Katrina Dansby v. Kristen Bleiweis, et al
Plaintiff: KATRINA DANSBY
Defendant: KRISTEN BLEIWEIS, MCCALLA RAYNER LEIBERT PIERCE LLC, PACIFIC UNION FINANCIAL and JUDGE WALTER KOPROWSKI
Case Number: 24-1624
Filed: April 5, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2024 Filing 9 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Harold L. Kofman, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Kristen Bleiweis, McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce LLC and Pacific Union Financial Corporation. [24-1624] (HLK) [Entered: 05/15/2024 11:37 AM]
May 14, 2024 Filing 8 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Joseph D. Sams on behalf of Appellee(s) Hon. Walter Koprowski; Hon. Jodi Alper. [24-1624] (JDS) [Entered: 05/14/2024 01:43 PM]
May 14, 2024 Filing 7 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Joseph D. Sams on behalf of Appellee(s) Hon. Walter Koprowski; Hon. Jodi Alper. [24-1624] Document attached to this entry will be removed. Incorrect internal document attached. Correct form was filed. (JDS) [Entered: 05/14/2024 01:15 PM]
May 14, 2024 Filing 6 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Nicholas A. Falcone, Esq. for Appellee Walter Koprowski and Harold L. Kofman, Esq. for Appellees Kristen Bleiweis, McCalla Rayner Leibert Pierce LLC and Pacific Union Financial requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 05/28/2024. (PDB) [Entered: 05/14/2024 12:00 PM]
May 14, 2024 Filing 5 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Party Katrina Dansby requesting the following document(s) filing fee:. (PDB) [Entered: 05/14/2024 11:58 AM]
April 18, 2024 Filing 4 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees Kristen Bleiweis, McCalla Rayner Leibert Pierce LLC and Pacific Union Financial. [24-1624] (HLK) [Entered: 04/18/2024 03:33 PM]
April 5, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (PDB) [Entered: 04/05/2024 03:45 PM]
April 5, 2024 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 04/05/2024 03:44 PM]
April 5, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Katrina Dansby in District Court No. 2-23-cv-00403. (PDB) [Entered: 04/05/2024 03:40 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Katrina Dansby v. Kristen Bleiweis, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATRINA DANSBY
Represented By: Katrina Dansby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRISTEN BLEIWEIS
Represented By: Harold L. Kofman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCCALLA RAYNER LEIBERT PIERCE LLC
Represented By: Harold L. Kofman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACIFIC UNION FINANCIAL
Represented By: Harold L. Kofman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDGE WALTER KOPROWSKI
Represented By: Nicholas A. Falcone Esq.
Represented By: Joseph D. Sams Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?