Robert Glen v. Trip Advisor LLC, et al
Defendant / Appellee: EXPEDIA INC, TRAVELSCAPE LLC, DBA Travelocity, HOTELS.COM LP, HOTELS.COM GP LLC, KAYAK SOFTWARE CORP, TRIP NETWORK LLC, DBA Cheap Tickets, EXPEDIA GROUP INC, TRIP ADVISOR LLC, TRIP ADVISOR INC, ORBITZ LLC and BOOKING HOLDINGS INC
Plaintiff / Appellant: ROBERT M. GLEN
Case Number: 21-1842
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Filing 35 Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 06/08/2021 04:44 PM]
June 4, 2021 Filing 34 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jacob S. Gardener on behalf of Appellee(s) TripAdvisor, Inc. and TripAdvisor LLC. [21-1842] (JSG) [Entered: 06/04/2021 02:05 PM]
June 4, 2021 Filing 33 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sean T. Haran on behalf of Appellee(s) TripAdvisor, Inc. and TripAdvisor LLC. [21-1842] (STH) [Entered: 06/04/2021 01:59 PM]
June 1, 2021 Filing 32 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Trip Network LLC. [21-1842] (DDS) [Entered: 06/01/2021 02:36 PM]
June 1, 2021 Filing 31 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David D. Shank on behalf of Appellee(s) Trip Network, Inc.; Expedia Group, Inc.; Expedia, Inc.; Hotels.com LP; Hotels.com GP, LLC; Travelscape, LLC; and Orbitz, LLC. [21-1842] (DDS) [Entered: 06/01/2021 02:34 PM]
June 1, 2021 Filing 30 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Robert M. Glen. [21-1842] (CB) [Entered: 06/01/2021 01:13 PM]
May 19, 2021 Filing 29 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Brittany Giusini, Esq. and Beth E. Moskow-Schnoll, Esq. for Trip Network LLC requesting Appearance Form and Disclosure Statement on or before 06/02/2021. (CJG) [Entered: 05/19/2021 09:40 AM]
May 19, 2021 Filing 28 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Craig Boneau, Esq., Ryan M. Goldstein, Esq. and Jonathan M. Kass, Esq. for Robert M. Glen requesting Concise Summary on or before 06/02/2021. (CJG) [Entered: 05/19/2021 09:37 AM]
May 17, 2021 Filing 27 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Travelscape LLC. [21-1842] (DDS) [Entered: 05/17/2021 12:39 PM]
May 17, 2021 Filing 26 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Orbitz LLC. [21-1842] (DDS) [Entered: 05/17/2021 12:38 PM]
May 17, 2021 Filing 25 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Hotels.com LP. [21-1842] (DDS) [Entered: 05/17/2021 12:38 PM]
May 17, 2021 Filing 24 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Hotels.com GP LLC. [21-1842] (DDS) [Entered: 05/17/2021 12:37 PM]
May 17, 2021 Filing 23 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Expedia Inc. [21-1842] (DDS) [Entered: 05/17/2021 12:36 PM]
May 17, 2021 Filing 22 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Expedia Group Inc. [21-1842] (DDS) [Entered: 05/17/2021 12:35 PM]
May 11, 2021 Filing 21 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jane Webre on behalf of Appellee(s) Expedia Group, Inc.; Expedia, Inc.; Hotels.com LP; Hotels.com GP, LLC; Travelscape LLC (d/b/a Travelocity) and Orbitz, LLC. [21-1842] (JMW) [Entered: 05/11/2021 05:33 PM]
May 11, 2021 Filing 20 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Trip Advisor LLC in 21-1842. --[Edited 05/12/2021 by CJG to remove from the appeal at No. 21-1843 as it does not apply.] (JAC) [Entered: 05/11/2021 04:54 PM]
May 11, 2021 Filing 19 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Trip Advisor Inc in 21-1842. --[Edited 05/12/2021 by CJG to remove from the appeal at No. 21-1843 as it does not apply.] (JAC) [Entered: 05/11/2021 04:53 PM]
May 11, 2021 Filing 18 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David D. Shank on behalf of Appellee(s) Expedia Group, Inc.; Expedia, Inc.; Hotels.com LP; Hotels.com GP, LLC; Travelscape LLC (d/b/a Travelocity), and Orbitz, LLC. [21-1842] (DDS) [Entered: 05/11/2021 02:59 PM]
May 10, 2021 Filing 17 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Robert M. Glen advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [21-1842] (CB) [Entered: 05/10/2021 03:10 PM]
May 10, 2021 Filing 16 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Robert M. Glen. [21-1842] (CB) [Entered: 05/10/2021 03:08 PM]
May 5, 2021 Filing 15 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ryan M. Goldstein on behalf of Appellant(s) Robert M. Glen. [21-1842] (RMG) [Entered: 05/05/2021 04:25 PM]
May 5, 2021 Filing 14 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jonathan M. Kass on behalf of Appellant(s) Robert M. Glen. [21-1842] (JMK) [Entered: 05/05/2021 04:23 PM]
May 5, 2021 Filing 13 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Craig A. Boneau on behalf of Appellant(s) Robert M. Glen. [21-1842] (CB) [Entered: 05/05/2021 04:21 PM]
