/02/2020 by JK] (JRS) [Entered: 11/02/2020 11:56 AM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 54 RESPONSE on behalf of Appellee General Electric Co to clerk order advising of possible dismissal in Support of Appellant. (JK) [Entered: 11/02/2020 11:44 AM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 53 PARTY NOT PARTICIPATING: Edward J. Chiodo for Tuthill Corp and Met-Pro Technologies will not participate in this appeal, received. (JK) [Entered: 11/02/2020 11:39 AM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 52 LETTER filed by Ronald L. Daugherty on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company not participating in the appeal. (JK) [Entered: 11/02/2020 10:13 AM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 51 LETTER filed by David J. Shipley on behalf of Tenova, Inc. taking no position with respect to the Appeal.. (JK) [Entered: 11/01/2020 11:55 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 50 PARTY NOT PARTICIPATING: Aaron Arthur, Esq. for Sante Fe Braun, Inc, York International Corp, Johnson Controls Inc, ITT Industries Inc and Goulds Pump LLC will not participate in this appeal, received.--[Edited 11/02/2020 by JK] (JK) [Entered: 11/01/2020 11:15 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 49 PARTY NOT PARTICIPATING: Jennifer E. Watson, Esq. for Air & Liquid Systems Corp will not participate in this appeal, received. (JK) [Entered: 11/01/2020 10:01 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 48 PARTY NOT PARTICIPATING: Jennifer E. Watson, Esq. for Alcoa Inc, IU North America Inc, DAP Inc, Viking Pump Inc, Plastics Engineering Co, Air & Liquid Systems Corp and Saint-Gobain Abrasives Inc will not participate in this appeal, received. (JK) [Entered: 11/01/2020 09:44 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 47 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Bryan S. Neft on behalf of Appellant(s) General Electric Company. [20-3068] (BSN) [Entered: 10/30/2020 05:10 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 46 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Andrew F. Adomitis, Esq. for Appellees AO Smith Corp, Burnham LLC, Cleaver Brooks Inc, Clyde Union Inc, Mueller Steam Specialty, Ocean View Capital and Osram Sylvania Inc No Position letter - A. O. Smith Corporation; Burnham LLC; Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.; Clyde Union, Inc. f/k/a Union Pump Company; Osram Sylvania, Inc., as successor to GTE Products Corporation (GTE/OSRAM); Mueller Steam; Ocean View Capital. Certificate of Service dated 10/30/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3068] (AFA) [Entered: 10/30/2020 04:44 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 45 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Danielle M. Vugrinovich, Esq. for Appellees Cashco Inc, Eaton Corp, Ecodyne Corp, Flsmidth Inc, McWane Inc, MW Custom Papers, Sunbeam Products Inc and Warren Pumps LLC No position to appeal of Appellant Foster Wheeler. Certificate of Service dated 10/30/2020. Service made by Email. [20-3068] (DMV) [Entered: 10/30/2020 04:13 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 44 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Julie N. Friedman, Esq. for Appellees Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co, Honeywell International Inc, IMO Industries Inc, Letter response to Oct. 19 Court's Order. Certificate of Service dated 10/30/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3068]--[Edited 10/30/2020 by JK] (SFG) [Entered: 10/30/2020 02:58 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 43 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Julie N. Friedman, Esq. for Appellees Parker-Hannifin Corp and Riley Power Inc Letter responding to Oct. 19 Court's Order on behalf of Parker Hannifin and Riley. Certificate of Service dated 10/30/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3068]--[Edited 10/30/2020 by JK] (SFG) [Entered: 10/30/2020 02:51 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 42 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Michael J. Zukowski, Esq. for Appellee Schneider Electric USA Inc. takes no position on the appeal. Certificate of Service dated 10/30/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3068]--[Edited 10/30/2020 by JK] (MJZ) [Entered: 10/30/2020 02:11 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 41 LETTER from Paul K. Vey, Esq. for Appellees