Justin De La Cruz Martinez v. Richard McCormick, Jr.
Plaintiff: JUSTIN JUAN DE LA CRUZ MARTINEZ
Defendant: JUDGE RICHARD E. MCCORMICK, JR.
Case Number: 24-1412
Filed: March 7, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2024 Filing 14 RESPONSE on behalf of Appellant Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez to motion for summary action. Certificate of Service dated 04/16/2024. Service made by US mail. (KR) [Entered: 04/19/2024 02:58 PM]
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER (Clerk) granting motion to stay briefing schedule filed by Appellee Richard E. McCormick, Jr. The motion for summary action and any response are referred to a motions panel. If the motion for summary action is denied or referred to the merits panel. Appellee's Brief must be filed and served within thirty (30) days of the date of the order denying or referring the motion. (KR) [Entered: 04/09/2024 02:34 PM]
April 8, 2024 Filing 12 ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellee Richard E. McCormick, Jr. to summarily affirm. Certificate of Service dated 04/08/2024. Service made by US mail. [24-1412] (RJK) [Entered: 04/08/2024 01:27 PM]
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (Clerk) no action will be taken on motion to transfer case filed by Appellant Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez.. If, after reviewing this order, the appellant believes these appeals should be transferred, he may file a formal motion requesting that relief and explaining why this Court would have the power to grant it. Any motion must state with particularity the grounds for the motion, the relief sought, and the legal argument necessary to support it. In No. 24-1406, any response to the Clerks March 22, 2024, order must be filed within thirty days of this order. In Nos. 24-1408, 24-1411, 24-1416, 24-1421, 24-1422, the appellee has moved for summary action. Any response(s) to those motions must be filed within thirty days of this order. In those appeals, merits briefing is hereby stayed, and the appellant does not need to file an opening brief until the Court considers the appellees summary-action motion. In any appeal where the motion is denied or referred to the merits panel, then the appellant must file an opening merits brief within thirty days of the Courts order. In Nos. 24-1415, 24-1430, and 24-1432, the appellants opening brief must be filed within thirty days of this order. Failure to file a timely brief will result in dismissal of the appeal(s) without further notice. In the other appeals (Nos. 24-1412, 24-1413, 24-1414, 24-1431), the appellant does not appear to currently have any deadlines.[24-1406, 24-1408, 24-1411, 24-1416, 24-1421, 24-1422, 24-1412, 24-1413, 24-1414, 24-1415, 24-1430, 24-1431, 24-1432] (KR) [Entered: 03/28/2024 03:40 PM]
March 28, 2024 Filing 10 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert Krandel on behalf of Appellee(s) Judge Richard E. McCormick. [24-1412] (RJK) [Entered: 03/28/2024 10:37 AM]
March 27, 2024 Filing 9 PRO SE INFORMAL BRIEF with Exhibits attatched on behalf of Appellant Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez. Certificate of Service dated 03/20/2024 by US mail. Service to counsel by Clerk's Office via CM/ECF on 3/27/2024. --[Edited 03/28/2024 by GPK to update service.] (TMS) [Entered: 03/27/2024 04:48 PM]
March 26, 2024 Filing 8 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Attorney Robert J. Krandel, Esq. for Appellee Richard E. McCormick, Jr. requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 04/09/2024. (KR) [Entered: 03/26/2024 01:29 PM]
March 26, 2024 Filing 7 ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Richard E. McCormick, Jr. to motion for extension of time to file brief and appendix, motion to transfer case. Certificate of Service dated 03/26/2024. [24-1412] (RJK) [Entered: 03/26/2024 11:29 AM]
March 21, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION filed by Appellant Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez for Extension of Time to File Brief and Appendix, to Transfer Proceedings to United States District Court for the Northern District of Ilinois and Notice of postage payment shortage of this court. Response due on 04/01/2024. Certificate of Service dated 03/21/2024. Service made by ECF. (KR) [Entered: 03/22/2024 02:42 PM]
March 13, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (KR) [Entered: 03/13/2024 02:02 PM]
March 13, 2024 Filing 4 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez due on or before 04/22/2024. Appendix due on or before 04/22/2024. (KR) [Entered: 03/13/2024 01:59 PM]
March 7, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (PDB) [Entered: 03/07/2024 11:50 AM]
March 7, 2024 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 03/07/2024 11:49 AM]
March 7, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez in District Court No. 2-23-cv-01408. (PDB) [Entered: 03/07/2024 11:46 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Justin De La Cruz Martinez v. Richard McCormick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN JUAN DE LA CRUZ MARTINEZ
Represented By: Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDGE RICHARD E. MCCORMICK, JR.
Represented By: Robert J. Krandel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?