Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo v. Campbell Soup Co and Subsidiar, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: RICKY KAMDEM-OUAFFO
Defendant / Appellee: CARLOS J. BARROSO, Individual and Capacity With CAMPBELL'S, CAMPBELL SOUP CO, and subsidiaries, "CAMPBELL'S", MCELROY DEUTSCH MULVANEY & CARPENTER LLP, "MDMC LLP", Individual and In Capacity With TASK, LINDA HARRISON, Individual and In Capacity With TASK, CORIE HESS, Individual and In Capacity With TASK, TASK MANAGEMENT INC, "TASK", CARY HAYES, Individual and In Capacity With CAMPBELL'S, DUANE MORRIS LLP, FIRM AND AFFILIATE OFFICES, "OM", Individual and In Capacity With CAMPBELL'S, JONATHAN D. WETCHLER, Individual and In Capacity With CAMPBELL'S, BERNARD E. JACQUES, Individual and In Capacity With MDMC & TASK, SCOTT KELLER, Individual and In Capacity With CAMPBELL'S, STEFAN MOHAN, Individual and In Capacity With TASK, TREVOR H. TANIGUCHI, DENISE M. MORRISON and DAYNE R. JOHNSON, Individual and In Capacity With MDMC & TASK
Case Number: 20-3172
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Filing 19 ECF FILER: Reply by Appellee Campbell Soup Co in 20-3172, 20-3173 to Document. Certificate of Service dated 12/10/2020. Service made by ECF, Email [20-3172, 20-3173] (JDW) [Entered: 12/10/2020 06:32 PM]
December 7, 2020 Filing 18 ECF FILER: LETTER on behalf of Appellees McElroy Deutsch Mulvaney & Carpenter LLP, Bernard E. Jacques and Dayne R. Johnson. Appellees McElroy Deutsch Mulvaney & Carpenter LLP, Bernard E. Jacques and Dayne R. Johnson advising of no objection to the motion to consolidate. Certificate of Service dated 12/07/2020.Service made by ECF. [20-3172]--[Edited 12/08/2020 by CJG] (MR) [Entered: 12/07/2020 07:24 PM]
December 7, 2020 Filing 17 ECF FILER: LETTER on behalf of Appellees Linda Harrison, Cary Hayes, Corie Hess and Task Management Inc Joining in the Motion to Consolidate for All Purposes No. 20-3172 & 20-3173. Certificate of Service dated 12/07/2020.Service made by ECF, Email. [20-3172, 20-3173]--[Edited 12/08/2020 by CJG] (KNF) [Entered: 12/07/2020 03:35 PM]
December 7, 2020 Filing 16 ECF FILER: LETTER on behalf of Appellees Carlos J. Barroso, Duane Morris LLP, Scott Keller, Denise M. Morrison, Trevor H. Taniguchi and Jonathan D. Wetchler Joining in the Motion to Consolidate for All Purposes Nos. 20-3172 & 20-3173. Certificate of Service dated 12/07/2020.Service made by ECF, Email. [20-3172, 20-3173]--[Edited 12/08/2020 by CJG] (JDW) [Entered: 12/07/2020 03:22 PM]
December 7, 2020 Filing 15 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kathleen N. Fennelly, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Stefan Mohan, Corie Hess and Linda Harrison. [20-3172, 20-3173] (KNF) [Entered: 12/07/2020 03:08 PM]
December 1, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE on behalf of Appellant Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo in Opposition to Motion to Consolidate. Certificate of Service dated 11/28/2020. Service made by US mail. (JK) [Entered: 12/03/2020 12:54 PM]
November 27, 2020 Filing 13 ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellee Campbell Soup Co in 20-3172, 20-3173 to to consolidate for all purposes case numbers 20-3172 & 20-3173 and a Response to motion. Certificate of Service dated 11/27/2020. Service made by ECF, Email. [20-3172, 20-3173] (JDW) [Entered: 11/27/2020 04:01 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 12 Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 11/17/2020. (CJG) [Entered: 11/17/2020 02:38 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 11 Attorney Bar status modified for Kathleen N. Fennelly, Esq. for Linda Harrison, Task Management Inc, Stefan Mohan and Corie Hess in 20-3172. Status is now active. [20-3172, 20-3173] (TMK) [Entered: 11/17/2020 02:22 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY STATUS for APPEARANCE FORM filed by Attorney Kathleen N. Fennelly, Esq. for Appellees Linda Harrison, Task Management Inc, Stefan Mohan and Corie Hess in 20-3172. Counsel's current status in this Court's attorney rolls is inactive. An attorney must have active status in order to appear before this Court. R.A.D.E. 17.3. If you wish to return to active status or if you believe that you have been marked inactive in error, please complete the Attorney Admission Renewal/Adjustment of Status Form available on this Court's website by 12/01/2020. Future filings will not be accepted from an attorney in inactive status. [20-3172, 20-3173] (TMK) [Entered: 11/17/2020 09:06 