Ametek Inc, Eriks North America, Joy Global Suface Mining Inc and Sauer Inc. taking no position as to the jurisdictional issue. Service made on 10/30/2020 by ECF. (LML) [Entered: 10/30/2020 12:59 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 40 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Nicholas J. Koch, Esq. for Appellee Cameron International Corp Defendant Cameron International takes no position on co-defendant's appeal.. Certificate of Service dated 10/30/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3068] (NJK) [Entered: 10/30/2020 12:42 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 39 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Dennis F. Wolford, Esq. for Appellee Greene Tweed & Co Greene Tweed & Company, Inc.'s Letter of "No Position" regarding the Court's jurisdiction. Certificate of Service dated 10/30/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3068]--[Edited 10/30/2020 by JK] (DFW) [Entered: 10/30/2020 12:36 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 38 ECF FILER: LETTER from Diana L. Jacobs, Esq.on behalf of Appellee Nooter Construction Company. In response to the Order dated October 9, 2020, please be advised that Defendant, Nooter Construction Company takes no position on the appeal filed by Foster Wheeler in this matter.. Certificate of Service dated 10/30/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3068]--[Edited 10/30/2020 by JK] (DLJ) [Entered: 10/30/2020 12:30 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 37 ECF FILER: Letter to Third Circuit Regarding No Position as to Foster Wheeler's Appeal filed by Appellees Alfa Laval Inc, Carver Pump Company, FMC Corp, Pfaudler Inc, Sterling Fluid Systems USA and Swindell-Dressler International Co. Certificate of Service dated 10/30/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3068] (KAL) [Entered: 10/30/2020 12:17 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 36 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Alison R. Viola, Esq. for Appellee Process Valve & Equipment Co Letter Re: Process Valve's Position in Appeal. Certificate of Service dated 10/30/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3068]--[Edited 10/30/2020 by JK] (ARV) [Entered: 10/30/2020 11:04 AM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 35 ECF FILER: LETTER on behalf of Appellees Cost Co and Cost Management LLC. Appellees Cost Co and Cost Management LLC will adopt the Response filed by Appellant Foster Wheeler LLC to clerk order. on behalf of Appellant Foster Wheeler LLC. Certificate of Service dated 10/30/2020.Service made by ECF. [20-3068]--[Edited 10/30/2020 by JK] (JHH) [Entered: 10/30/2020 10:46 AM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 34 ECF FILER: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Response. Service made on 10/30/2020 by ECF. [20-3068] (DFW) [Entered: 10/30/2020 10:32 AM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 33 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Alison R. Viola, Esq. for Appellee Bechtel Corp will not be participating in the appeal. Certificate of Service dated 10/30/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3068]--[Edited 10/30/2020 by JK] (ARV) [Entered: 10/30/2020 10:21 AM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 32 ECF FILER: Clark Reliance Corporation, and its division Jerguson Gage and Valve; Electrolux Home Products, Inc. f/k/a WCI Outdoor Products, Inc.; Spirax Sarco, Inc.; NOT PARTICIPATING: Richard C. Polley, Esq. for Armstrong International Inc, Dick Corp, Nagle Pumps Inc and North American Manufacturing Co Appellees Airtek Inc, Armstrong International Inc, Armstrong Pumps Inc, Dick Corp, Evoqua Water Technologies LLC, Nagle Pumps Inc, North American Manufacturing Co and Yuba Heat Transfer LLC will not participate in this appeal, received. [20-3068] (RCP) [Entered: 10/30/2020 09:58 AM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 31 ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellant Foster Wheeler LLC to clerk order. Certificate of Service dated 10/30/2020. [20-3068] (DFW) [Entered: 10/30/2020 08:34 AM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 30 LETTER filed by Melissa D. Cochran and Edward A. MIller on behalf of Carrier Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc, Flowserve Corp, Gerdner Denver, Inc, Joy Global Underground Mining, Inc. and Zurn Industries, LLC will not be