May 4, 2021 Filing 11 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jonathan A. Choa on behalf of Appellee(s) TripAdvisor, Inc. and TripAdvisor LLC. (JAC) [Entered: 05/04/2021 04:15 PM]
May 4, 2021 Filing 8 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Kayak Software Corporation in 21-1842. (MAD) [Entered: 05/04/2021 02:40 PM]
May 4, 2021 Filing 7 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Booking Holdings Inc in 21-1842. (MAD) [Entered: 05/04/2021 02:39 PM]
May 4, 2021 Filing 6 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from L Andrew S. Riccio on behalf of Appellee(s) Booking Holdings Inc., Kayak Software Corporation. (MAD) [Entered: 05/04/2021 02:37 PM]
May 4, 2021 Filing 5 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael C. McCutcheon on behalf of Appellee(s) Booking Holdings Inc., Kayak Software Corporation. (MAD) [Entered: 05/04/2021 02:36 PM]
May 4, 2021 Filing 4 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael A. Duffy on behalf of Appellee(s) Booking Holdings Inc., Kayak Software Corporation. (MAD) [Entered: 05/04/2021 02:34 PM]
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (Clerk) The actions at Nos. 21-1842 & 21-1843 are hereby consolidated for purposes of scheduling, the filing of a single brief, reply brief, and joint appendix by the appellant and for disposition. The appellees are encouraged to consult with one another regarding the contents of their briefs as the Court disfavors repetitive briefs. The appellees may choose to file a consolidated brief or join in or adopt portions by reference. See Fed. R. App.P. 28(i). [21-1842, 21-1843] SEE DOCKET FOR FULL TEXT OF ORDER (CLW) [Entered: 04/30/2021 05:33 PM]
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CLW) [Entered: 04/30/2021 04:32 PM]
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Robert M Glen in District Court No. 1-19-cv-01809. (CLW) [Entered: 04/30/2021 03:38 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Robert Glen v. Trip Advisor LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EXPEDIA INC
Represented By: Beth E. Moskow-Schnoll Esq.
Represented By: Brittany Giusini Esq.
Represented By: Jane M.N. Webre Esq.
Represented By: David D. Shank Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRAVELSCAPE LLC, DBA Travelocity
Represented By: Beth E. Moskow-Schnoll Esq.
Represented By: Brittany Giusini Esq.
Represented By: Jane M.N. Webre Esq.
Represented By: David D. Shank Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HOTELS.COM LP
Represented By: Beth E. Moskow-Schnoll Esq.
Represented By: Brittany Giusini Esq.
Represented By: Jane M.N. Webre Esq.
Represented By: David D. Shank Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HOTELS.COM GP LLC
Represented By: Beth E. Moskow-Schnoll Esq.
Represented By: Brittany Giusini Esq.
Represented By: Jane M.N. Webre Esq.
Represented By: David D. Shank Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAYAK SOFTWARE CORP
Represented By: Michael C. McCutcheon Esq.
Represented By: L. Andrew S. Riccio Esq.
Represented By: Michael A. Duffy Esq.
Represented By: John P. DiTomo Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRIP NETWORK LLC, DBA Cheap Tickets
Represented By: Beth E. Moskow-Schnoll Esq.
Represented By: Brittany Giusini Esq.
Represented By: David D. Shank Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EXPEDIA GROUP INC
Represented By: Beth E. Moskow-Schnoll Esq.
Represented By: Brittany Giusini Esq.
Represented By: Jane M.N. Webre Esq.
Represented By: David D. Shank Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRIP ADVISOR LLC
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa Esq.
Represented By: Jacob S. Gardener Esq.
Represented By: Sean T. Haran Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRIP ADVISOR INC
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa Esq.
Represented By: Jacob S. Gardener Esq.
Represented By: Sean T. Haran Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ORBITZ LLC
Represented By: Beth E. Moskow-Schnoll Esq.
Represented By: Jane M.N. Webre Esq.
Represented By: David D. Shank Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOOKING HOLDINGS INC
Represented By: Michael C. McCutcheon Esq.
Represented By: L. Andrew S. Riccio Esq.
Represented By: Michael A. Duffy Esq.
Represented By: John P. DiTomo Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT M. GLEN
Represented By: Jonathan M. Kass Esq.
Represented By: Ryan M. Goldstein Esq.
Represented By: Craig Boneau Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?