Mark Woods v. Shawn Wills, et al
Plaintiff: MARK WOODS
Defendant: P/O CREMEN, #9052 INDIVIDUALLY AND AS P/O FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, P/O LT. HOYT, #225 INDIVIDUALLY AND AS P/O FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, POLICE OFFICER SHAWN WILLS, #3680 INDIVIDUALLY AND AS P/O FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, P/O RIMSHAW, #8151 INDIVIDUALLY AND AS A P/O FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA and P/O THOMAS STRAIN, #4005 INDIVIDUALLY AND AS P/O FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Case Number: 24-1928
Filed: May 17, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner-Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (Clerk) dismissing case pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). (TMM) [Entered: 06/03/2024 10:02 AM]
May 31, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION filed by Appellant Mark Woods to Dismiss Appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). Certificate of Service dated 05/28/2024. Service made by US mail. (TMM) [Entered: 06/03/2024 09:53 AM]
May 22, 2024 Filing 4 LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (SH) [Entered: 05/22/2024 10:32 AM]
May 17, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (TMM) [Entered: 05/17/2024 01:20 PM]
May 17, 2024 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) [Entered: 05/17/2024 01:19 PM]
May 17, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Mark Woods in District Court No. 2-16-cv-04379. (TMM) [Entered: 05/17/2024 01:16 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mark Woods v. Shawn Wills, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P/O CREMEN, #9052 INDIVIDUALLY AND AS P/O FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P/O LT. HOYT, #225 INDIVIDUALLY AND AS P/O FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE OFFICER SHAWN WILLS, #3680 INDIVIDUALLY AND AS P/O FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P/O RIMSHAW, #8151 INDIVIDUALLY AND AS A P/O FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P/O THOMAS STRAIN, #4005 INDIVIDUALLY AND AS P/O FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK WOODS
Represented By: Mark Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?