participating in this appeal. (JK) [Entered: 10/29/2020 10:53 PM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 29 PARTY NOT PARTICIPATING: Francis J. Stanek, Esq. for Inductotherm Industries Inc will not participate in this appeal, received. (JK) [Entered: 10/29/2020 09:45 PM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 28 PARTY NOT PARTICIPATING: Mark A. Fiorilli, Esq. for Beazer East Inc will not participate in this appeal, received. (JK) [Entered: 10/29/2020 09:35 PM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 27 PARTY NOT PARTICIPATING: James P. Hadden, Esq. for Wyeth Holdings Corp, Dezurik, Velan Valve Coporation, Aurora Pumps, Blue M Corp, Industrial Holdings Corp, Lindberg, Lindberg MPH and SPX Flow US LLC will not participate in this appeal, received.--[Edited 10/29/2020 by JK] (JK) [Entered: 10/29/2020 09:17 PM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 26 PARTY NOT PARTICIPATING: Bernard L. Levinthal on behaf of Flowserve US Inc. will not participate in this appeal, received.--[Edited 10/29/2020 by JK] (JK) [Entered: 10/29/2020 09:00 PM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 25 PARTY NOT PARTICIPATING: Philip P. Keating, Esq. for Baker Hughes will not participate in this appeal, received. (JK) [Entered: 10/29/2020 08:52 PM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 24 PARTY NOT PARTICIPATING: John A. Turlik, Esq. for Flowserve United States Inc, BW IP Inc and Nortek Global HVAC LLC will not participate in this appeal, received. (JK) [Entered: 10/29/2020 07:25 PM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 23 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Glenn A. Huetter, Jr., Esq. for Appellees ABB Inc, Allied Glove Corp, Bloom Engineering Co Inc, BMI Refractory Services Inc, McMaster Carr Supply, McNeil Ohio Corp, Moyno Inc, Power Piping Co, Robbins & Myers Inc, Robinson Fans Inc, Simakas Co Inc, Sundyne LLC and WT HRC Corp Letter advising that Appellees Brown Boveri, BMI, McNeil (Ohio), Robinson Fans, Simakas, WT/HRC, Allied Glove, Bloom Engineering, McMaster-Carr, Moyno, Robbins & Myers, Power Piping and Sundyne take no position re appeal. Certificate of Service dated 10/29/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 10/29/2020 04:40 PM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 22 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Jason T. Shipp, Esq. for Appellees David P. Martincic and Merl Williams Letter to Third Circuit Court of Appeals advising that Appellees David Martincic and Merle Williams take no position in relation to this Court's authority over this appeal. Certificate of Service dated 10/29/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3068] (JTS) [Entered: 10/29/2020 04:20 PM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 21 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jason T. Shipp on behalf of Appellee(s) Appellees David Martincic and Merle Williams. [20-3068] (JTS) [Entered: 10/29/2020 03:46 PM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 20 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Paul K. Vey on behalf of Appellee(s) (1) Ametek, Inc.; (2) Sauer, Inc.; (3) Joy Global Surface Mining Inc f/k/a P&H Mining Equipment, Inc. f/k/a Harnischfeger Corporation; (4) ERIKS North America, as successor-in-interest to Lewis-Goetz and Company, Inc., f/ka Gooding Rubber Company. [20-3068] (PKV) [Entered: 10/29/2020 02:49 PM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 19 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Matthew R. Wimer, Esq. for Appellee SPX Cooling Technologies Inc no position on the appeal. Certificate of Service dated 10/29/2020. Service made by Email. [20-3068] (MRW) [Entered: 10/29/2020 02:18 PM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 18 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Jason M. English, Esq. for Appellees Industrial Rubber Products, Sealing Specialists & Service Co and Washington Group International Inc Letter regarding no position to appeal of Defendant Foster Wheeler. Certificate of Service dated 10/29/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3068] (KTM) [Entered: 10/29/2020 02:09 PM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 17 LETTER from David E. Lamm, Esq. for Appellee Joy Global Suface Mining Inc taking no position of the issue of jurisdiction. (JK) [Entered: 10/29/2020 12:20 PM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 