Justin De La Cruz Martinez v. Christopher Feliciani
Plaintiff: JUSTIN JUAN DE LA CRUZ MARTINEZ
Defendant: JUDGE CHRISTOPHER A. FELICIANI
Case Number: 24-1430
Filed: March 8, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER (Clerk) referring to a motions panel the motion for summary action and response. The briefing schedule will be stayed pending the Courts ruling. If the motion for summary action is denied or referred to the merits panel, Appellees brief must be filed and served within thirty (30) days of the date of the order denying or referring the motion. (KR) [Entered: 04/23/2024 02:01 PM]
April 19, 2024 Filing 17 RESPONSE on behalf of Appellant Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez to motion for summary action. Certificate of Service dated 04/16/2024. Service made by US mail. (KR) [Entered: 04/19/2024 03:09 PM]
April 8, 2024 Filing 16 PRO SE BRIEF (two parts) on behalf of Appellant Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez. Certificate of Service dated 04/04/2024 by US mail.--[Edited 04/11/2024 by GPK to upload part 2 of brief] (TMS) [Entered: 04/10/2024 10:39 AM]
April 8, 2024 Filing 15 ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellee Christopher A. Feliciani to summarily affirm and stay the briefing schedule. Certificate of Service dated 04/08/2024. Service made by US mail. [24-1430]--[Edited 04/09/2024 by KR] (RJK) [Entered: 04/08/2024 01:34 PM]
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER (Clerk) no action will be taken on motion to transfer case filed by Appellant Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez.. If, after reviewing this order, the appellant believes these appeals should be transferred, he may file a formal motion requesting that relief and explaining why this Court would have the power to grant it. Any motion must state with particularity the grounds for the motion, the relief sought, and the legal argument necessary to support it. In No. 24-1406, any response to the Clerks March 22, 2024, order must be filed within thirty days of this order. In Nos. 24-1408, 24-1411, 24-1416, 24-1421, 24-1422, the appellee has moved for summary action. Any response(s) to those motions must be filed within thirty days of this order. In those appeals, merits briefing is hereby stayed, and the appellant does not need to file an opening brief until the Court considers the appellees summary-action motion. In any appeal where the motion is denied or referred to the merits panel, then the appellant must file an opening merits brief within thirty days of the Courts order. In Nos. 24-1415, 24-1430, and 24-1432, the appellants opening brief must be filed within thirty days of this order. Failure to file a timely brief will result in dismissal of the appeal(s) without further notice. In the other appeals (Nos. 24-1412, 24-1413, 24-1414, 24-1431), the appellant does not appear to currently have any deadlines.[24-1406, 24-1408, 24-1411, 24-1416, 24-1421, 24-1422, 24-1412, 24-1413, 24-1414, 24-1415, 24-1430, 24-1431, 24-1432] (KR) [Entered: 03/28/2024 03:40 PM]
March 28, 2024 Filing 13 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert Krandel on behalf of Appellee(s) Judge Christopher A. Feliciani. [24-1430] (RJK) [Entered: 03/28/2024 10:38 AM]
March 26, 2024 Filing 12 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Attorney Robert J. Krandel, Esq. for Appellee Christopher A. Feliciani requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 04/09/2024. (KR) [Entered: 03/26/2024 01:38 PM]
March 26, 2024 Filing 11 ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Christopher A. Feliciani to motion for extension of time to file brief and appendix, motion to transfer case. Certificate of Service dated 03/26/2024. [24-1430] (RJK) [Entered: 03/26/2024 11:38 AM]
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (Clerk) no action will be taken on motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez. (KR) [Entered: 03/26/2024 11:09 AM]
March 21, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION filed by Appellant Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez for Extension of Time to File Brief and Appendix, to Transfer Proceedings to United States District Court for the Northern District of Ilinois and Notice of postage payment shortage of this court. Response due on 04/01/2024. Certificate of Service dated 03/22/2024. Service made by ECF. (KR) [Entered: 03/22/2024 03:05 PM]
March 21, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION filed by Appellant Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Certificate of Service dated 03/22/2024. Service made by ECF. (KR) [Entered: 03/22/2024 12:42 PM]
March 21, 2024 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed on behalf of Appellant Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez. (KR) [Entered: 03/22/2024 12:38 PM]
March 21, 2024 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed by Appellant Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez.. (KR) [Entered: 03/22/2024 12:35 PM]
March 14, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (KR) [Entered: 03/14/2024 11:45 AM]
March 14, 2024 Filing 4 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez due on or before 04/23/2024. Appendix due on or before 04/23/2024. (KR) [Entered: 03/14/2024 11:42 AM]
March 8, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (KR) [Entered: 03/08/2024 10:52 AM]
March 8, 2024 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR) [Entered: 03/08/2024 10:52 AM]
March 8, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez in District Court No. 2-23-cv-00435. (KR) [Entered: 03/08/2024 10:48 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Justin De La Cruz Martinez v. Christopher Feliciani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN JUAN DE LA CRUZ MARTINEZ
Represented By: Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDGE CHRISTOPHER A. FELICIANI
Represented By: Robert J. Krandel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?