Michael Burrage, et al v. LG Electronics USA Inc
Plaintiff / Appellee: DIANE TERRY, PATRICK ROMANO, SAM LEE, LEAH SCALA ISRAEL, MICHAEL BURRAGE, CHERYL ERVIN, SARAH JOHNSON, TERRY DRISCOLL and CARLOS STOCCO, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Appellant: STEVEN F. HELFAND
Defendant / Appellee: LG ELECTRONICS USA INC
Case Number: 20-3570
Filed: December 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (Clerk) dismissing case pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). (PDB) [Entered: 01/06/2021 08:12 AM]
January 5, 2021 Filing 3 ECF FILER: Stipulation to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) filed by Appellees Terry Driscoll, Cheryl Ervin, Leah Scala Israel, Sarah Johnson, Sam Lee, Patrick Romano, Carlos Stocco, Diane Terry and Michael Burrage without costs. Certificate of Service dated 01/05/2021. Service made by ECF, Email, US mail. [20-3570] (SJC) [Entered: 01/05/2021 08:58 PM]
December 24, 2020 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 12/24/2020 11:53 AM]
December 24, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Steven F. Helfand in District Court No. 2-19-cv-13554,2-19-cv-15185,2-19-cv-15826,2-20-cv-07652. (PDB) [Entered: 12/24/2020 11:48 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Michael Burrage, et al v. LG Electronics USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DIANE TERRY
Represented By: Benjamin F. Johns Esq.
Represented By: Amey J. Park Esq.
Represented By: Jacob M. Polakoff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PATRICK ROMANO
Represented By: Benjamin F. Johns Esq.
Represented By: Amey J. Park Esq.
Represented By: Jacob M. Polakoff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SAM LEE
Represented By: Benjamin F. Johns Esq.
Represented By: Amey J. Park Esq.
Represented By: Jacob M. Polakoff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LEAH SCALA ISRAEL
Represented By: Benjamin F. Johns Esq.
Represented By: Amey J. Park Esq.
Represented By: Jacob M. Polakoff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MICHAEL BURRAGE
Represented By: Benjamin F. Johns Esq.
Represented By: Amey J. Park Esq.
Represented By: Jacob M. Polakoff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHERYL ERVIN
Represented By: Benjamin F. Johns Esq.
Represented By: Amey J. Park Esq.
Represented By: Jacob M. Polakoff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SARAH JOHNSON
Represented By: Benjamin F. Johns Esq.
Represented By: Amey J. Park Esq.
Represented By: Jacob M. Polakoff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TERRY DRISCOLL
Represented By: Benjamin F. Johns Esq.
Represented By: Amey J. Park Esq.
Represented By: Jacob M. Polakoff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CARLOS STOCCO, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Benjamin F. Johns Esq.
Represented By: Amey J. Park Esq.
Represented By: Jacob M. Polakoff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: STEVEN F. HELFAND
Represented By: Steven F. Helfand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LG ELECTRONICS USA INC
Represented By: Mallik N. Nelson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?