Kenneth Talley, et al v. Judith Horn, et al
Plaintiff: KENNETH R. TALLEY, JANICE A. TALLEY and KRISTINA KAREN TALLEY
Defendant: JUDITH C. HORN, DARREN W. HORN, SR., DARREN W. HORN, JR., KEVIN R. TALLEY, DELAWARE COURT OF CHANCERY, PATRICIA W. GRIFFIN, SUPERIOR COURT OF DELAWARE, JUDGE MARK H. CONNER, COMMUNITY LEGAL AID SOCIETY INC, OLGA BESKRONE, SERGOVIC CARMEAN WEIDMAN MCCARTNEY & OWENS PA, DAVID WEIDMAN and ROB BOOK, President of Delaware Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Case Number: 24-1734
Filed: April 29, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2024 Filing 22 RETURNED MAIL. U.S. Postal Service returned clerk order [ # 18 ] sent to Appellant Janice A. Talley. Mail was returned because Unclaimed. No forwarding address is available. (JK) [Entered: 06/24/2024 05:26 PM]
June 21, 2024 Filing 21 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kenneth L. Wan on behalf of Appellee(s) Patricia W. Griffin, Judge Mark H. Conner, Superior Court of Delaware, and Delaware Court of Chancery. [24-1734, 24-1917] (KLW) [Entered: 06/21/2024 03:05 PM]
June 17, 2024 Filing 20 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David J. Soldo on behalf of Appellee(s) Rob Book. [24-1734, 24-1917] (DJS) [Entered: 06/17/2024 12:04 PM]
June 13, 2024 Filing 19 DOCUMENTS filed by Apppellants titled Notice of Evidence (All Courts). (JK) [Entered: 06/13/2024 10:58 AM]
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER (Clerk) On May 10, 2024, the appellants filed a "revised" motion to proceed in forma pauperis in No. 24-1734. Because the fees for No. 24-1734 were previously paid, an IFP motion in that appeal is unnecessary. No further action will be taken on it in No. 24-1734. The motion will, however, be re-docketed in No. 24-1917, where the same appellants are seeking to proceed in forma pauperis and were recently required to submit affidavits like the ones attached to this motion. The appellants' IFP motion may have been intended for their new appeal, which has now been docketed as No. 24-1917. (JK) [Entered: 06/10/2024 03:43 PM]
June 10, 2024 Filing 17 ECF FILER: APPEARANCE FORM filed by Attorney John Elzufon, Esq. for Appellees Olga Beskrone and Community Legal Aid Society Inc in 24-1734, Attorney John Elzufon, Esq. for Appellees Community Legal Aid Society Inc and Olga Beskrone in 24-1917. Certificate of Service dated 06/10/2024. Service made by US mail, ECF. [24-1734, 24-1917]--[Edited 06/10/2024 by JK] (JE) [Entered: 06/10/2024 12:58 PM]
June 10, 2024 Filing 16 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from NATHAN V. GIN, ESQ. AS CO-COUNSEL on behalf of Appellee(s) COMMUNITY LEGAL AID SOCIETY, INC., OLGA BESKRONE. [24-1734, 24-1917] (NVG) [Entered: 06/10/2024 12:34 PM]
June 6, 2024 Filing 15 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from K. Tyler O'Connell on behalf of Appellee(s) Rob Book. [24-1917, 24-1734] (KTO) [Entered: 06/06/2024 02:30 PM]
June 3, 2024 Filing 14 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Attorney General Delaware for Appellees Superior Court of Delaware, Delaware Court of Chancery, Patricia W. Griffin and Judge Mark H. Conner, John Elzufon, Esq. for Appellees Community Legal Aid Society Inc and Olga Beskrone, Tyler Friedman, Esq. for Appellees Judith C. Horn, Darren W. Horn, Jr., Sergovic Carmean Weidman McCartney & Owens PA and David Weidman, Caneel Radinson-Blasucci, Esq. for Appellees Superior Court of Delaware, Delaware Court of Chancery, Patricia W. Griffin and Judge Mark H. Conner and David J. Soldo, Esq. for Appellee Rob Book requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 06/10/2024. (JK) [Entered: 06/03/2024 01:50 PM]
May 21, 2024 Filing 13 RESPONSE on behalf of Appellants Janice A. Talley, Kenneth R. Talley and Kristina Karen Talley to Legal Division letter advising of possible dismissal [ # 4 ]. (JK) [Entered: 05/21/2024 04:08 PM]
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (Clerk) Appellant's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Appellant's "Revised Petition for Permission to Appeal" have been placed on this appeal's docket. The documents contained this appeal's docket number, and the appellant apparently intended them for filing in this appeal. The documents, however, evidence an intention to begin a new appeal from the district court's new April 29, 2024, order. See 3d Cir. L.A.R. 3.4. The documents will therefore be sent to the district court for filing there as a new notice of appeal. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(d). In this appeal, No. 24-1734, no further action will be taken on the motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The fees for No. 24-1734 were previously paid, so an IFP motion in this appeal is unnecessary, (JK) [Entered: 05/13/2024 03:23 PM]
