Craig Alford v. Baylor, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: CRAIG ALFORD
Defendant / Appellee: LT. BAYLOR, Director of Monroe County Correctional Facility, GARY HAIDLE, Warden of Monroe County Correctional Facility and MR. ARMOND, Sgt. at Monroe County Correctional Facility
Case Number: 23-1513
Filed: March 21, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner-Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER (Clerk) dismissing case, pursuant to F.R.A.P. 3(a) and LAR 3.3 and Misc. 107.1(a), for failure to pay the filing fee for the notice of appeal. Case terminated on 05/11/2023. (LMR) [Entered: 05/11/2023 12:03 PM]
April 24, 2023 Filing 14 Reply to Response by Appellant Craig Alford. Certificate of service dated 04/18/2023. Service made by US mail. (LMR) [Entered: 04/25/2023 12:15 PM]
April 17, 2023 Filing 13 IN FORMA PAUPERIS PRISONER ADDENDUM on behalf of Appellant Craig Alford. (LMR) [Entered: 04/20/2023 03:50 PM]
April 17, 2023 Filing 12 IN FORMA PAUPERIS PRISONER AUTHORIZATION on behalf of Appellant Craig Alford. (LMR) [Entered: 04/20/2023 03:50 PM]
April 17, 2023 Filing 11 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Craig Alford. (LMR) [Entered: 04/20/2023 03:49 PM]
April 17, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION filed by Appellant Craig Alford to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (LMR) [Entered: 04/20/2023 03:46 PM]
April 13, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION filed by Appellant Craig Alford for Appointment of Counsel. Certificate of Service dated 04/09/2023. Service made by US mail. (AMR) [Entered: 04/14/2023 11:13 AM]
April 12, 2023 Filing 8 Memorandun in Support of Jurisdiction filed by Appellant Craig Alford. Certificate of Service dated 04/03/2023. Service made by US mail. (AMR) [Entered: 04/12/2023 03:31 PM]
April 11, 2023 Filing 7 ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellees Armond, Baylor and Gary Haidle to Legal Division letter. Certificate of Service dated 04/11/2023. [23-1513] (GJG) [Entered: 04/11/2023 12:34 PM]
April 10, 2023 Filing 6 LETTER from Appellant Craig Alford in regards to returned mail. Service made on 04/11/2023 by ECF. [Mail resent] (AMR) [Entered: 04/11/2023 10:35 AM]
April 5, 2023 Filing 5 RESPONSE on behalf of Appellant Craig Alford to Legal Division letter advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 03/30/2023. Service made by US mail. (LMR) [Entered: 04/07/2023 12:00 PM]
March 23, 2023 Filing 4 LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (NF) [Entered: 03/23/2023 04:49 PM]
March 21, 2023 Filing 3 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Gerard J. Geiger, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Lt. Baylor, Gary Haidle, and Mr. Armond. [23-1513] (GJG) [Entered: 03/21/2023 10:41 AM]
March 21, 2023 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR) [Entered: 03/21/2023 10:12 AM]
March 21, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Craig Alford in District Court No. 1-20-cv-01787. (LMR) [Entered: 03/21/2023 10:08 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Craig Alford v. Baylor, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CRAIG ALFORD
Represented By: Craig Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LT. BAYLOR, Director of Monroe County Correctional Facility
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GARY HAIDLE, Warden of Monroe County Correctional Facility
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MR. ARMOND, Sgt. at Monroe County Correctional Facility
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?