16 PARTY NOT PARTICIPATING: Kevin M. Ward, Esq. for Columbus McKinnon Corp will not participate in this appeal, received. (JK) [Entered: 10/29/2020 11:57 AM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 15 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney John M. Schollaert, Esq. for Appellee GG of Florida Inc LETTER: To 3d Circuit re: GGF position on appeal. Certificate of Service dated 10/29/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3068] (DRB) [Entered: 10/29/2020 09:40 AM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 14 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Michael J. Ross, Esq. for Appellee Crane Co letter of no position regarding the appeal in this case. Certificate of Service dated 10/29/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3068] (MJR) [Entered: 10/29/2020 09:21 AM]
October 28, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER from J. Lawson Johnston, Esq. for United States Steel Corp taking no position on the jurisdictional issue. (JK) [Entered: 10/28/2020 10:59 PM]
October 28, 2020 Filing 12 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney William J. Witte, Esq. for Appellees Ajax Magnethermic Corp and Magnetek Inc Letter from Attorney William J. Witte for Defendants Ajax Magnethermic Corporation, Genuine Parts Company, Howden North America Inc., Magnetek, Inc., Research-Cottrell, Inc., n/k/a AWT Air Company, Inc. do not intend to participate in the Appeal.. Certificate of Service dated 10/28/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3068] (WJW) [Entered: 10/28/2020 03:57 PM]
October 28, 2020 Filing 11 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Joseph F. Butcher, Esq. for Appellee Mine Safety Appliances Co Letter from Attorney Joseph F. Butcher for Appellees - clients of Zimmer Kunz PLLC. Certificate of Service dated 10/28/2020. Service made by Email. [20-3068] (JFB) [Entered: 10/28/2020 03:23 PM]
October 28, 2020 Filing 10 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Edward A. Smallwood, Esq. for Appellees Ameron International Corp, Caterpillar Inc, Ingersoll Rand Corp, JM Foster Inc, Nash Engineering Co, Reunion Industries Inc, Wheeling Rubber Products Inc and William Powell Co List of defendants who take no position to the appeal of Appellant Foster Wheeler LLC. Certificate of Service dated 10/28/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3068] (EAS) [Entered: 10/28/2020 02:11 PM]
October 22, 2020 Filing 9 District Court CM/ECF updated on 10/22/2020. Record complete for appeal purposes (JK) [Entered: 10/22/2020 01:40 PM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER FORM (Part 1). No proceedings in District Court. (JK) [Entered: 10/19/2020 05:04 PM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Foster Wheeler LLC. [20-3068] (DFW) [Entered: 10/19/2020 02:36 PM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Foster Wheeler LLC. [20-3068] (DFW) [Entered: 10/19/2020 02:33 PM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Foster Wheeler LLC advising this court that no transcripts are available. [20-3068] (DFW) [Entered: 10/19/2020 02:29 PM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 4 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Dennis F. Wolford on behalf of Appellant(s) Foster Wheeler, LLC. [20-3068] (DFW) [Entered: 10/19/2020 02:26 PM]
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (Clerk) advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (JK) [Entered: 10/19/2020 02:54 AM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 10/19/2020 02:52 AM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Foster Wheeler LLC in District Court No. 2-20-cv-00958. (JK) [Entered: 10/19/2020 02:47 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: David Martincic, et al v. AO Smith Corp, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AURORA PUMPS
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAUER INC
Represented By: Paul K. Vey Esq.
Represented By: David E. Lamm Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BMI REFRACTORY SERVICES INC
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SWINDELL-DRESSLER INTERNATIONAL CO
Represented By: Katherine A. Lowery Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BEAZER EAST INC, in its own right and as Successor to Koppers, Co., and other related Companies, including Thiem Corporation, Beazer USA, ,Inc., and Beazer, PLC.
