Rashonna Ransom v. GreatPlains Finance LLC, et al
Plaintiff: RASHONNA M. RANSOM, on behalf of herself and others similarly situated
Defendant: GREATPLAINS FINANCE LLC, DBA Cash Advance Now
Case Number: 24-1908
Filed: May 20, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2024 Filing 19 Appellant GreatPlains Finance LLC verbally granted an extension of time to file brief and appendix until 07/31/2024 pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 31.4. (CJG) [Entered: 07/05/2024 09:11 AM]
June 7, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (CJG) [Entered: 06/07/2024 10:05 AM]
June 7, 2024 Filing 17 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant GreatPlains Finance LLC due on or before 07/17/2024. Appendix due on or before 07/17/2024. (CJG) [Entered: 06/07/2024 10:04 AM]
June 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER (Clerk) This appeal will not be submitted to a motions panel for possible dismissal due to a jurisdictional defect at this time. The issue of jurisdiction is referred to the merits panel for consideration after briefing. The parties should address jurisdiction in their briefs. (CJG) [Entered: 06/07/2024 09:47 AM]
June 3, 2024 Filing 15 ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Rashonna M. Ransom to clerk order advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 06/03/2024. [-SEND TO MERITS] [24-1908]--[Edited 06/07/2024 by CJG] (PDS) [Entered: 06/03/2024 04:28 PM]
June 3, 2024 Filing 14 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Philip D. Stern on behalf of Appellee(s) Rashonna M. Ransom. [24-1908] (PDS) [Entered: 06/03/2024 03:23 PM]
June 3, 2024 Filing 13 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Yongmoon Kim on behalf of Appellee(s) Rashonna M. Ransom. [24-1908] (YK) [Entered: 06/03/2024 11:07 AM]
May 31, 2024 Filing 12 ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellant GreatPlains Finance LLC to clerk order advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 05/31/2024. [-SEND TO MERITS] [24-1908]--[Edited 06/07/2024 by CJG] (RRS) [Entered: 05/31/2024 04:01 PM]
May 23, 2024 Filing 11 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant GreatPlains Finance LLC advising this court that no transcripts are available. [24-1908] (RRS) [Entered: 05/23/2024 11:31 AM]
May 23, 2024 Filing 10 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant GreatPlains Finance LLC. [24-1908] (RRS) [Entered: 05/23/2024 11:30 AM]
May 23, 2024 Filing 9 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant GreatPlains Finance LLC. [24-1908] (RRS) [Entered: 05/23/2024 11:29 AM]
May 23, 2024 Filing 8 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant GreatPlains Finance LLC. [24-1908] (RRS) [Entered: 05/23/2024 11:28 AM]
May 23, 2024 Filing 7 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Rob Roy Smith on behalf of Appellant(s) GreatPlains Finance LLC d/b/a Cash Advance Now. [24-1908] (RRS) [Entered: 05/23/2024 11:26 AM]
May 23, 2024 Filing 6 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mark Reeves on behalf of Appellant(s) GreatPlains Finance LLC d/b/a Cash Advance Now. [24-1908] (RRS) [Entered: 05/23/2024 11:26 AM]
May 23, 2024 Filing 5 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Adam Charnes on behalf of Appellant(s) GreatPlains Finance LLC d/b/a Cash Advance Now. [24-1908] (RRS) [Entered: 05/23/2024 11:25 AM]
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (Clerk) The defendant appealed after the district court denied its motion to dismiss the complaint. The order appealed may not be final within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. Section: 1291 or otherwise appealable at this time. All parties must file written responses addressing this issue within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. (CJG) [Entered: 05/20/2024 11:43 AM]
May 20, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (CJG) [Entered: 05/20/2024 11:39 AM]
May 20, 2024 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CJG) [Entered: 05/20/2024 11:39 AM]
May 20, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant GreatPlains Finance LLC in District Court No. 2-22-cv-01344. (CJG) [Entered: 05/20/2024 11:34 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Rashonna Ransom v. GreatPlains Finance LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREATPLAINS FINANCE LLC, DBA Cash Advance Now
Represented By: Adam H. Charnes Esq.
Represented By: Frederick L. Whitmer Esq.
Represented By: Rob R. Smith Esq.
Represented By: Mark H. Reeves Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RASHONNA M. RANSOM, on behalf of herself and others similarly situated
Represented By: Philip D. Stern Esq.
Represented By: Yongmoon Kim Esq.
Represented By: Mark H. Jensen Esq.
Represented By: David J. Guzik Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?