Yusuf Bush v. Griffin, et al
Defendant / Appellee: CAPTAIN KONKLE, CASE MANAGER SHADE, OFFICER WOLFGANG, COUNSELOR GRIFFIN, DAVID J. EBBERT, OFFICER BEAVER and UNIT MANAGER BERKOWSKI
Plaintiff / Appellant: YUSUF BUSH
Case Number: 20-3098
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (Clerk) Action of Appellants motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is hereby deferred insofar as Appellants previously submitted affidavit of poverty is incomplete. It is noted that Appellant is currently quarantined pending transfer to another prison facility. Accordingly, Appellants motion for extension of time to file a certified six (6) month prison account statement is granted. Appellant must submit a fully completed affidavit of poverty and a certified six (6) month prison account statement within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Failure to file a complete affidavit of poverty and prison account statement within the time stated will result in the dismissal of the appeal pursuant to Third Circuit LAR 3.3 and Misc. 107.1 without further notice. (SB) [Entered: 11/25/2020 02:42 PM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 Letter filed by Appellant Yusuf Bush COnstrued as a Motion for Extension of Time to File Prisoner Account Statement . Certificate of Service dated 10/26/2020. Service made by US mail. (SB) [Entered: 11/10/2020 10:49 AM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION filed by Appellant Yusuf Bush to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Certificate of Service dated 10/26/2020. Service made by US mail. (SB) [Entered: 11/10/2020 10:29 AM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 IN FORMA PAUPERIS PRISONER AUTHORIZATION on behalf of Appellant Yusuf Bush. (SB) [Entered: 11/10/2020 10:33 AM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 IN FORMA PAUPERIS PRISONER ADDENDUM on behalf of Appellant Yusuf Bush. (SB) [Entered: 11/10/2020 10:32 AM]
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from G. Michael Thiel, Assistant U.S. Attorney on behalf of Appellee(s) Counselor Griffin; Case Manager Shade; Mailroom John Doe; Captain Konkle; Regional Director John Doe; Officer Beaver; Unit Manager Berkowski; Trust Fund John Doe Officer Wolfgang; David J. Ebbert. [20-3098] (GMT) [Entered: 10/20/2020 04:27 PM]
October 15, 2020 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SB) [Entered: 10/15/2020 04:20 PM]
October 15, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Yusuf Bush in District Court No. 1-19-cv-01521. (SB) [Entered: 10/15/2020 04:15 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Yusuf Bush v. Griffin, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAPTAIN KONKLE
Represented By: G. Michael Thiel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CASE MANAGER SHADE
Represented By: G. Michael Thiel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER WOLFGANG
Represented By: G. Michael Thiel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNSELOR GRIFFIN
Represented By: G. Michael Thiel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID J. EBBERT
Represented By: G. Michael Thiel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER BEAVER
Represented By: G. Michael Thiel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNIT MANAGER BERKOWSKI
Represented By: G. Michael Thiel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: YUSUF BUSH
Represented By: Yusuf Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?