Represented By: Robert R. Leight Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EVOQUA WATER TECHNOLOGIES LLC, in its Own right and as successor-in-interest to Wallace & Tiernan
Represented By: Bridget L. Baranyai Esq.
Represented By: Ashley Waldinger Esq.
Represented By: Adam J. Warhola Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FLSMIDTH INC, as successor-in-interest to Keeler-Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company, FKA Fuller Co
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper Esq.
Represented By: Danielle M. Vugrinovich Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MCWANE INC
Represented By: Erin Margolin Esq.
Represented By: Danielle M. Vugrinovich Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INDUCTOTHERM INDUSTRIES INC
Represented By: Francis J. Stanek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REUNION INDUSTRIES INC
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood Esq.
Represented By: Joshua M. Brick Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NASH ENGINEERING CO
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood Esq.
Represented By: Steven D. Evans Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBBINS & MYERS INC
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Abby K. Hahn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FLOWSERVE UNITED STATES INC, solely as successor to Nordstrom Audco, Edward Valves, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., and Rockwell Manufacturing Company, FKA Flowserve FSD Corp, Successor to Valtek International
Represented By: John A. Turlik Esq.
Represented By: Deborah A. Beck Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREENE TWEED & CO
Represented By: Dennis F. Wolford Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUNDYNE LLC
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Abby K. Hahn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DRAVO CORP
Represented By: Cathy R. Gordon Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MCNEIL OHIO CORP
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Edward G. O'Connor Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORP, FKA Carborundum Corp
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONALD MCKAY SMITH INC
Represented By: Gregory C. Scheuring Esq.
Represented By: Christopher T. Yoskosky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GENUINE PARTS CO
Represented By: Alba E. Arriaga Esq.
Represented By: Patrick A. Hewitt Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMETEK INC
Represented By: Paul K. Vey Esq.
Represented By: David E. Lamm Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ABB INC, as successor to Brown Boveri (Individually and as successor-in-interest to ITE Imperial CO f/k/a ITE CIRCUIT BREAKER COMPAMY)
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Edward G. O'Connor Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUNBEAM PRODUCTS INC, as successor-in-interest to Sunbeam Corporation
Represented By: Danielle M. Vugrinovich Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PLASTICS ENGINEERING CO
Represented By: Jennifer E. Watson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WEST END CONTRACTING CORP, FKA Minnotte Contracting Corp
Represented By: Gregory C. Scheuring Esq.
Represented By: Christopher T. Yoskosky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GG OF FLORIDA INC
Represented By: John M. Schollaert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBINSON FANS INC
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Edward G. O'Connor Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VIKING PUMP INC
Represented By: Jennifer E. Watson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WASHINGTON GROUP INTERNATIONAL INC, FKA Raytheon Engineers & Constructors, and all Its domestic subsidiaries including The Badger Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jason M. English Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GORMAN RUPP CO
Represented By: Gregory C. Scheuring Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHNSON CONTROLS INC
Represented By: Aaron Arthur Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO
Represented By: Shannan N. Cerrone Esq.
Represented By: Richard C. Polley Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CBS CORP, FKA Viacom Inc, as Successor by Merger to CBS Corp, FKA Westinghouse Electric Corp
Represented By: Daniel J. Sinclair Esq.
Represented By: Eric L. Horne Esq.
Represented By: Alison R. Viola Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORP, FKA Cooper Cameron Corp
Represented By: Nicholas J. Koch Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EATON CORP, as successor-in-interest to Cutler-Hammer, Inc.,, NKA Eaton Electrical Inc
Represented By: Erin Margolin Esq.