May 10, 2024 Filing 11 REVISED MOTION filed by Appellants Janice A. Talley, Kenneth R. Talley and Kristina Karen Talley to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (JK) [Entered: 05/13/2024 03:20 PM]
May 3, 2024 Filing 10 Service of the 05/03/2024 Motions and Documents made by Appellants Janice A. Talley, Kenneth R. Talley and Kristina Karen Talley on 05/03/2024 by US mail. (JK) [Entered: 05/13/2024 02:59 PM]
May 3, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION filed by Appellants Janice A. Talley, Kenneth R. Talley and Kristina Karen Talley for Leave to Complete the Action Out-Of-Time. (JK) [Entered: 05/13/2024 02:57 PM]
May 3, 2024 Filing 8 DOCUMENT filed by Appellants Kenneth and Janice Tally titled Document Preparation Certification. (JK) [Entered: 05/13/2024 02:55 PM]
May 3, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION filed by Appellants Janice A. Talley and Kenneth R. Talley to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (JK) [Entered: 05/13/2024 02:52 PM]
May 3, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION filed by Appellants Janice A. Talley and Kenneth R. Talley for Competency Evaluation. (JK) [Entered: 05/13/2024 02:48 PM]
May 3, 2024 Filing 5 DOCUMENT filed by Appellants titled Revised Petition for Permission to Appeal. (JK) [Entered: 05/13/2024 02:46 PM]
May 1, 2024 Filing 4 LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (ZM) [Entered: 05/01/2024 03:50 PM]
April 29, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (JK) [Entered: 04/29/2024 12:20 PM]
April 29, 2024 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 04/29/2024 12:19 PM]
April 29, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Janice A. Talley, Kenneth R. Talley and Kristina Karen Talley in District Court No. 1-23-cv-00324. (JK) [Entered: 04/29/2024 12:14 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kenneth Talley, et al v. Judith Horn, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH R. TALLEY
Represented By: Kenneth R. Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANICE A. TALLEY
Represented By: Janice A. Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTINA KAREN TALLEY
Represented By: Kristina Karen Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDITH C. HORN
Represented By: Tyler Friedman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARREN W. HORN, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARREN W. HORN, JR.
Represented By: Tyler Friedman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN R. TALLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELAWARE COURT OF CHANCERY
Represented By: Attorney General Delaware
Represented By: Caneel Radinson-Blasucci Esq.
Represented By: Kenneth L. Wan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICIA W. GRIFFIN
Represented By: Attorney General Delaware
Represented By: Caneel Radinson-Blasucci Esq.
Represented By: Kenneth L. Wan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUPERIOR COURT OF DELAWARE
Represented By: Attorney General Delaware
Represented By: Caneel Radinson-Blasucci Esq.
Represented By: Kenneth L. Wan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDGE MARK H. CONNER
Represented By: Attorney General Delaware
Represented By: Caneel Radinson-Blasucci Esq.
Represented By: Kenneth L. Wan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY LEGAL AID SOCIETY INC
Represented By: John Elzufon Esq.
Represented By: Nathan Vincent Gin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLGA BESKRONE
Represented By: John Elzufon Esq.
Represented By: Nathan Vincent Gin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGOVIC CARMEAN WEIDMAN MCCARTNEY & OWENS PA
Represented By: Tyler Friedman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID WEIDMAN
Represented By: Tyler Friedman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROB BOOK, President of Delaware Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Soldo Esq.
Represented By: K. Tyler O'Connell Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?