Vincent Sorace, et al v. Wells Fargo Bank NA
Plaintiff: VINCENT SORACE, JOSEPH YERTY, TAMMY YERTY, JAMES ZARONSKY, LINDA ZARONSKY, VIKTOR STEVENSON, ASHLEY YATES, KIMBERLY SOLOMON-ROBINSON, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF A CLASS OF SIMILARLY SITUATED PERSONS and JENNIFER LYNN HUMMEL
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK NA
Petitioner: SHAWN DAVID HUMMEL
Case Number: 24-1498
Filed: March 19, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
December 16, 2024 Vincent Sorace v. Wells Fargo Bank NA

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (TMM) [Entered: 04/09/2024 09:18 AM]
April 9, 2024 Filing 14 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Jennifer Lynn Hummel and Shawn David Hummel due on or before 05/20/2024. Appendix due on or before 05/20/2024. (TMM) [Entered: 04/09/2024 09:15 AM]
April 2, 2024 Filing 13 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT [24-1498] (RES) [Entered: 04/02/2024 03:58 PM]
April 2, 2024 Filing 12 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Jennifer Lynn Hummel and Shawn David Hummel. [24-1498] (APR) [Entered: 04/02/2024 03:52 PM]
March 29, 2024 Filing 11 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Richard Shenkan on behalf of Appellee(s) Vincent Sorace, Joseph Yerty, Tammy Yerty, James Zaronsky, Linda Zaronsky, Viktor Stevenson, Ashley Yates, Kimberly Solomon-Robinson. [24-1498] (RES) [Entered: 03/29/2024 12:30 PM]
March 28, 2024 Filing 10 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Wells Fargo Bank NA. [24-1498] (JDS) [Entered: 03/28/2024 02:35 PM]
March 28, 2024 Filing 9 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Karla L. Johnson on behalf of Appellee(s) Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. [24-1498] (KLJ) [Entered: 03/28/2024 02:32 PM]
March 28, 2024 Filing 8 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jarrod D. Shaw on behalf of Appellee(s) Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. [24-1498] (JDS) [Entered: 03/28/2024 02:30 PM]
March 26, 2024 Filing 7 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Jennifer Lynn Hummel and Shawn David Hummel advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. Requested date(s) are: January 31, 2024, to be filed by WRITER'S CRAMP, INC. [24-1498] (APR) [Entered: 03/26/2024 06:18 PM]
March 26, 2024 Filing 6 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Jennifer Lynn Hummel and Shawn David Hummel. [24-1498] (APR) [Entered: 03/26/2024 06:16 PM]
March 26, 2024 Filing 5 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Jennifer Lynn Hummel and Shawn David Hummel. [24-1498] (APR) [Entered: 03/26/2024 06:13 PM]
March 26, 2024 Filing 4 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Aurelius P. Robleto, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Jennifer Lynn Hummel and Shawn David Hummel Sr.. [24-1498] (APR) [Entered: 03/26/2024 06:10 PM]
March 19, 2024 Filing 3 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) [Entered: 03/19/2024 11:00 AM]
March 19, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (TMM) [Entered: 03/19/2024 10:59 AM]
March 19, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Jennifer Lynn Hummel and Shawn David Hummel in District Court No. 2-20-cv-04318. (TMM) [Entered: 03/19/2024 10:57 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Vincent Sorace, et al v. Wells Fargo Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VINCENT SORACE
Represented By: Richard E. Shenkan Esq.
Represented By: Lawrence F. Stengel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH YERTY
Represented By: Richard E. Shenkan Esq.
Represented By: Lawrence F. Stengel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMY YERTY
Represented By: Richard E. Shenkan Esq.
Represented By: Lawrence F. Stengel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES ZARONSKY
Represented By: Richard E. Shenkan Esq.
Represented By: Lawrence F. Stengel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA ZARONSKY
Represented By: Richard E. Shenkan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIKTOR STEVENSON
Represented By: Richard E. Shenkan Esq.
Represented By: Lawrence F. Stengel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEY YATES
Represented By: Richard E. Shenkan Esq.
Represented By: Lawrence F. Stengel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY SOLOMON-ROBINSON, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF A CLASS OF SIMILARLY SITUATED PERSONS
Represented By: Richard E. Shenkan Esq.
Represented By: Lawrence F. Stengel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER LYNN HUMMEL
Represented By: Renee M. Kuruce Esq.
Represented By: Aurelius P. Robleto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SHAWN DAVID HUMMEL
Represented By: Renee M. Kuruce Esq.
Represented By: Aurelius P. Robleto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK NA
Represented By: Karla L. Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Jarrod D. Shaw Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?