Represented By: Danielle M. Vugrinovich Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: POWER PIPING CO
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Abby K. Hahn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PFAUDLER INC
Represented By: Katherine A. Lowery Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: YORK INTERNATIONAL CORP
Represented By: Aaron Arthur Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WYETH HOLDINGS CORP, FKA American Cyanamid Co
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, a/k/a FLUOR CORPORATION
Represented By: Joseph R. Petrina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARLEY-WYLAIN CO, incorrectly named as Weil-McLain Company
Represented By: Christopher H. Jones Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAGNETEK INC
Represented By: Joseph L. Orszulak Esq. II
Represented By: William J. Witte Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OCEAN VIEW CAPITAL, FKA Triangle PWC Inc
Represented By: Andrew F. Adomitis Esq.
Represented By: Vincent P. Lamperski Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC, FKA Allied Signal Inc, as successor-in-interest to the Bendix Corporation
Represented By: Julie N. Friedman Esq.
Represented By: Eric K. Falk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES INC, FKA Marley Cooling Technologies Inc, FKA Marley Cooling Tower Co
Represented By: Matthew R. Wimer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FLOWSERVE CORP, FKA Durametallic Corp, FKA Duriron Co Inc
Represented By: Melissa D. Cochran Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ATLAS INDUSTRIES INC
Represented By: Kelly L. Smith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES STEEL CORP
Represented By: J. Lawson Johnston Esq.
Represented By: Scott D. Clements Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MW CUSTOM PAPERS, AKA Mead
Represented By: Danielle M. Vugrinovich Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WHEELING RUBBER PRODUCTS INC
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood Esq.
Represented By: Steven D. Evans Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PROCESS VALVE & EQUIPMENT CO
Represented By: Alison R. Viola Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LINDBERG
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WEIL MCLAIN
Represented By: Christopher H. Jones Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA INC, FKA Square D Co
Represented By: Michael J. Zukowski Esq.
Represented By: Tausha Saunders Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NORTEK GLOBAL HVAC LLC, as successor by merger to Reznor, LLC
Represented By: John A. Turlik Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FMC CORP
Represented By: Katherine A. Lowery Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MS JACOBS & ASSOCIATES INC
Represented By: Matthew G. Breneman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES INC, FKA Norton Co
Represented By: Jennifer E. Watson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AJAX MAGNETHERMIC CORP
Represented By: Joseph L. Orszulak Esq. II
Represented By: William J. Witte Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SPX FLOW US LLC
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP, Successor-by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Watson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BW IP INC
Represented By: John A. Turlik Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BECHTEL CORP
Represented By: Dennis R. McEwen Esq.
Represented By: Alison R. Viola Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLOOM ENGINEERING CO INC
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Abby K. Hahn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WARREN PUMPS LLC
Represented By: Danielle M. Vugrinovich Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BAKER HUGHES, a GE Company, LLC
Represented By: Philip P. Keating Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NAGLE PUMPS INC
Represented By: Richard C. Polley Esq.
Represented By: Adam J. Warhola Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEZURIK
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARVER PUMP COMPANY
Represented By: Katherine A. Lowery Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: YUBA HEAT TRANSFER LLC
Represented By: Shannan N. Cerrone Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INDUSTRIAL RUBBER PRODUCTS
Represented By: Jason M. English Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BURNHAM LLC
Represented By: Andrew F. Adomitis Esq.
Represented By: Vincent P. Lamperski Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MCJUNKIN REDMAN CORP, FKA MRC Global US Inc
Represented By: Matthew G. Breneman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CRANE CO
Represented By: Michael J. Ross Esq.
Represented By: Sarah M. Czypinski Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORP
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood Esq.
Represented By: Joshua M. Brick Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALFA LAVAL INC
Represented By: Katherine A. Lowery Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SEALING SPECIALISTS & SERVICE CO
Represented By: Jason M. English Esq.
Represented By: Dennis J. Geis Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HUNTER SALES CORP
Represented By: Kelly L. Smith Esq.
Represented By: Steven D. Evans Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: IMO INDUSTRIES INC, FKA IMO Delaval Inc, FKA Devalco Corp Inc, FKA Delaval Turbine Inc
Represented By: Julie N. Friedman Esq.
