Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo v. Colgate Palmolive Co, et al
Defendant: DEBRA NICHOLS, individual capacity and in capacity with Hill's and Colgate, SARAH B. MARTINEZ, individual capacity and in capacity with Hill's and Colgate, DENNIS JEWELL, individaul capacity and in capacity with Hill's and Colgate, BRENT K. POPE, individaul capacity and in capacity with Hill''s and Colgate, DAVE BALOGA, individual capacity and in capacity with Hill's and Colgate, LUIS J. MONTELONGO, individaul capacity and in capacity with Hill's and Colgate and LYNDA MELENDEZ, individaul capacity and in capacity with Hill's and Colgate
Plaintiff / Appellant: RICKY KAMDEM-OUAFFO, PHD t/a Kamden Group
Defendant / Appellee: COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO, a Delaware Corporation, Headquarters in New York, NY and HILLS PET NUTRITION, Inc.
Case Number: 21-1198
Filed: February 3, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Filing 11 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo due on or before 04/19/2021. Appendix due on or before 04/19/2021. (JK) [Entered: 03/10/2021 12:27 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 10 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Hills Pet Nutrition. [21-1198] (TDJ) [Entered: 03/10/2021 09:08 AM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 9 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Colgate Palmolive Co. [21-1198] (TDJ) [Entered: 03/10/2021 09:07 AM]
March 8, 2021 Filing 8 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Rudolph J. Burshnic II on behalf of Appellee(s) Colgate-Palmolive Company and Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. [21-1198] (RJB) [Entered: 03/08/2021 03:39 PM]
March 8, 2021 Filing 7 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Terry D. Johnson on behalf of Appellee(s) Colgate-Palmolive Company and Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. [21-1198] (TDJ) [Entered: 03/08/2021 03:36 PM]
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Rudolph J. Burshnic, II, Esq. for Colgate Palmolive Co and Hills Pet Nutrition and Terry D. Johnson, Esq. for Colgate Palmolive Co and Hills Pet Nutrition requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 03/11/2021. Disclosure Statement on or before 03/11/2021. (JK) [Entered: 03/08/2021 02:20 PM]
February 22, 2021 Filing 5 Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 02/11/2021. (JK) [Entered: 02/22/2021 04:09 PM]
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 RESPONSE on behalf of Appellant Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo to clerk order. Certificate of Service dated 02/06/2021. Service made by Email. (JK) [Entered: 02/22/2021 11:25 AM]
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (Clerk) It is noted that although Appellant is not a registered public filer, he has been receiving electronic notification while also mailing his documents to the Clerk's Office for filing. This hybrid form of hardcopy filing and electronic notification is not permitted. Within five (5) days of the date of this order Appellant must advise whether he intends to register as a public filer, which will allow him to file his documents electronically and receive electronic notice, or whether he would like to continue filing his documents in hardcopy, in which case the Clerk's Office would file the documents and he would receive notice through the mail. If Appellant chooses to register as a public filer and then subsequently mails a document to the Clerk's Office for filing, the document will not be filed and Appellant will receive a noncompliance order directing him to file the document electronically. See L.A.R. 113. Answer due 02/09/2021. (LML) [Entered: 02/04/2021 05:18 PM]
February 3, 2021 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 02/03/2021 02:54 PM]
February 3, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo in District Court No. 2-15-cv-07902. (AMR) [Entered: 02/03/2021 02:44 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo v. Colgate Palmolive Co, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBRA NICHOLS, individual capacity and in capacity with Hill's and Colgate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARAH B. MARTINEZ, individual capacity and in capacity with Hill's and Colgate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENNIS JEWELL, individaul capacity and in capacity with Hill's and Colgate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENT K. POPE, individaul capacity and in capacity with Hill''s and Colgate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVE BALOGA, individual capacity and in capacity with Hill's and Colgate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUIS J. MONTELONGO, individaul capacity and in capacity with Hill's and Colgate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYNDA MELENDEZ, individaul capacity and in capacity with Hill's and Colgate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICKY KAMDEM-OUAFFO, PHD t/a Kamden Group
Represented By: Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO, a Delaware Corporation, Headquarters in New York, NY
Represented By: Terry D. Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Rudolph J. Burshnic Esq. II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HILLS PET NUTRITION, Inc.
Represented By: Terry D. Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Rudolph J. Burshnic Esq. II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?