Antonia Udasco-Kist v. Thomas Jefferson University Ho
Defendant / Appellee: THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL INC
Plaintiff / Appellant: ANTONIA UDASCO-KIST
Case Number: 21-1146
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 12 Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 02/11/2021 02:10 PM]
February 9, 2021 Filing 11 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Antonia Udasco-Kist. [21-1146] (JLF) [Entered: 02/09/2021 05:58 PM]
February 9, 2021 Filing 10 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Antonia Udasco-Kist. [21-1146] (JLF) [Entered: 02/09/2021 05:23 PM]
February 9, 2021 Filing 9 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Antonia Udasco-Kist advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [21-1146] (JLF) [Entered: 02/09/2021 05:13 PM]
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Antonia Udasco-Kist. [21-1146] (JLF) [Entered: 02/09/2021 05:01 PM]
February 9, 2021 Filing 7 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jamie L. Ford, Esquire on behalf of Appellant(s) Antonia Udasco-Kist. [21-1146] (JLF) [Entered: 02/09/2021 04:56 PM]
February 9, 2021 Filing 6 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sidney L. Gold, Esquire on behalf of Appellant(s) Antonia Udasco-Kist. [21-1146] (SLG) [Entered: 02/09/2021 04:42 PM]
February 5, 2021 Filing 5 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Thomas Jefferson University Hospital Inc. [21-1146] (LDM) [Entered: 02/05/2021 10:41 AM]
February 5, 2021 Filing 4 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lee D. Moylan on behalf of Appellee(s) Thomas Jefferson University Hospitals. [21-1146] (LDM) [Entered: 02/05/2021 10:38 AM]
January 26, 2021 Filing 3 Appendix Citation Notice sent to Jamie L. Ford, Esq., Sidney L. Gold, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 02/09/2021. (AMR) [Entered: 01/26/2021 03:34 PM]
January 26, 2021 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 01/26/2021 03:33 PM]
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Antonia Udasco-Kist in District Court No. 2-19-cv-03176. (AMR) [Entered: 01/26/2021 03:28 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Antonia Udasco-Kist v. Thomas Jefferson University Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL INC
Represented By: Lee D. Moylan Esq.
Represented By: William A. Harvey Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTONIA UDASCO-KIST
Represented By: Sidney L. Gold Esq.
Represented By: Jamie L. Ford Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?