Represented By: Eric K. Falk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO
Represented By: Julie N. Friedman Esq.
Represented By: John C. McMeekin Esq. II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RILEY POWER INC, FKA Riley Stoker Corp
Represented By: Robert L. Hogan Esq.
Represented By: Julie N. Friedman Esq.
Represented By: Eric K. Falk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AIRTEK INC
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Wiese Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WT HRC CORP, FKA Whiting Corp
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Edward G. O'Connor Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TUTHILL CORP
Represented By: Matthew G. Chapman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY
Represented By: Andrew F. Adomitis Esq.
Represented By: Vincent P. Lamperski Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ITT INDUSTRIES INC
Represented By: Aaron Arthur Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CASHCO INC
Represented By: Danielle M. Vugrinovich Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DICK CORP
Represented By: Bridget L. Baranyai Esq.
Represented By: Richard C. Polley Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORP
Represented By: Kevin M. Ward Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VELAN VALVE COPORATION
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ECODYNE CORP
Represented By: Erin Margolin Esq.
Represented By: Danielle M. Vugrinovich Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLEAVER BROOKS INC, FKA Aqua Chem
Represented By: Andrew F. Adomitis Esq.
Represented By: Vincent P. Lamperski Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GOULDS PUMP LLC
Represented By: Aaron Arthur Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LINDBERG MPH
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COST CO, FKA Cost Corp
Represented By: Jeanette H. Ho Esq.
Represented By: Kenneth T. Newman Esq.
Represented By: G. Richard Murphy Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARMSTRONG PUMPS INC
Represented By: Adam J. Warhola Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FLUOR CORP
Represented By: Joseph R. Petrina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLUE M CORP
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HAMMOND VALVE CO
Represented By: Matthew G. Breneman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAP INC, NKA La Mirada Prod Co
Represented By: Jennifer E. Watson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FLUOR ENTERPRISES INC
Represented By: Joseph R. Petrina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COST MANAGEMENT LLC
Represented By: Jeanette H. Ho Esq.
Represented By: Kenneth T. Newman Esq.
Represented By: G. Richard Murphy Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AO SMITH CORP
Represented By: Andrew F. Adomitis Esq.
Represented By: Vincent P. Lamperski Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA INC, FKA Howden Buffalo Inc
Represented By: Alba E. Arriaga Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SIMAKAS CO INC
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Edward G. O'Connor Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JM FOSTER INC
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood Esq.
Represented By: Steven D. Evans Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CATERPILLAR INC
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood Esq.
Represented By: Colby S. Bryson Esq.
Represented By: Joshua M. Brick Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OSRAM SYLVANIA INC, in its own right and as Successor-in-interest to GTE Products Corporation, The Clark Controller Company and A.O. Smith Corporation
Represented By: Andrew F. Adomitis Esq.
Represented By: Vincent P. Lamperski Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INGERSOLL RAND CORP
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GOULD ELECTRONICS INC
Represented By: Christopher H. Jones Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MOYNO INC
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Abby K. Hahn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERIKS NORTH AMERICA, as successor-in-interest to Lewis-Goetz and Company, Inc.,, FKA Gooding Rubber Co
Represented By: Paul K. Vey Esq.
Represented By: David E. Lamm Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GOULD ELECTRONICS INC, FKA GD-Tek Inc
Represented By: Christopher H. Jones Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALCOA INC, FKA Aluminum Co America
Represented By: Jennifer E. Watson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARMEUSE LIME INC
Represented By: Cathy R. Gordon Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHICAGO PNEUMATIC TOOL CO LLC
Represented By: Joni Mangino Esq.
Represented By: Ryan A. Zeli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL INC
Represented By: Shannan N. Cerrone Esq.
Represented By: Richard C. Polley Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES CO
Represented By: Joseph F. Butcher Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: IU NORTH AMERICA INC, as successor by merger to The Garp Company, FKA Gage Co, FKA Pittsburgh Gage and Supply Co
Represented By: Jennifer E. Watson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOY GLOBAL SUFACE MINING INC, FKA P&H Mining Equipment, FKA Harnischfeger Corp
Represented By: Paul K. Vey Esq.