AM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Task Management Inc in 20-3172, 20-3173. [20-3172, 20-3173] (KNF) [Entered: 11/13/2020 12:44 PM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kathleen N. Fennelly on behalf of Appellee(s) Task Management Inc.. [20-3172, 20-3173] (KNF) [Entered: 11/13/2020 12:42 PM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee McElroy Deutsch Mulvaney & Carpenter LLP. [20-3172] (MR) [Entered: 11/13/2020 11:54 AM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael Rato on behalf of Appellee(s) McElroy Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP; Bernard E. Jacques; Dayne R. Johnson. [20-3172] (MR) [Entered: 11/13/2020 11:53 AM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Leah A. Mintz on behalf of Appellee(s) Campbell Soup Company, Denise M. Morrison, Carlos J. Barroso, Scott Keller, Duane Morris LLP, Jonathan D. Wetchler, and Trevor H. Taniguchi. [20-3172] (LAM) [Entered: 11/12/2020 02:08 PM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Campbell Soup Co. [20-3172] (JDW) [Entered: 11/12/2020 02:06 PM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jonathan D. Wetchler on behalf of Appellee(s) Campbell Soup Company, Denise M. Morrison, Carlos J. Barroso, Scott Keller, Duane Morris LLP, Jonathan D. Wetchler, and Trevor H. Taniguchi. [20-3172] (JDW) [Entered: 11/12/2020 02:02 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 10/30/2020 12:21 AM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo in District Court No. 1-18-cv-13119. (JK) [Entered: 10/30/2020 12:18 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo v. Campbell Soup Co and Subsidiar, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICKY KAMDEM-OUAFFO
Represented By: Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARLOS J. BARROSO, Individual and Capacity With CAMPBELL'S
Represented By: Danielle M. Dwyer Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wetchler Esq.
Represented By: Leah A. Mintz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAMPBELL SOUP CO, and subsidiaries, "CAMPBELL'S"
Represented By: Danielle M. Dwyer Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wetchler Esq.
Represented By: Leah A. Mintz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MCELROY DEUTSCH MULVANEY & CARPENTER LLP, "MDMC LLP", Individual and In Capacity With TASK
Represented By: Michael Rato Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LINDA HARRISON, Individual and In Capacity With TASK
Represented By: Kathleen N. Fennelly Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORIE HESS, Individual and In Capacity With TASK
Represented By: Kathleen N. Fennelly Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TASK MANAGEMENT INC, "TASK"
Represented By: Kathleen N. Fennelly Esq.
Represented By: Dayne R. Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARY HAYES, Individual and In Capacity With CAMPBELL'S
Represented By: Danielle M. Dwyer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DUANE MORRIS LLP, FIRM AND AFFILIATE OFFICES, "OM", Individual and In Capacity With CAMPBELL'S
Represented By: Danielle M. Dwyer Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wetchler Esq.
Represented By: Leah A. Mintz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JONATHAN D. WETCHLER, Individual and In Capacity With CAMPBELL'S
Represented By: Danielle M. Dwyer Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wetchler Esq.
Represented By: Leah A. Mintz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BERNARD E. JACQUES, Individual and In Capacity With MDMC & TASK
Represented By: Michael Rato Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT KELLER, Individual and In Capacity With CAMPBELL'S
Represented By: Danielle M. Dwyer Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wetchler Esq.
Represented By: Leah A. Mintz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEFAN MOHAN, Individual and In Capacity With TASK
Represented By: Kathleen N. Fennelly Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TREVOR H. TANIGUCHI
Represented By: Danielle M. Dwyer Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wetchler Esq.
Represented By: Leah A. Mintz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENISE M. MORRISON
Represented By: Danielle M. Dwyer Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wetchler Esq.
Represented By: Leah A. Mintz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAYNE R. JOHNSON, Individual and In Capacity With MDMC & TASK
Represented By: Michael Rato Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?