Justin De La Cruz Martinez v. Chuck Mathews
Plaintiff: JUSTIN JUAN DE LA CRUZ MARTINEZ
Defendant: CHUCK MATHEWS
Case Number: 24-1431
Filed: March 8, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2024 Filing 10 Argument in Support of the Appeal filed by Appellant Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez. (KR) [Entered: 04/16/2024 10:47 AM]
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (Clerk) granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez The appeal will be submitted to a panel for determination under 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2) or for summary action under Third Circuit L.A.R. 27.4 and I.O.P. 10.6. Appellant may submit argument, which should not exceed 5 pages, in support of the appeal. The document, with certificate of service, must be filed with the clerk within 21 days of the date of this order. (KR) [Entered: 04/05/2024 01:40 PM]
April 2, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION filed by Appellant Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Response due on 04/12/2024. Certificate of Service dated 04/02/2024. Service made by ECF. (KR) [Entered: 04/02/2024 01:40 PM]
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (Clerk) no action will be taken on motion to transfer case filed by Appellant Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez.. If, after reviewing this order, the appellant believes these appeals should be transferred, he may file a formal motion requesting that relief and explaining why this Court would have the power to grant it. Any motion must state with particularity the grounds for the motion, the relief sought, and the legal argument necessary to support it. In No. 24-1406, any response to the Clerks March 22, 2024, order must be filed within thirty days of this order. In Nos. 24-1408, 24-1411, 24-1416, 24-1421, 24-1422, the appellee has moved for summary action. Any response(s) to those motions must be filed within thirty days of this order. In those appeals, merits briefing is hereby stayed, and the appellant does not need to file an opening brief until the Court considers the appellees summary-action motion. In any appeal where the motion is denied or referred to the merits panel, then the appellant must file an opening merits brief within thirty days of the Courts order. In Nos. 24-1415, 24-1430, and 24-1432, the appellants opening brief must be filed within thirty days of this order. Failure to file a timely brief will result in dismissal of the appeal(s) without further notice. In the other appeals (Nos. 24-1412, 24-1413, 24-1414, 24-1431), the appellant does not appear to currently have any deadlines.[24-1406, 24-1408, 24-1411, 24-1416, 24-1421, 24-1422, 24-1412, 24-1413, 24-1414, 24-1415, 24-1430, 24-1431, 24-1432] (KR) [Entered: 03/28/2024 03:40 PM]
March 21, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION filed by Appellant Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez to Transfer Proceedings to United States District Court for the Northern District of Ilinois and Notice of postage payment shortage of this court. Response due on 04/01/2024. Certificate of Service dated 03/22/2024. Service made by ECF. (KR) [Entered: 03/22/2024 03:09 PM]
March 21, 2024 Filing 5 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Bethany S. Wagner on behalf of Appellee(s) Chuck Mathews. [24-1431] (BSW) [Entered: 03/21/2024 02:39 PM]
March 21, 2024 Filing 4 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Maria Greco Danaher on behalf of Appellee(s) Chuck Mathews. [24-1431] (MGD) [Entered: 03/21/2024 02:37 PM]
March 8, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (KR) [Entered: 03/08/2024 11:10 AM]
March 8, 2024 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR) [Entered: 03/08/2024 11:09 AM]
March 8, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez in District Court No. 2-23-cv-00875. (KR) [Entered: 03/08/2024 11:05 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Justin De La Cruz Martinez v. Chuck Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN JUAN DE LA CRUZ MARTINEZ
Represented By: Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHUCK MATHEWS
Represented By: Maria G. Danaher Esq.
Represented By: Bethany S. Wagner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?