Represented By: David E. Lamm Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS USA
Represented By: Katherine A. Lowery Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM POWELL CO
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood Esq.
Represented By: Steven D. Evans Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLIED GLOVE CORP
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Abby K. Hahn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELLIOTT CO, FKA Elliott Turbomachinery Co
Represented By: Aaron Arthur Esq.
Represented By: Jason R. Scherr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PARKER-HANNIFIN CORP
Represented By: Julie N. Friedman Esq.
Represented By: Eric K. Falk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLYDE UNION INC, DBA Clyde Union Pumps, Individually and as successor-by-merger to Union Pump Company
Represented By: Andrew F. Adomitis Esq.
Represented By: Vincent P. Lamperski Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HONEYWELL INC
Represented By: Eric W. Santos Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SULZER PUMPS SOLUTIONS INC, FKA Ahlstrom Pumps LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EICHLEAY CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATWOOD & MORRILL CO INC, DBA Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIER CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORGWARNER MORSE TEC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOOTER CONSTRUCTION CO, in its own right and as successor-ininterest to Nooter Corporation and John Nooter Boiler Works Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: READING CRANE AND ENGINEERING CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RESEARCH-COTTRELL INC, NKA AWT Air Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPIRAX SARCO INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK RELIANCE CORP, and its Division Jerguson Gage and Valve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINTERN CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF ALLEGHENY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION INC, FKA URS Energy & Construction, FKA Catalytic Construction Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANTA FE BRAUN INC, individually and as successor to CF Braun & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: URBAN REDEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY OF PITTSBURGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEGHENY COUNTY AIRPORT AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WTI RUST HOLDINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS INC, FKA WCI Outdoor Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCH NEW CO II LLC, FKA Robertson Ceco Corp, an alleged successor to H.H. Robertson Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEAL & DESIGN HIGBEE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUST ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION INC, FKA Treco Construction Services, FKA Rust Engineering Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AR WIFLEY AND SONS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRINNELL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCCARLS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORGAN ENGINEERING SYSTEMS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRAND INSULATIONS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOOTER CONSTRUCTION CO LLC, in its own right and as successor-ininterest to Nooter Corporation and John Nooter Boiler Works Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIDGEVILLE AUTO PARTS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANE US INC, FKA American Standard Corp, FKA American Radiator & Standard Sanitary, in its own right and as Successor to Westinghouse Airbrake and/or WABCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO, FKA Metropolitan Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZURN INDUSTRIES, AKA Erie Iron City Works
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MET-PRO CORP, and its Dean Pump Brand, DBA Met-Pro Global Pump Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHEELABRATOR AIR POLLUTION CONTROL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILWAUKEE VALVE CO LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAMWORTHY PEABODY COMBUSTION INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING LLC, FKA Joy Technologies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TENOVA INC, FKA Tenova Core Inc, FKA Techint Technologies Inc, FKA Core Furnace Systems Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLIED INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGIES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RESCO HOLDINGS LLC, as successor to the M.W. Kellogg Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SURFACE COMBUSTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLSMIDTH INC, FKA Fuller Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CORP, a/k/a FLUOR CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON CORP, NKA Eaton Electrical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNBEAM PRODUCTS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR ENTERPRISES INC, a/k/a FLUOR CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVOQUA WATER TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IU NORTH AMERICA INC, FKA Gage Co, FKA Pittsburgh Gage and Supply Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: FOSTER WHEELER LLC
Represented By: Dennis F. Wolford Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MCMASTER CARR SUPPLY
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MERL WILLIAMS, His Husband
Represented By: Leif J. Ocheltree Esq.
Represented By: Jason T. Shipp Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID P. MARTINCIC
Represented By: Leif J. Ocheltree Esq.
Represented By: Jason T. Shipp Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?